ABANTO et al v. BANK OF AMERICA N.A. et al
Plaintiff: ROSA MAGBAG, MIGUELINA LOPEZ, MARINO TORRES, PARUL METHA, HASSEB BAKSH, MARK C. BALAGTAS, MARIA SAYSON, CHERYL BAKSH, WINIFREDA BAUTISTA, LORNA ROSEN, UPRENDRA METHA, ALFONSO BAUTISTA, MARILOU LELINA, EMMER SANCHEZ, SHIRLEY E. THENSTEAD, YANG BLANCO, MANUELITO S. PABLO, GERALDEZ MALLORI, NEIL LADERA, MARIA T. KABIGTING, TERESITA CANCIO, CORAZON PRING, GLORIA A. MANUEL, SANDRA C. SANCHEZ, MELISSA BATCHU, RICHARD TAYLOR, MAXIMO C. NAPULI, FERMIN REYNOSA, JIN ZHOU, JAY GEMINO, RODORA CARTASANO, AUREA REYES, SANDRA JOYNER, PHILIP AVELLA, APRIL BLANCO, RONALYN GEMINO, MICHAEL DELPONTE, ALI SALEH, SUZETTE T. NAPULI, WASHINGTON ABANTO, LUIS A. SUAZO, YOUNG J. LEE, MERSEDITA MARASIGAN, ROSA REYNOSA, VICTOR NAPENAS, ALOHA SANCHEZ, JOSEPH PRING, FLORA G. PABLO, MICHAEL JOYNER, RAMON CARTASANO, SUNAZ NELIA, PEDRO LOPEZ, NICHETTE MEUSA, NORA E. VEGA, CHEUNG LIN, CARLOS J. CANCIO, VIRGILIO SESE, SHARON AVELLA, FRANCIS REYES, JUAN C. SANCHEZ, ALFREDO GARREON, WALTER E. VEGA and JOHN SAYSON
Defendant: NORTH CAROLINA NATIONAL BANK, BANKAMERICA CORP., FLEET/NORSTAR FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., BANK OF BOSTON CORP., STANDARD FEDERAL BANK, N.A., SHAWMUT NATIONAL CORP., FLEETBOSTON FINANCIAL CORP., MELLON NATIONAL, JOHN DOE 1-10, BANK OF AMERICA N.A., NATIONBANK CORP., BANK OF AMERICA CORP., COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, BANK OF AMERICA PRIVATE WEALTH MANAGEMENT, AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BANK, FLEET FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., SECURITY PACIFIC CORP., CITIZENS & SOUTHERN NATIONAL BANK, BANK OF NEW YORK, SOVRAN FINANCIAL CORP., BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, BARNETT BANKS, INC., FIRST REPUBLIC BANK CORP., BANK OF AMERICA CARD SERVICES, BANK OF NEW ENGLAND CORP., BOATMAN'S BANCSHARES and C&S OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Case Number: 2:2011cv05519
Filed: September 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Bergen
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cavanaugh
Referring Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying pltf's cross motion for sanctions; granting in part and denying in part deft's motion for sanctions. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 6/26/2013. (nr, )
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting deft's #35 Motion to Dismiss the amended complt., with prejudice. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 6/13/2013. (nr, )
February 15, 2013 Filing 41 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BANK OF AMERICA N.A. re #35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint with Prejudice and for Rule 11 Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service)(BETTINO, DIANE)
January 15, 2013 Filing 40 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PHILIP AVELLA, SHARON AVELLA, CHERYL BAKSH, HASSEB BAKSH re #35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint with Prejudice and for Rule 11 Sanctions (LI, FENG)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Text Order: Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's cross-motion for sanctions in accordance with the briefing schedule set forth in this Court's Text Order of 10/10/2012. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 12/20/2012. (jqb)
December 19, 2012 Filing 38 BRIEF Cross-Motion and Response (LI, FENG)
December 18, 2012 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Brief Doc. #37 filed by F. LI on 12/17/2012 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Brief USING Responses and Replies. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (nr, )
December 17, 2012 Filing 37 Cross MOTION for Sanctions against defendants by PHILIP AVELLA, SHARON AVELLA, CHERYL BAKSH, HASSEB BAKSH, MARK C. BALAGTAS. (LI, FENG)
December 12, 2012 Filing 36 Letter from Diane A. Bettino, Esq.. (BETTINO, DIANE)
November 15, 2012 Set Deadlines as to #35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint with Prejudice and for Rule 11 Sanctions. Motion set for 12/17/2012 10:00 AM before Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
November 15, 2012 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint with Prejudice and for Rule 11 Sanctions by BANK OF AMERICA N.A.. Responses due by 1/15/2013 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Diane Bettino, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Certificate of Service)(BETTINO, DIANE)
