HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. et al v. DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC.
Plaintiff: STRYKER IRELAND LTD. and HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP.
Defendant: DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. and WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC.
Not Yet Classified: SMITH & NEPHEW INC. and ZIMMER, INC.
Case Number: 2:2011cv06498
Filed: November 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Bergen
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2015 Filing 250 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq. re #243 Scheduling Order. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
December 18, 2014 ***Civil Case Terminated. (nr, )
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 249 FINAL JUDGMENT/ORDER of non infringement in favor of deft. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. and against pltf's Howmedica Osteonics Corp. and Stryker Ireland Ltd.; dismissing any remaining claims or counterclaims of the parties, w/out prejudice.. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 12/17/2014. (nr, )
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER deconsolidating this case from 11-6499, 11-6500 & 11-6511, each shall separately proceed under its respective original case number. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 12/17/2014. (nr, )
December 17, 2014 Filing 247 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq. re #246 Order Reopening Case. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER REOPENING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 12/3/2014. (nr, )
December 1, 2014 ***Civil Case Terminated. (nr, )
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting deft's #220 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting deft's #224 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting deft's #225 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 11/24/2014. (nr, )
November 24, 2014 Filing 244 OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 11/24/2014. (nr, )
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 243 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 2/2/2015 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 11/3/2014. (nr, )
September 11, 2014 Case REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo no longer assigned to the case. (jd, )
August 5, 2014 Filing 242 Redaction of #114 Transcript. (ma)
July 31, 2014 Filing 241 DECLARATION of Bradley T. Lennie re #240 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by SMITH & NEPHEW INC.. (Attachments: #1 Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Statement of Material Facts Not In Dispute, #2 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
July 31, 2014 Filing 240 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by SMITH & NEPHEW INC. re #220 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Clausen)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
July 31, 2014 Filing 239 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ZIMMER, INC. re #225 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Statement Reply to Response to Statement of Facts)(ENGLISH, BRIAN)
July 31, 2014 Filing 238 RESPONSE in Support filed by WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC. re #224 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit WMT's Responses to Plaintiff's Statement of Additional Facts, #2 Declaration of C. Kroon ISO Def. WMT's Reply Memorandum of Law ISO Its Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration)(WIGGINS, SHEILA)
July 24, 2014 Filing 237 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
July 17, 2014 Filing 236 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD. re #225 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Response to Zimmer's Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Declaration of Karl Leonard, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Certificate of Service)(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
July 17, 2014 Filing 235 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD. re #220 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Attachments: #1 Response to Smith & Nephew's Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Declaration of Karl Leonard, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Certificate of Service)(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
July 17, 2014 Filing 234 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD. re #224 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement (Attachments: #1 Response to Wright Medical's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Declaration of Karl Leonard, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Certificate of Service)(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting #229 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 6/27/14. (jd, )
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER granting #230 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 6/25/14. (jd, )
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting #219 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 6/27/14. (jd, )
June 13, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #230 MOTION to Seal ECF No. 221. Motion set for 7/7/2014 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
June 13, 2014 Filing 230 MOTION to Seal ECF No. 221 by SMITH & NEPHEW INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
June 9, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #229 MOTION to Seal Document . Motion set for 7/7/2014 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
June 9, 2014 Filing 229 MOTION to Seal Document by WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(WIGGINS, SHEILA)
June 9, 2014 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Motion to Seal Doc. #222 filed by S. WIGGINS on 6/6/2014 was submitted incorrectly as a Notice. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Motion USING Motion. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (nr, )
June 9, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #219 MOTION to Seal Document , #225 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #220 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. Motion set for 7/7/2014 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
June 6, 2014 Filing 228 DECLARATION of Kevin P. Wagner re #225 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ZIMMER, INC.. (ENGLISH, BRIAN)
June 6, 2014 Filing 227 Exhibit to #226 Declaration by ZIMMER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5)(ENGLISH, BRIAN)
June 6, 2014 Filing 226 DECLARATION of Bart C. Benedict re #225 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ZIMMER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(ENGLISH, BRIAN)
June 6, 2014 Filing 225 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ZIMMER, INC.. Responses due by 6/23/2014 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Declaration of Brian M. English, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5)(ENGLISH, BRIAN)
June 6, 2014 Filing 224 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC.. Responses due by 7/7/2014 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 Declaration of Christopher Kroon, #4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Christopher Kroon, #5 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Christopher Kroon, #6 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Christopher Kroon, #7 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Christopher Kroon, #8 Declaration of C. Brian McDaniel, #9 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of C. Brian McDaniel [REDACTED], #10 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of C. Brian McDaniel, #11 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of C. Brian McDaniel, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(WIGGINS, SHEILA)
