CUSTIN v. WIRTHS
Plaintiff: JOHN M. CUSTIN
Defendant: HAROLD J. WIRTHS
Case Number: 2:2012cv00910
Filed: February 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Passaic
Presiding Judge: Faith S. Hochberg
Presiding Judge: Patty Shwartz
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 253 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 3/25/2020. (bt, )
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 LETTER OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 146 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/8/17. (sr, )
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 03/22/2016. (ek)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 OPINION fld. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 1/31/14. (sr, )
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 LETTER-OPINION/ORDER denying 65 Motion to Seal and Plaintiffs ex parte submission shall be returned to Plaintiff (but will not be uploaded in the electronic filing of this Letter Opinion and Order).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/4/13. (DD, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CUSTIN v. WIRTHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN M. CUSTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAROLD J. WIRTHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?