UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ALSOL CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: ALSOL CORPORATION, SB BUILDING ASSOCIATES, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, SB BUILDING GP, L.L.C., UNITED STATES LAND RESOURCES, L.P., UNITED STATES REALTY RESOURCES, INC., LAWRENCE S. BERGER and 3.60 ACRES OF LAND
Case Number: 2:2013cv00380
Filed: January 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Morris
Presiding Judge: Katharine S. Hayden
Presiding Judge: Patty Shwartz
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9607 Real Property Tort to Land
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 OPINION. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 3/19/2021. (bt, )
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 OPINION AND ORDER that upon reconsideration, the Government's motion to strike Defendants' jury demand is granted, and RECOMMENDED the District Judge deny Defendants' request for permission to file an interlocutory appeal. Any appeal or objection submitted to the District Judge shall conform to Local Civil Rule 72.1(c), with no extensions of time permitted unless otherwise provided by Rule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/17/17. (sr, )
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 OPINION fld. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/10/14. (sr, )
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 7 Motion ; granting 14 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 1/2/14. (rg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ALSOL CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: BRADLEY LIGHT LEVINE
Represented By: ALLAN B.K. URGENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALSOL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB BUILDING ASSOCIATES, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB BUILDING GP, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES LAND RESOURCES, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES REALTY RESOURCES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE S. BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.60 ACRES OF LAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?