F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC. et al v. NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC. et al
Plaintiff: RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OHIO, INC., Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., PHYLLIS ROSEN, STEPHANIE B. CROSBY, TOM WARE, SHERYL HALEY, KATRINA BONAR, F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., HARTLEY BUICK/GMC TRUCK, INC. d/b/a HARTLEY HONDA, INTERESTED PARTY, MATTHEW RIGHETTI, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF KANSAS, INC., Cargo Agents, Inc., Christie Laster, STEVEN BRUZONSKY, Monica Brushey, Roberta Rothsetin, ROBERT O'ROURKE, Melinda Deneau, GENERAL MOTORS LLC, GUSTAVO ADOLFO PEREZ, John Leyva, KATHLEEN C. DAVIS, EMPIRE NISSAN OF SANTA ROSA, LLC, DANIEL MORRIS, BETHANNE KNUDSON, WILDA J. NIN-PACHECO, JEFFREY GANNON, GREG DANA, PENDRELL JACKSON, JENNIFER DILLON, JOE GROJEAN, ALEX WHITE, ELIZABETH POWERS KELLER, SCOTLAND CAR YARD ENTERPRISES d/b/a SAN RAFAEL MITSUBISHI, MICHAEL JACKSON, ESTEBAN ADAME, MARY G. BISSEN, JEFF RUBINSTEIN, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF FLORIDA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OKLAHOMA, INC., ROSS STASIK, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, MATTHEW HEILICHER, SHARON HAMPSON, PAMELA E. GOESSLING, Jill M. Alban, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF GEORGIA, INC., CRYSTAL BOYKIN, ADAIR LARA, MARY ARNOLD, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF UTAH, INC.,, ASHTON LEVIS, DIANE DAVID, JUDY SMITH, Antonio Maravilla, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., SEAN SPICER, Joan MacQuarrie, HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, DODA CAMAJ, RITA M. CLOWARD, ERIC L. METH, MANACO INTERNATIONAL FORWARDERS, INC., Sean Gurney, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF IDAHO, INC., INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP., ALAN FRONT, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, HUDSON NISSAN, BRUCE HERTZ, CATHERINE TAYLOR, ELIZABETH ALLIS, Elizabeth Ashley Hill, RITA DIEL-BROWN, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF COLORADO, INC., NICHOLAS LETOURNEAU, Automobile Dealership Plaintiffs, Al Baker, CRAIG BUSKE, LORI CURTIS, Brenda Keegan, Toyota of Bristol, WILLIAM ELWOOD, DAVID SCHROEDER, Maria Kooker, JUDY A. REIBER, DARREL SENIOR, Alexandra Scott, Demian Vargas, HODGES IMPORTED CARS, INC d/b/a HODGES SUBARU, KENNETH A. NELSON, JERRY DAVID, Grant M. Alban, EMILY FERRIS, TIFFANY BUI, JENNIFER FROZENA, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF TEXAS, LP., Leslie Denise Hart, PAULA OCHSNER, TUAN NGUYEN, EUGENE THOMAS GOESSLING, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF ARIZONA, INC., TONY NIKPRELAJ, PANAMA CITY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC d/b/a JOHN LEE NISSAN, Kori Lehrkamp, Emmett Brophy, LAZARO VERSALLES, JOSHUA SO and Richard Tomasko
Defendant: TOYOFUJI SHIPPING CO. LTD., COMPANIA SUD AMERICANA DE VAPORES S.A., NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC., Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), NIPPON YUSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA, World Logistics Service (U.S.A.), Inc., AUTOTRANS AS (France), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US), KAWASAKI KISEN KAISHA, LTD., "K" LINE AMERICA, INC., World Transport Co. Ltd., MOL (AMERICA), INC., CSAV AGENCY, LLC, American Shipping and Logistics Inc., American Roll-On Roll-Off Carrier, LLC, WWL Vehicle Services Americas Inc., American Logistics Network, LLC, WALLENIUS LINES AB, EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., Hoegh Autoliners Holdings AS (Norway), MOL Logistics (USA), Inc., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, Mitsui O.S.K. Bulk Shipping (U.S.A.), Inc., MITSUI O.S.K. LINES, LTD.,, American Auto Logistics, LP, WILH WILHELMSEN ASA, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, Americana De Vapores S.A., Alliance Navigation LLC (US), WILH WILHELMSEN HOLDING ASA and NISSAN MOTOR CAR CARRIER CO., LTD
In Re: VEHICLE CARRIER SERVICES ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2013cv03306
Filed: May 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Hudson
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2017 ***Civil Case Terminated. (DD, )
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER that a mandate having been issued by the Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit on March 2, 2017 the Clerk of Court shall CLOSE this matter. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/22/17. (DD, )