October 19, 2012 Filing 34 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/10/2012, before Judge JOSEPH A. DICKSON. Court Reporter/Transcriber KLJ TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE/TERRY L. DEMARCO ((201) 703-1670). Tape Number: STATUS CONFERENCE. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 11/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2013. (ma)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ORDER: Following the in person status conference held on 10/10/12, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1) Defendants shall serve on plaintiff any Rule 11 motions for sanctions by no later than 10/25/12; 2) Defendants shall file motions to dismiss, not to exceed 50 pages per defendant, which shall include their motions for Rule 11 sanctions, by no later than 11/15/12; 3) Plaintiff shall file oppositions to defendants' motions to dismiss, not to exceed 50 pages each, by no later thatn 1/15/12; 4) Defendants shall file reply papers by no later thatn 2/15/13. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/10/12. (nm, )
October 10, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Status Conference held on 10/10/2012. (CD #ECR.) (nm, )
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER: In person Status Conference set for 10/10/2012 03:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. All procedural deadlines are hereby adjourned pending the conference.. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/21/12. (nm, )
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER ORDER granting deft's request to extend the deadline to file a response to the amended complt.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 8/21/2012. (nr, )
August 14, 2012 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by WASHINGTON ABANTO.(LI, FENG)
August 13, 2012 Filing 29 COURT'S LETTER from Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh dismissing as moot #28 Motion for Reconsideration, and that an Amended Complaint may be filed consistent w/this Court's #26 Opinion. (dc, )
August 12, 2012 Filing 28 MOTION for Reconsideration by WASHINGTON ABANTO. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(LI, FENG)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting deft's #10 Motion to Dismiss ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 7/30/2012. (nr, )
July 31, 2012 Filing 26 OPINION. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 7/30/2012. (nr, )
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER staying all discovery in this action until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/22/2012. (nr, )
March 21, 2012 Filing 24 Letter from Diane Bettino, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BETTINO, DIANE)
March 21, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Status Conference held on 3/21/2012. (CD #ECR.) (nm, )
March 9, 2012 Filing 23 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BANK OF AMERICA N.A. re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BETTINO, DIANE)
March 3, 2012 Filing 22 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PHILIP AVELLA, SHARON AVELLA, CHERYL BAKSH, HASSEB BAKSH, MARK C. BALAGTAS re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint (LI, FENG)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 LETTER ORDER granting pltf's counsel a two week extension to file an opposition brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 2/16/2012. (nr, )
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER ORDER advising pltf. that the Court will not consider the over-length briefs that were filed in each of the above captioned matters; if pltfs. wishes to file a new brief, in each matter, that complies with the Local Civil Rules, they may do so by 2/17/2012, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 2/9/2012. (nr, )
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: Any conferences currently pending are adjourned. In person Status Conference set for 3/21/2012 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 4A before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson.SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/30/12. (nm, ) Modified on 2/3/2012 (mn).
January 27, 2012 Filing 18 Letter from Diane Bettino, Esq. (BETTINO, DIANE)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson for all further proceedings. Judge Esther Salas, Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 1/26/12. (nic, ) (Main Document 17 replaced on 2/17/2012) (nic).
