SWIFT v. PANDEY et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT SWIFT
Defendant: RAMESH PANDEY, BHUWAN PANDEY and ABHILASHA PANDEY
Case Number: 2:2013cv00650
Filed: January 31, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Hammer
Presiding Judge: Jose L. Linares
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 349 OPINION. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 4/7/2020. (bt, )
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 264 OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 05/22/2018. (ek)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 229 OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/12/17. (sr, )
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 OPINION. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 3/27/17. (DD, ) N/M
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 OPINION. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 8/10/16. (dc, )
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 OPINION. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 03/22/2016. (ek)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 LETTER ORDER denying 114 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 11/30/15. (sr, )
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/30/15. (DD, )
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 OPINION fld. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 9/8/15. (sr, )
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Opinion and Order denying application for Pro Bono Counsel for BHUWAN PANDEY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 12/3/14. (jd, )
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 OPINION fld. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 7/8/14. (sr, )
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 OPINION fld. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 4/30/14. (sr, )
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPINION fld. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 11/13/13. (sr, )
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPINION fld. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 7/1/13. (sr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SWIFT v. PANDEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT SWIFT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAMESH PANDEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHUWAN PANDEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABHILASHA PANDEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?