June 6, 2014 Filing 223 DECLARATION of Bradley T. Lennie re #220 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by SMITH & NEPHEW INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
June 6, 2014 Filing 222 NOTICE by WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC. of Motion to Seal Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 5.3 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(WIGGINS, SHEILA)
June 6, 2014 Filing 221 Exhibit to #220 Motion for Summary Judgment, by SMITH & NEPHEW INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Jeff Shea (FILED UNDER SEAL))(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
June 6, 2014 Filing 220 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by SMITH & NEPHEW INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Defendant Smith & Nephew's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #2 Statement of Material Facts Not In Dispute, #3 Declaration of Jeff Shea, #4 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Jeff Shea, #5 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Jeff Shea, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
June 6, 2014 Filing 219 MOTION to Seal Document by ZIMMER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ENGLISH, BRIAN)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 218 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing all claim and defenses between Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc. against Stryker Ireland Ltd. with prejudice, etc.. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 6/2/2014. (nr, )
May 29, 2014 Filing 217 Letter from Natalie S. Richer, Esq., with proposed Joint Stipulated Order of Dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RICHER, NATALIE)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting #205 Motion to Seal exhibit C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 5/16/2014. (nr, )
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER denying #161 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b); the parties are directed to file their motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 5/15/2014. (nr, )
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 214 TEXT ORDER; Counsel should be advised that Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Final Judgment (Docket Entry # 161) is hereby dismissed as moot. All parties, including Defendant, Smith & Nephew, are directed to file their Motions for Summary Judgment in accordance with the schedule set forth in Docket Entry # 211. SO ORDERED by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 5/15/14. (cds, )
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 LETTER ORDER setting a briefing schedule on motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 5/15/2014. (nr, )
May 14, 2014 Filing 212 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Susan D. Wigenton, U.S.D.J. re #211 Letter, #207 Letter, #210 Letter. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
May 14, 2014 Filing 211 Letter from Brian M. English. (ENGLISH, BRIAN)
May 2, 2014 Filing 210 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Susan D. Wigenton, U.S.D.J. re #209 Letter. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
April 30, 2014 Filing 209 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq. re #207 Letter. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
April 21, 2014 Filing 208 Letter from DePuy to the Hon. Madeline C. Arleo, U.S.M.J. re #201 Letter, #202 Letter. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
April 21, 2014 Filing 207 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Susan D. Wigenton, U.S.D.J.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
April 15, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo: Settlement Conference held on 4/15/2014. (aa, )
April 15, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #205 MOTION to Seal . Motion set for 5/19/2014 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
April 14, 2014 Filing 206 Exhibit to #205 Motion to Seal by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD.. (RICHER, NATALIE)
April 14, 2014 Filing 205 MOTION to Seal by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Natalie S. Richer, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(RICHER, NATALIE)
April 14, 2014 Filing 204 Exhibit to #202 Letter by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD.. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM) Modified on 4/15/2014 (nr).(This document is a replacement for document No. 203)
April 14, 2014 Filing 203 Exhibit to #202 Letter by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD.. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
April 14, 2014 Filing 202 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq. re #201 Letter. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
April 2, 2014 Filing 201 Letter from DePuy to the Hon. Madeline C. Arleo, U.S.M.J.. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
April 1, 2014 >CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please disregard The Order document 200 appears to be filed in the incorrect case. Counsel please note that the Settlement conference is on for 4/15/14 at 10:00 am per the previously issued order (aa, )
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 TEXT ORDER, the Settlement Conference scheduled for 4/15/14 is rescheduled for 4/28/2014 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 4/1/14. (aa, )
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 TEXT ORDER, setting a Settlement Conference for 4/15/2014 at 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 4/1/14. (aa, )
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 198 TEXT ORDER, due to the weather forecast for 3/3/14 the settlement conference is cancelled. The parties are directed to advise the Court of alternative dates that they will be available in March. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 2/28/14. (aa, )
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 TEXT ORDER, the Settlement Conference is scheduled for 3/3/2014 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo. Counsel's attendance is required. Clients shall be available by phone. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 2/20/14. (aa, )
February 12, 2014 Filing 195 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq., regarding adjourned settlement conference re #194 Letter. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting #187 Motion to Seal exhibits 9-11 and 15 to Declaration of Brian M. English. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 2/11/2014. (nr, )
February 10, 2014 Filing 194 Letter from William Mentlik to Magistrate Judge Arleo re status/settlement re #191 Order, Set Deadlines, Set Deadlines/Hearings. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 FOURTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 4/30/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 9/23/2014.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 2/6/2014. (nr, )
January 31, 2014 Filing 192 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq. re #157 Scheduling Order,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 191 LETTER ORDER: In person Status/settlement Conference set for 2/13/2014 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 1/31/2014. (nr, )
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER reversing in part and affirming in part #159 Appeal Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 1/30/2014. (nr, )
January 30, 2014 Filing 189 OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 1/30/2014. (nr, )
December 18, 2013 Filing 188 Letter from DePuy on Behalf of All Defendants to the Hon. Susan D. Wigenton, U.S.D.J.. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
December 13, 2013 Set Deadlines as to #187 Joint MOTION to Seal Document #181 Exhibit (to Document), . Motion set for 1/6/2014 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