March 3, 2017 Pursuant to Local Rule 79.4, notice is hereby given of the Appellate ruling filed on 03/02/2017.. In the event that the mandate or judgment provides for costs or directs a disposition other than an affirmance, the prevailing party shall prepare and submit an order implementing the mandate or judgment. (db, )
March 2, 2017 Filing 330 MANDATE of USCA as to #310 Notice of Appeal (USCA),,, filed by SCOTLAND CAR YARD ENTERPRISES d/b/a SAN RAFAEL MITSUBISHI, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, Toyota of Bristol, EMPIRE NISSAN OF SANTA ROSA, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, HARTLEY BUICK/GMC TRUCK, INC. d/b/a HARTLEY HONDA, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, PANAMA CITY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC d/b/a JOHN LEE NISSAN, HUDSON NISSAN, HODGES IMPORTED CARS, INC d/b/a HODGES SUBARU, #312 Notice of Appeal (USCA),,,,,, filed by Al Baker, JEFFREY GANNON, Jill M. Alban, Christie Laster, DODA CAMAJ, JEFF RUBINSTEIN, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OKLAHOMA, INC., Leslie Denise Hart, TONY NIKPRELAJ, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF KANSAS, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF GEORGIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF ARIZONA, INC., SHERYL HALEY, Jennifer Dillon, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., Sean Gurney, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OHIO, INC., Richard Tomasko, Alexandra Scott, BRUCE HERTZ, ADAIR LARA, JUDY A. REIBER, KATRINA BONAR, Maria Kooker, Kori Lehrkamp, STEVEN BRUZONSKY, Demian Vargas, Grant M. Alban, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF COLORADO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., Melinda Deneau, GUSTAVO ADOLFO PEREZ, STEPHANIE B. CROSBY, Elizabeth Ashley Hill, CRAIG BUSKE, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF UTAH, INC.,, Monica Brushey, DANIEL MORRIS, JENNIFER DILLON, Joan MacQuarrie, JUDY SMITH, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF TEXAS, LP., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF IDAHO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF FLORIDA, INC., EUGENE THOMAS GOESSLING, CATHERINE TAYLOR, Roberta Rothsetin, Emmett Brophy, PAMELA E. GOESSLING, John Leyva, #286 Notice of Appeal (USCA),,,,, filed by Al Baker, JEFFREY GANNON, Jill M. Alban, MARY ARNOLD, Christie Laster, DODA CAMAJ, JEFF RUBINSTEIN, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OKLAHOMA, INC., Leslie Denise Hart, TONY NIKPRELAJ, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF KANSAS, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF GEORGIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF ARIZONA, INC., SHERYL HALEY, Jennifer Dillon, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., Sean Gurney, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OHIO, INC., Richard Tomasko, Alexandra Scott, BRUCE HERTZ, ADAIR LARA, KATRINA BONAR, JUDY A. REIBER, Maria Kooker, Kori Lehrkamp, STEVEN BRUZONSKY, Demian Vargas, Grant M. Alban, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF COLORADO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., Melinda Deneau, GUSTAVO ADOLFO PEREZ, STEPHANIE B. CROSBY, Elizabeth Ashley Hill, CRAIG BUSKE, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF UTAH, INC.,, Monica Brushey, DANIEL MORRIS, JENNIFER DILLON, Joan MacQuarrie, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF TEXAS, LP., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF IDAHO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF FLORIDA, INC., EUGENE THOMAS GOESSLING, CATHERINE TAYLOR, Roberta Rothsetin, Emmett Brophy, PAMELA E. GOESSLING, John Leyva, #285 Notice of Appeal (USCA),,, filed by PANAMA CITY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC d/b/a JOHN LEE NISSAN, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., HUDSON NISSAN, HODGES IMPORTED CARS, INC d/b/a HODGES SUBARU, SCOTLAND CAR YARD ENTERPRISES d/b/a SAN RAFAEL MITSUBISHI, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, EMPIRE NISSAN OF SANTA ROSA, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, HARTLEY BUICK/GMC TRUCK, INC. d/b/a HARTLEY HONDA (Finance notified) (Attachments: #1 Opinion)(ca3mlb, )
February 10, 2017 Pursuant to Local Rule 79.4, notice is hereby given of the Appellate ruling filed on 02/09/2017.. In the event that the mandate or judgment provides for costs or directs a disposition other than an affirmance, the prevailing party shall prepare and submit an order implementing the mandate or judgment. (db, )