January 20, 2012 Filing 16 BRIEF in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by PHILIP AVELLA, SHARON AVELLA, CHERYL BAKSH, HASSEB BAKSH. (LI, FENG)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, (Initial Conference set for 2/21/2012 01:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 4C before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor.) A JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN MUST BE SUBMITTED 7 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE. CM/ECF IS MANDATORY FOR ALL FILINGS. Should you have any questions please call (973) 776-7862. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/19/12. (rac, )
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER adjouring the return date on the motion to dismiss to 2/21/2012. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 1/10/2012. (nr, )
January 11, 2012 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Motion set for 2/21/2012 10:00 AM before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
January 9, 2012 Filing 13 Letter from Diane Bettino, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BETTINO, DIANE)
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER ORDER granting request to extend briefing schedule on motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 12/28/2011. (nr, )
December 27, 2011 Filing 11 Letter from Feng Li, Esq.. (LI, FENG)
December 21, 2011 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Motion set for 1/17/2012 10:00 AM before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
December 21, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by BANK OF AMERICA N.A.. Responses due by 1/3/2012 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(BETTINO, DIANE)
December 14, 2011 Filing 9 Letter from Diane Bettino, Esq. to Clerk. (BETTINO, DIANE)
November 16, 2011 Filing 8 Letter from Diane A. Bettino, Esq. to Feng Li, Esquire. (BETTINO, DIANE)
November 3, 2011 CLERKS TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer - Document #4 submitted by Diane A. Bettino on 11/2/2011 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/18/2011 (nr, )
November 2, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH JANE KIM on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA N.A. (KIM, ELIZABETH)
November 2, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK S. MELODIA on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA N.A. (MELODIA, MARK)
November 2, 2011 Filing 5 Certification on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA N.A. Re #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Appearance. (BETTINO, DIANE)
November 2, 2011 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Bank of America, N.A... (BETTINO, DIANE)
November 2, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANE A. BETTINO on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA N.A. (BETTINO, DIANE)
September 28, 2011 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BANK, BANK OF AMERICA CARD SERVICES, BANK OF AMERICA CORP., BANK OF AMERICA N.A., BANK OF AMERICA PRIVATE WEALTH MANAGEMENT, BANK OF BOSTON CORP., BANK OF NEW ENGLAND CORP., BANK OF NEW YORK, BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, BANKAMERICA CORP., BARNETT BANKS, INC., BOATMAN'S BANCSHARES, C&S OF SOUTH CAROLINA, CITIZENS & SOUTHERN NATIONAL BANK, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, FIRST REPUBLIC BANK CORP., FLEET FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., FLEET/NORSTAR FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., FLEETBOSTON FINANCIAL CORP., JOHN DOE 1-10, MELLON NATIONAL, NATIONBANK CORP., NORTH CAROLINA NATIONAL BANK, SECURITY PACIFIC CORP., SHAWMUT NATIONAL CORP., SOVRAN FINANCIAL CORP., STANDARD FEDERAL BANK, N.A. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Nitza Creegan* (nic, )
September 22, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C&S OF SOUTH CAROLINA, AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BANK, BANK OF AMERICA CARD SERVICES, BANK OF AMERICA CORP., BANK OF AMERICA N.A., BANK OF AMERICA PRIVATE WEALTH MANAGEMENT, BANK OF BOSTON CORP., BANK OF NEW ENGLAND CORP., BANK OF NEW YORK, BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, BANKAMERICA CORP., BARNETT BANKS, INC., BOATMAN'S BANCSHARES, CITIZENS & SOUTHERN NATIONAL BANK, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, FIRST REPUBLIC BANK CORP., FLEET FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., FLEET/NORSTAR FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., FLEETBOSTON FINANCIAL CORP., JOHN DOE 1-10, MELLON NATIONAL, NATIONBANK CORP., NORTH CAROLINA NATIONAL BANK, SECURITY PACIFIC CORP., SHAWMUT NATIONAL CORP., SOVRAN FINANCIAL CORP., STANDARD FEDERAL BANK, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0312-3945565.) WITH JURY DEMAND., filed by MAXIMO C. NAPULI, VICTOR NAPENAS, ROSA MAGBAG, YOUNG J. LEE, ALFONSO BAUTISTA, GLORIA A. MANUEL, SANDRA JOYNER, RONALYN GEMINO, EMMER SANCHEZ, NORA E. VEGA, ALFREDO GARREON, JOHN SAYSON, SUNAZ NELIA, NEIL LADERA, YANG BLANCO, NICHETTE MEUSA, MANUELITO S. PABLO, CARLOS J. CANCIO, VIRGILIO SESE, C&S OF SOUTH CAROLINA, UPRENDRA METHA, RICHARD TAYLOR, AUREA REYES, MARIA SAYSON, ROSA REYNOSA, TERESITA CANCIO, JAY GEMINO, SHIRLEY E. THENSTEAD, MICHAEL DELPONTE, MARILOU LELINA, ALOHA SANCHEZ, AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BANK, MARIA T. KABIGTING, GERALDEZ MALLORI, WALTER E. VEGA, SHARON AVELLA, MICHAEL JOYNER, WASHINGTON ABANTO, PARUL METHA, MIGUELINA LOPEZ, MERSEDITA MARASIGAN, FRANCIS REYES, RODORA CARTASANO, ALI SALEH, LUIS A. SUAZO, PEDRO LOPEZ, MARINO TORRES, JIN ZHOU, FERMIN REYNOSA, JUAN C. SANCHEZ, CHEUNG LIN, RAMON CARTASANO, MARK C. BALAGTAS, PHILIP AVELLA, FLORA G. PABLO, MELISSA BATCHU, APRIL BLANCO, SANDRA C. SANCHEZ, WINIFREDA BAUTISTA, JOSEPH PRING, HASSEB BAKSH, SUZETTE T. NAPULI, CORAZON PRING, LORNA ROSEN, CHERYL BAKSH.(nic, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABANTO et al v. BANK OF AMERICA N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSA MAGBAG