December 13, 2013 Filing 187 Joint MOTION to Seal Document #181 Exhibit (to Document), by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC., ZIMMER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ENGLISH, BRIAN)
December 9, 2013 Filing 186 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD. re #161 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karl Leonard with Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 185 TEXT ORDER, setting a telephone status conference for 2/3/2014 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 12/9/13. (aa, )
December 6, 2013 Filing 184 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq., Joint Status Letter. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 183 TEXT ORDER re #182 Letter; Request granted.. SO ORDERED by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 11/22/13. (cds, )
November 21, 2013 Filing 182 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq., requesting extension of time re #161 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
November 18, 2013 Filing 181 Exhibit to #180 Response in Opposition to Motion, by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC., ZIMMER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10 (Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 11 (Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 15 (Under Seal))(ENGLISH, BRIAN)
November 18, 2013 Filing 180 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC., ZIMMER, INC. re #161 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian M. English, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 16)(ENGLISH, BRIAN)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting Stryker's application to serve supplemental invalidity contentions; etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 11/1/2013. (nr, )
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 178 TEXT ORDER, at counsel's request the Telephone Status Conference is rescheduled for 12/9/2013 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo. Defense counsel shall initiate. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 11/1/13. (aa, )
November 1, 2013 Filing 177 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq., re discovery status conference. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
October 23, 2013 Filing 176 BRIEF in Opposition filed by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD. re #159 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. re #158 Order [SURREPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' APPEAL] (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 TEXT ORDER re #171 Letter; Stryker's request to file a surreply of not more than three pages is granted.. SO ORDERED by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 10/22/13. (cds, )
October 22, 2013 Filing 174 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Madeline Cox Arleo, U.S.M.J. Regarding Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Leave to File a Sur-Reply re #171 Letter. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
October 21, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo: Telephone Conference held on 10/21/2013. (aa, )
October 21, 2013 Filing 173 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I1, #10 Exhibit I2, #11 Exhibit J)(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
October 21, 2013 Filing 172 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #161 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
October 21, 2013 Filing 171 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq. re #163 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 TEXT ORDER the telephone conference scheduled for 10/21/13 at 1:00 p.m. is moved to 2:30 p.m. Defense counsel shall initiate. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 10/21/13. (aa, )
October 21, 2013 Filing 169 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #161 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . (ENGLISH, BRIAN)
October 18, 2013 Filing 168 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #161 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . (LIZZA, CHARLES)
October 18, 2013 Filing 167 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #161 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . (WIGGINS, SHEILA)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 TEXT ORDER, setting a telephone conference for 10/21/2013 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo. Defendants shall initiate. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 10/18/13. (aa, )
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 TEXT ORDER, the telephone conference currently scheduled for 10/17/13 is cancelled, the Court will go forward with the telephone conference on 11/4/13 at 12:00 p.m. Defense counsel shall initiate. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 10/16/13. (aa, )
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 TEXT ORDER, the telephone conference scheduled for 10/17/13 at 11:30 a.m. is moved to 4:30 p.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 10/16/13. (aa, )
October 15, 2013 Set Deadlines as to #161 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . Motion set for 11/18/2013 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
October 15, 2013 Filing 163 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. re #159 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. re #158 Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven L. Wood, #2 Certificate of Service)(LIZZA, CHARLES)
October 15, 2013 Filing 162 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq. re 150 Order, Set Hearings,,. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
October 15, 2013 Filing 161 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order (Alternate), #5 Certificate of Service)(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
October 7, 2013 Filing 160 Plaintiff's Brief by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD.. Defendant Brief due by 10/15/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
September 26, 2013 Set Deadlines as to #159 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. re #158 Order. Motion set for 10/21/2013 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
September 25, 2013 Filing 159 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. re #158 Order (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Charles M. Lizza, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(LIZZA, CHARLES)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER regarding pltf's waiver of the attorney client privilege during prosecution of U.S. Patent No. 6,475,243. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 9/10/2013. (nr, )
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 11/4/2013 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo. Fact Discovery due by 2/28/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 7/23/2014.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 9/10/2013. (nr, )
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER that defts' application to serve supplemental invalidity contentions is granted; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 8/29/13. (sr, )
August 29, 2013 Filing 155 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
August 29, 2013 Filing 154 Letter from Defendants to Hon. Madeline C. Arleo, USMJ. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
August 29, 2013 Filing 153 Letter from C. Lizza to Hon. Madeline C. Arleo, USMJ. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
August 27, 2013 Filing 152 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 14, 2013, before Judge MADELINE COX ARLEO. Court Reporter/Transcriber KING TRANSCRIPTION SERVICES/Sara L. Kern (973-237-6080). HEARING. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 9/17/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/27/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/25/2013. (ek)
August 21, 2013 Filing 151 Letter from Sheila R. Wiggins, Esq.. (WIGGINS, SHEILA)