February 9, 2017 Filing 329 MANDATE of USCA as to #284 Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by MANACO INTERNATIONAL FORWARDERS, INC., INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP., Cargo Agents, Inc. (Finance notified) (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Letter to District Court, #2 Opinion, #3 Order Amending Opinion)(ca3jk, )
January 18, 2017 Filing 328 USCA JUDGMENT as to #310 Notice of Appeal (USCA),,, filed by SCOTLAND CAR YARD ENTERPRISES d/b/a SAN RAFAEL MITSUBISHI, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, Toyota of Bristol, EMPIRE NISSAN OF SANTA ROSA, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, HARTLEY BUICK/GMC TRUCK, INC. d/b/a HARTLEY HONDA, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, PANAMA CITY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC d/b/a JOHN LEE NISSAN, HUDSON NISSAN, HODGES IMPORTED CARS, INC d/b/a HODGES SUBARU, #312 Notice of Appeal (USCA),,,,,, filed by Al Baker, JEFFREY GANNON, Jill M. Alban, Christie Laster, DODA CAMAJ, JEFF RUBINSTEIN, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OKLAHOMA, INC., Leslie Denise Hart, TONY NIKPRELAJ, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF KANSAS, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF GEORGIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF ARIZONA, INC., SHERYL HALEY, Jennifer Dillon, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., Sean Gurney, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OHIO, INC., Richard Tomasko, Alexandra Scott, BRUCE HERTZ, ADAIR LARA, JUDY A. REIBER, KATRINA BONAR, Maria Kooker, Kori Lehrkamp, STEVEN BRUZONSKY, Demian Vargas, Grant M. Alban, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF COLORADO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., Melinda Deneau, GUSTAVO ADOLFO PEREZ, STEPHANIE B. CROSBY, Elizabeth Ashley Hill, CRAIG BUSKE, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF UTAH, INC.,, Monica Brushey, DANIEL MORRIS, JENNIFER DILLON, Joan MacQuarrie, JUDY SMITH, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF TEXAS, LP., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF IDAHO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF FLORIDA, INC., EUGENE THOMAS GOESSLING, CATHERINE TAYLOR, Roberta Rothsetin, Emmett Brophy, PAMELA E. GOESSLING, John Leyva, #286 Notice of Appeal (USCA),,,,, filed by Al Baker, JEFFREY GANNON, Jill M. Alban, MARY ARNOLD, Christie Laster, DODA CAMAJ, JEFF RUBINSTEIN, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OKLAHOMA, INC., Leslie Denise Hart, TONY NIKPRELAJ, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF KANSAS, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF GEORGIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF ARIZONA, INC., SHERYL HALEY, Jennifer Dillon, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., Sean Gurney, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OHIO, INC., Richard Tomasko, Alexandra Scott, BRUCE HERTZ, ADAIR LARA, KATRINA BONAR, JUDY A. REIBER, Maria Kooker, Kori Lehrkamp, STEVEN BRUZONSKY, Demian Vargas, Grant M. Alban, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF COLORADO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., Melinda Deneau, GUSTAVO ADOLFO PEREZ, STEPHANIE B. CROSBY, Elizabeth Ashley Hill, CRAIG BUSKE, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF UTAH, INC.,, Monica Brushey, DANIEL MORRIS, JENNIFER DILLON, Joan MacQuarrie, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF TEXAS, LP., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF IDAHO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF FLORIDA, INC., EUGENE THOMAS GOESSLING, CATHERINE TAYLOR, Roberta Rothsetin, Emmett Brophy, PAMELA E. GOESSLING, John Leyva, #285 Notice of Appeal (USCA),,, filed by PANAMA CITY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC d/b/a JOHN LEE NISSAN, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., HUDSON NISSAN, HODGES IMPORTED CARS, INC d/b/a HODGES SUBARU, SCOTLAND CAR YARD ENTERPRISES d/b/a SAN RAFAEL MITSUBISHI, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, EMPIRE NISSAN OF SANTA ROSA, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, HARTLEY BUICK/GMC TRUCK, INC. d/b/a HARTLEY HONDA, #284 Notice of Appeal (USCA),, filed by MANACO INTERNATIONAL FORWARDERS, INC., INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP., Cargo Agents, Inc. (ca3jk, )
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER granting #326 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney BENJAMIN DAVID ELGA terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/22/2016. (ld, )