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIGUELINA LOPEZ
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARINO TORRES
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARUL METHA
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HASSEB BAKSH
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK C. BALAGTAS
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA SAYSON
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL BAKSH
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WINIFREDA BAUTISTA
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORNA ROSEN
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPRENDRA METHA
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALFONSO BAUTISTA
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARILOU LELINA
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMER SANCHEZ
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY E. THENSTEAD
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YANG BLANCO
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANUELITO S. PABLO
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALDEZ MALLORI
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEIL LADERA
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA T. KABIGTING
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESITA CANCIO
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORAZON PRING
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA A. MANUEL
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA C. SANCHEZ
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA BATCHU
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD TAYLOR
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAXIMO C. NAPULI
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FERMIN REYNOSA
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIN ZHOU
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAY GEMINO
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODORA CARTASANO
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUREA REYES
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA JOYNER
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIP AVELLA
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APRIL BLANCO
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALYN GEMINO
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DELPONTE
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALI SALEH
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUZETTE T. NAPULI
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WASHINGTON ABANTO
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS A. SUAZO
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YOUNG J. LEE
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERSEDITA MARASIGAN
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSA REYNOSA
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTOR NAPENAS
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALOHA SANCHEZ
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH PRING
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLORA G. PABLO
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL JOYNER
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMON CARTASANO
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUNAZ NELIA
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEDRO LOPEZ
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHETTE MEUSA
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORA E. VEGA
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHEUNG LIN
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS J. CANCIO
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGILIO SESE
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON AVELLA
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCIS REYES
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN C. SANCHEZ
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALFREDO GARREON
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALTER E. VEGA
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN SAYSON
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH CAROLINA NATIONAL BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANKAMERICA CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLEET/NORSTAR FINANCIAL GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF BOSTON CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANDARD FEDERAL BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAWMUT NATIONAL CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLEETBOSTON FINANCIAL CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELLON NATIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA N.A.
Represented By: MARK S. MELODIA
Represented By: ELIZABETH J. KIM
Represented By: DIANE A. BETTINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONBANK CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA PRIVATE WEALTH MANAGEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BANK
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLEET FINANCIAL GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECURITY PACIFIC CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIZENS & SOUTHERN NATIONAL BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF NEW YORK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOVRAN FINANCIAL CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARNETT BANKS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST REPUBLIC BANK CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA CARD SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF NEW ENGLAND CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOATMAN'S BANCSHARES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&S OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By: FENG LI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?