August 14, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo: Discovery Hearing held on the record on 8/14/2013. (aa, )
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 TEXT ORDER, setting a Telephone Status Conference for 10/17/2013 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo. Three days in advance, the parties shall submit a status letter re: protocol for confidentiality designations and other scheduling/discovery issues. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 8/14/13. (aa, )
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER; hrg. set for 8/14/2013 at 12:P.M.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 7/25/2013. (nr, )
July 25, 2013 Filing 148 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Madeline C. Arleo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting #139 Motion to Seal exhibits G and H. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 7/11/2013. (nr, )
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 TEXT ORDER, setting an in-person oral argument hearing regarding the parties "various outstanding discovery disputes" for 8/14/2013 12:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo. Parties shall fax a joint proposed agenda for oral argument 24 hours in advance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 7/10/13. (aa, )
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER regarding request for a patent construction. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 7/9/2013. (nr, )
July 9, 2013 Filing 144 OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 6/9/2013. (nr, )
July 2, 2013 Filing 143 Letter from DePuy to the Hon. Madeline C. Arleo, U.S.M.J. re #135 Letter, #138 Letter. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
June 24, 2013 Filing 142 Letter from Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. in Support of Letter Brief for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(WIGGINS, SHEILA)
June 20, 2013 Filing 141 Letter from Sheila Raferty Wiggins, Esq. re #137 Letter. (WIGGINS, SHEILA)
June 19, 2013 Set Deadlines as to #139 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibits G and H Dkt.138. Motion set for 7/15/2013 10:00 AM before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
June 18, 2013 Filing 140 Exhibit to #138 Letter by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RICHER, NATALIE)
June 18, 2013 Filing 139 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibits G and H Dkt.138 by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Natalie S. Richer, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(RICHER, NATALIE)
June 17, 2013 Filing 138 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq. re #135 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
June 17, 2013 Filing 137 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq. re #133 Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
June 10, 2013 Filing 136 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq. re #135 Letter, #133 Brief. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
June 7, 2013 Filing 135 Letter from DePuy to the Hon. Madeline C. Arleo, U.S.M.J.. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting deft's application for pro hac vice admission of Jeya Paul. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 6/5/2013. (nr, )
June 6, 2013 Filing 133 BRIEF Letter Brief re: ANCA Supplementation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(WIGGINS, SHEILA)
May 31, 2013 Filing 132 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Shawn M. Taylor to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RICHER, NATALIE)
May 30, 2013 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW017064 Re Sean M. Taylor (nr, )
May 24, 2013 Filing 131 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michelle Replogle to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RICHER, NATALIE)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER admitting Shawn M. Taylor pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 5/21/2013. (nr, )
May 21, 2013 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW016993 Re Michelle Replogle (nr, )
May 16, 2013 Filing 129 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 2, 2013, before Judge SUSAN D. WIGENTON. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carmen Liloia (973-477-9704). Tape Number: MARKMAN HEARING. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 6/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/17/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2013. (ek)
May 9, 2013 Filing 128 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan D. Wigenton: Markman Hearing continued on 5/9/2013. (Court Reporter/Recorder Carmen Liloia.) (cds, )
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER admitting Michelle Replogle pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 5/8/2013. (nr, )
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER consolidating this matter with Civil Nos. 11-6499, 11-6500, & 11-6511 for all purposes under 11-6498. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 5/8/2013. (nr, )
May 7, 2013 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by SHEILA RAFTERY WIGGINS on behalf of WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC. (WIGGINS, SHEILA)
May 7, 2013 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by SHEILA RAFTERY WIGGINS on behalf of WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC. (WIGGINS, SHEILA)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 TEXT ORDER; Continuation of Markman Hearing is set for 5/9/13 at 10:00 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 5C. SO ORDERED by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 5/3/13. (cds, )
May 2, 2013 Filing 122 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan D. Wigenton: Markman Hearing held on 5/2/2013; hearing to be continued 5/9/13 at 10:00 a.m.. (Court Reporter/Recorder Carmen Liloia.) (cds, )
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #120 Motion to Seal the transcript of 3/15/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 4/17/2013. (nr, )
April 12, 2013 Set Deadlines as to #120 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of the March 15, 2013 Transcript of Proceedings before the Honorable Madeline C. Arleo, U.S.M.J. (D.I. 114). Motion set for 5/6/2013 10:00 AM before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
April 11, 2013 Filing 120 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of the March 15, 2013 Transcript of Proceedings before the Honorable Madeline C. Arleo, U.S.M.J. (D.I. 114) by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(LIZZA, CHARLES)
April 10, 2013 Filing 119 Letter from Sheila Wiggins in connection with Defendants' Letter Motion Concerning Waiver of the Attorney-Client Privilege filed in Case No. 11-6499. (Attachments: #1 2013 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 37329)(WIGGINS, SHEILA)
April 10, 2013 Filing 118 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq. re #117 Letter. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
March 29, 2013 Filing 117 Letter from (Joint Reply Letter to Honorable Madeline Cox Arleo from Attorney Christopher Kroon re Plaintiffs' Waiver of the Attorney-Client Privilege) re #105 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(WIGGINS, SHEILA)
March 28, 2013 Filing 116 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction re #114 Transcript,, by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN (SULLIVAN, SARAH)
March 25, 2013 Filing 115 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq., to the Honorable Madeline Cox Arleo, U.S.M.J., Enclosing Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Answer Interrogatories. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
March 21, 2013 Filing 114 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/15/2013, before Judge MADELIN ARLEO SEALED pursuant to Order 121. Clerk's Note: This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. Modified on 4/22/2013 (ek).
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting Stryker's application to serve supplemental invalidity contentions, etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 3/15/2013. (nr, )
March 15, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo: Oral Argument held on 3/15/2013. (CD #ECR.) (mw, )
March 15, 2013 Filing 112 Letter from Brian M. English. (ENGLISH, BRIAN)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 TEXT ORDER- Oral Argument on plaintiffs/counterclaim defendants' pending application to Amend their Invalidity Contentions (11-6498, Dkt. Entry 85) as well as a hearing on the discovery disputes outlined in attorney Calmanns February 27, 2013 letter and attorney Kroons February 27, 2013 letter, scheduled for Friday, March 15, 2013 at 11:30 am in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo, is rescheduled for 12:30 p.m. on Friday, March 15, 2013. Your attendance is required.SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 3/13/2013. (mw, )
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 3/12/2013. (nr, )
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 TEXT ORDER;(Markman Hearing set for 5/2/2013 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5C.)ORDERED by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 3/12/13. (cds, )
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 TEXT ORDER re 101 Order; The Text Order of 2/26/13 (Dkt. Entry 101) is vacated as Plaintiff's opposition had not yet been filed. Having reviewed the request along with the submitted opposition, counsel are advised that motions for summary judgment on the issue of invalidity for lack of written description are not to be filed for consideration simultaneous to the Court's determination on the Markman issues. Counsel for Defendant, DePuy Orthapaedics is directed to withdraw their summary judgment motion filed on 3/8/13 (Dkt. Entry 106). ORDERED by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 3/12/13. (cds, )
March 11, 2013 Filing 107 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq., re First Amended Scheduling Order (Dkt. 50 in 11-cv-6499). (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
March 11, 2013 Set Deadlines as to #106 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 4/1/2013 10:00 AM before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
March 8, 2013 Filing 106 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC.. Responses due by 3/18/2013 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ENGLISH, BRIAN)
March 6, 2013 Filing 105 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq. re #103 Brief. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
February 28, 2013 Filing 104 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq. re #95 Letter. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
February 28, 2013 Filing 103 BRIEF (Letter) from Christopher S. Kroon to Hon. Madeline Cox Arleo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(WIGGINS, SHEILA)
February 27, 2013 Filing 102 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Madeline Cox Arleo, U.S.M.J.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 TEXT ORDER re #95 Letter; Request granted. ORDERED by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 2/26/13. (cds, )
February 25, 2013 Filing 100 MARKMAN RESPONSE BRIEF re #84 Markman Opening Brief (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
February 25, 2013 Filing 99 MARKMAN RESPONSE BRIEF re #82 Markman Opening Brief (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LIZZA, CHARLES)
February 25, 2013 Filing 98 MARKMAN RESPONSE BRIEF re #81 Markman Opening Brief (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Lizza, #2 Certificate of Service)(LIZZA, CHARLES)
February 25, 2013 Filing 97 MARKMAN RESPONSE BRIEF re #83 Markman Opening Brief (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karl Leonard, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H, #5 Exhibit I, #6 Certificate of Service)(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
February 25, 2013 Filing 96 BRIEF Defendants' Joint Responsive Markman Brief (ENGLISH, BRIAN)
February 22, 2013 Filing 95 Letter from William H. Trousdale. (ENGLISH, BRIAN)
February 20, 2013 Filing 94 Letter from William H. Trousdale. (ENGLISH, BRIAN)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting deft's application to serve supplemental invalidity contentions; etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 2/15/2013. (nr, )
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 TEXT ORDER. Oral Argument on plaintiffs/counterclaim defendants' pending application to Amend their Invalidity Contentions (Dkt. Entry 85) is scheduled for Friday, March 15, 2013 at 11:30 am in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo. Your attendance is required. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 2/15/2013(Miller, S)
January 28, 2013 Filing 91 Letter from DePuy to the Hon. Madeline C. Arleo, U.S.M.J. re #90 Letter, #89 Letter, #85 Letter. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
January 18, 2013 Filing 90 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq. re #89 Letter. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
January 11, 2013 Filing 89 Letter from DePuy to the Hon. Madeline C. Arleo, U.S.M.J. re #85 Letter. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting pltf's request to extend discovery deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 1/8/2013. (nr, )
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 1/8/2013. (nr, )
January 2, 2013 Filing 86 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq. re #74 Brief,. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
January 2, 2013 Filing 85 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq., Requesting Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
December 21, 2012 Filing 84 MARKMAN OPENING BRIEF for U.S. Patent No. 6,610,097 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Charles M. Lizza, #2 Certificate of Service)(LIZZA, CHARLES)
December 21, 2012 Filing 83 MARKMAN OPENING BRIEF Supplemental Opening Markman Brief for U.S. Patent No. 6,475,243 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Charles M. Lizza, #2 Certificate of Service)(LIZZA, CHARLES)
December 21, 2012 Filing 82 MARKMAN OPENING BRIEF for U.S. Patent No. 6,475,243 (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E, #6 Declaration of Karl Leonard, #7 Certificate of Service)(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
December 21, 2012 Filing 81 MARKMAN OPENING BRIEF for U.S. Patent No. 6,610,097 (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E, #6 Declaration of Karl Leonard, #7 Certificate of Service)(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
December 21, 2012 Filing 80 Exhibit to #79 Declaration, by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Exhibit 16, #6 Exhibit 17, #7 Exhibit 18, #8 Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit 20, #10 Exhibit 21, #11 Exhibit 22, #12 Exhibit 23, #13 Exhibit 24, #14 Exhibit 25, #15 Exhibit 26, #16 Exhibit 27, #17 Exhibit 28, #18 Exhibit 29, #19 Exhibit 30)(ENGLISH, BRIAN)
December 21, 2012 Filing 79 DECLARATION of Brian M. English in Support of Defendants' Joint Opening Markman Brief re #78 Brief by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 Part 1, #5 Exhibit 4 Part 2, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(ENGLISH, BRIAN)
December 21, 2012 Filing 78 BRIEF Defendants' Joint Opening Markman Brief) (ENGLISH, BRIAN)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 LETTER ORDER granting Stryker's application to permit Messrs. Zarnowski and Plaskon, two nonattorney business executives, to access confidential material; denying deft's request for a protective order regarding same; denying the Zimmer defts' request to extend the patent prosecution bar to exclude individuals who have accessed confidential materials from participating in reexamination proceedings, etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 12/19/2012. (nr, )
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 LETTER ORDER granting deft. DePuy's request for leave to file an additional brief of no more than 5 pages to address its claim construction argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 12/18/2012. (nr, )
December 17, 2012 Filing 75 Letter from DePuy to the Hon. Madeline C. Arleo, U.S.M.J.. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
December 12, 2012 Filing 74 BRIEF -- Letter Brief for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bradley T. Lennie, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C (Part 1 of 2), #5 Exhibit C (Part 2 of 2), #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting DePuy's #65 Motion to Seal portions of the Oct. 26, 2012 letter & exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 12/7/2012. (nr, )
November 19, 2012 Filing 72 STATEMENT (Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement for U.S. Patent No. 6,475,243) by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD.. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
November 19, 2012 Filing 71 STATEMENT (Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement for U.S. Patent No. 6,610,097) by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD.. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
November 15, 2012 Filing 70 Letter from DePuy to the Hon. Madeline C. Arleo, U.S.M.J. re #69 Letter, #66 Letter. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
November 6, 2012 Filing 69 Letter from William L. Mentlik to the Hon. Madeline Cox Arleo, U.S.M.J., re #66 Letter. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
November 1, 2012 Set Deadlines as to #68 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Unopposed). Motion set for 12/3/2012 10:00 AM before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
November 1, 2012 Filing 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Unopposed) by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
October 26, 2012 Set Deadlines as to #65 MOTION to Seal Certain Materials Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 5.3. Motion set for 11/19/2012 10:00 AM before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
October 26, 2012 Filing 67 Letter from DePuy to the Hon. Madeline C. Arleo, U.S.M.J. (public version). (LIZZA, CHARLES)
October 26, 2012 Filing 66 Letter from DePuy to the Hon. Madeline C. Arleo, U.S.M.J. (confidential version). (LIZZA, CHARLES)
October 26, 2012 Filing 65 MOTION to Seal Certain Materials Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 5.3 by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(LIZZA, CHARLES)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 TEXT ORDER - A Conference Call is set for 11/1/2012 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo to address all outstanding discovery disputes as outlined in attorney Sheila Wiggins' status letter dated October 15, 2012 [Document 65]. Ms. Wiggins is to initiate.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 10/16/2012. (kd)
September 26, 2012 Filing 63 Letter from William H. Trousdale re #62 Letter. (ENGLISH, BRIAN)
September 25, 2012 Filing 62 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq. re Discovery Hearing. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
September 24, 2012 Filing 61 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq., re Dkt.59 in 11-cv-6500. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
August 28, 2012 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by APRIL M.M. CAPATI on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CAPATI, APRIL)
August 24, 2012 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW T. LANE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LANE, ANDREW)
August 22, 2012 Filing 58 Letter from DePuy to the Hon. Madeline C. Arleo, U.S.M.J. re: Discovery Confidentiality Order. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
August 22, 2012 Filing 57 Letter from William H. Trousdale. (ENGLISH, BRIAN)
August 22, 2012 Filing 56 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq., re proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
August 15, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo: Oral Argument held on 8/15/2012, on the record. (CD #12-08K, 2:15.) (kd)
August 7, 2012 Filing 55 Letter from William H. Trousdale. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(ENGLISH, BRIAN)
August 7, 2012 Filing 54 Letter from DePuy to the Hon. Madeline C. Arleo, U.S.M.J. re #51 Letter. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
August 7, 2012 Filing 53 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq., re proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order re #52 Letter. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
July 24, 2012 Filing 52 Letter from DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. to Hon. Madeline C. Arleo, U.S.M.J.. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
July 24, 2012 Filing 51 Letter from Natalie S. Richer, Esq. re Status Conference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(RICHER, NATALIE)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 7/17/2012. (nr, )
July 16, 2012 Filing 49 Letter from Natalie S. Richer, Esq., with proposed First Amended Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RICHER, NATALIE)
July 10, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo: Status Conference Call held on 7/10/2012. (CD #12-07K, 11:41.) (kd)
July 6, 2012 Filing 48 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq. - Joint Status Letter (CORRECTED). (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
July 6, 2012 Filing 47 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq. - Joint Status Letter. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
June 1, 2012 Filing 46 Letter from DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. to Hon. Madeline C. Arleo, U.S.M.J.. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
June 1, 2012 Filing 45 Letter from William L. Mentlik to the Hon. Madeline Cox Arleo, U.S.M.J. re #40 Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Discovery Confidentiality Order - Stryker's version))(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
May 24, 2012 Filing 44 Letter from Natalie S. Richer, Esq. re #43 Letter. (RICHER, NATALIE)
May 17, 2012 Filing 43 Letter from Natalie S. Richer, Esq. re #40 Scheduling Order. (RICHER, NATALIE)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATED ORDER establishing protocol for discovery of electronically stored information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 5/10/2012. (nr, )
May 7, 2012 Filing 41 Letter from Natalie S. Richer, Esq. with Stipulated Order Establishing Protocol for Discovery of Electronically Stored Information re #40 Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RICHER, NATALIE)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING ORDER: In person Status Conference set for 7/10/2012 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo. Amended Pleadings due by 1/14/2013.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 4/23/2012. (nr, )
April 20, 2012 Filing 39 Letter from Natalie S. Richer, Esq., with Proposed Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RICHER, NATALIE)
April 17, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo: Scheduling Conference held on 4/17/2012, on the record (In Person Conference set for 7/10/2012 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo.). (CD #12-4K, 11:49.)(kd)
April 13, 2012 Filing 38 Joint Discovery Plan by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RICHER, NATALIE)
March 16, 2012 Filing 37 Letter from William L. Mentlik to the Hon. Madeline Cox Arleo, U.S.M.J. re #36 Letter. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
March 9, 2012 Filing 36 Letter from DePuy to the Hon. Madeline C. Arleo, U.S.M.J. re 32 Order, #33 Letter. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ORDER - Rescheduling a Scheduling Conference from March 29, 2012 to APRIL 17, 2012 at 11:30 am in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge Madeline Cox Arleo.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 3/9/2012. (kd)
March 8, 2012 Filing 34 ANSWER to Counterclaim by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
March 2, 2012 Filing 33 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq. to the Hon. Madeline Cox Arleo, U.S.M.J. re 32 Order,. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER - By or before March 1, 2012, plaintiffs shall file a letter brief outlining the reasons for supporting consolidation. Any opposition shall be filed by March 9, 2012; reply by March 16, 2012. The Court will address the issue at the March 29, 2012 scheduling conference.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 2/29/2012. (kd)
February 28, 2012 Filing 31 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Karl A. Leonard to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RICHER, NATALIE)
February 28, 2012 Filing 30 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jovial Wong to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RICHER, NATALIE)
February 28, 2012 Filing 29 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Bradley C. Graveline to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RICHER, NATALIE)
February 28, 2012 Filing 28 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice George C. Lombardi to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RICHER, NATALIE)
February 27, 2012 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT RICHARD SAMAY on behalf of HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD. (SAMAY, SCOTT)
February 24, 2012 Filing 26 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq., re possible consolidation re 19 Order,,. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
February 17, 2012 Filing 25 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kenneth S. Luchesi, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-4192503.) (LIZZA, CHARLES)
February 17, 2012 Filing 24 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David M. Maiorana, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-4192492.) (LIZZA, CHARLES)
February 17, 2012 Filing 23 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Patrick J. Norton, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-4192475.) (LIZZA, CHARLES)
February 17, 2012 Filing 22 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Calvin P. Griffith, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-4192451.) (LIZZA, CHARLES)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER admitting George C. Lombardi, Bradley C. Graveline, Jovial Wong and Karl A. Leonard pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 2/15/2012. (nr, )
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER admitting Calvin P. Griffith, Patrick J. Norton, David M. Maiorana and Kenneth S. Luchesi pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 2/15/2012. (nr, )
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER - A Joint Scheduling Conference on the four actions is scheduled for March 29, 2012 at 12:00 pm in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Given the commonality of issues and claims, the Court is inclined to consolidate/coordinate the four actions for discovery purposes only. Any opposition to such consolidation/coordination shall be filed by March 9, 2012; reply by March 16, 2012. The Court will address the issue on March 29, 2012 at the Scheduling Conference.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 2/17/2012. (kd)
February 15, 2012 Filing 18 Letter from DePuy to the Hon. Madeline C. Arleo, U.S.M.J. re #15 Letter. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
February 14, 2012 Filing 17 APPLICATION/PETITION for for the Admission Pro Hac Vice of Calvin P. Griffith, Patrick J. Norton, David M. Maiorana, and Kenneth S. Luchesi for by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of C. Lizza, #2 Certification of C. Griffith, #3 Certification of P. Norton, #4 Certification of D. Maiorana, #5 Certification of K. Luchesi, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(LIZZA, CHARLES)
February 14, 2012 Filing 16 Letter from Natalie S. Richer, Esq., with attached pro hac vice documents. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Natalie S. Richer, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of George C. Lombardi, #4 Declaration of Bradley C. Graveline, #5 Declaration of Jovial Wong, #6 Declaration of Karl A. Leonard)(RICHER, NATALIE)
February 14, 2012 Filing 15 Letter from William L. Mentlik, Esq., regarding possisble consolidation. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
February 13, 2012 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD. by DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only) of DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., #2 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only) of DePuy Products, Inc., #3 Certificate of Service)(LIZZA, CHARLES)
February 10, 2012 Update Answer Due 2/13/12 Deadline as to DePuy (jd, )
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time by which deft DePuy must answer Complaint is extended to 2/13/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 2/8/12. (jd, )
February 3, 2012 Filing 12 Letter from Defendant DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. to the Hon. Madeline C. Arleo, U.S.M.J.. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
January 4, 2012 Update Answer Due Deadline as to deft. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. to answer by 2/6/2012 (mn, ) Modified on 1/17/2012 (mn).
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deft's time to file an answer to 2/6/2012. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arlio on 12/16/2011. (nr, )
December 15, 2011 Filing 10 Letter from Defendant DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. to the Hon. Madeline C. Arleo, U.S.M.J.. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
December 15, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN HENSLER on behalf of DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. (HENSLER, SARAH)
December 8, 2011 CLERKS TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer - Document #8 submitted by Charles M. Lizza on 12/6/2011 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/21/2011 (nr, )
December 6, 2011 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Demand for Trial by Jury.. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
December 6, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA on behalf of DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
December 5, 2011 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD.. DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. served on 11/16/2011, answer due 12/7/2011. (MENTLIK, WILLIAM)
November 15, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by NATALIE SUE RICHER on behalf of HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD. (RICHER, NATALIE)
November 15, 2011 Filing 4 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (tjg, )
November 10, 2011 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *TIMOTHY GORMAN* (tjg, )
November 4, 2011 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent. (tjg, )
November 4, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0312-4021294.) JURY DEMAND., filed by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., STRYKER IRELAND LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(tjg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. et al v. DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRYKER IRELAND LTD.
Represented By: APRIL M.M. CAPATI
Represented By: NATALIE SUE RICHER
Represented By: ANDREW T. LANE
Represented By: SCOTT RICHARD SAMAY
Represented By: WILLIAM L. MENTLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP.
Represented By: APRIL M.M. CAPATI
Represented By: NATALIE SUE RICHER
Represented By: ANDREW T. LANE
Represented By: SCOTT RICHARD SAMAY
Represented By: WILLIAM L. MENTLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SMITH & NEPHEW INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY S. SOOS
Represented By: GERI L. ALBIN
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ZIMMER, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN M. ENGLISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC.
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC.
Represented By: SHEILA RAFTERY WIGGINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?