November 21, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #326 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion set for 12/19/2016 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
November 21, 2016 Filing 326 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Martens Cars of Washington, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ELGA, BENJAMIN)
October 18, 2016 Filing 325 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEC BLAINE FINLEY, JR on behalf of Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, HUDSON NISSAN, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., Toyota of Bristol (FINLEY, ALEC)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER voluntarily dismissing action w/prejudice as to defts., NIPPON YUSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA AND NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC.. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/7/16. (DD, )
September 2, 2016 Filing 323 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GENERAL MOTORS LLC (SOLH, CHAHIRA)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER voluntarily dismissing action w/prejudice as to defts., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, ANDEUKOR CAR CARRIERS. iNC.. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 7/19/16. (DD, )
July 18, 2016 Filing 321 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GENERAL MOTORS LLC (SOLH, CHAHIRA)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER granting #319 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney ANNE T. REGAN terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/29/16. (DD, )
June 28, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #319 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion set for 8/1/2016 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
June 28, 2016 Filing 319 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MARY ARNOLD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(REGAN, ANNE)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 318 Order to Refund Fees (Finance notified). Signed by Chief Deputy Theresa L Burnett on 6/20/2016. (rm, )
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER granting re #316 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Todd F. Braunstein filed by COMPANIA SUD AMERICANA DE VAPORES S.A., CSAV AGENCY, LLC,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/16/16. (DD, )
June 16, 2016 Filing 316 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Todd F. Braunstein by COMPANIA SUD AMERICANA DE VAPORES S.A., CSAV AGENCY, LLC. (BRAUNSTEIN, TODD)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER granting #314 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney MATTHEW W. RUAN terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/6/16. (DD, )
June 2, 2016 Filing 314 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MANACO INTERNATIONAL FORWARDERS, INC.. (RUAN, MATTHEW)
May 25, 2016 Filing 313 Application for Refund of Fees re #312 Notice of Appeal (USCA), (finance notified). (BURNS, WARREN)
May 24, 2016 Filing 312 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #308 Opinion, #276 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion in Limine, #275 Opinion, #309 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion to Vacate by Grant M. Alban, Jill M. Alban, KATRINA BONAR, STEVEN BRUZONSKY, CRAIG BUSKE, Al Baker, Emmett Brophy, Monica Brushey, DODA CAMAJ, STEPHANIE B. CROSBY, JENNIFER DILLON(Plaintiff in 13-6622), Melinda Deneau, JEFFREY GANNON, EUGENE THOMAS GOESSLING, PAMELA E. GOESSLING, Sean Gurney, SHERYL HALEY, BRUCE HERTZ, Leslie Denise Hart, Elizabeth Ashley Hill, Maria Kooker, ADAIR LARA, Christie Laster, Kori Lehrkamp, John Leyva, DANIEL MORRIS, Joan MacQuarrie(Plaintiff in 13-6356), Joan MacQuarrie, TONY NIKPRELAJ, GUSTAVO ADOLFO PEREZ, JUDY A. REIBER, JEFF RUBINSTEIN, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF ARIZONA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF COLORADO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF FLORIDA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF GEORGIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF IDAHO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF KANSAS, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OHIO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OKLAHOMA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF TEXAS, LP., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF UTAH, INC.,, Roberta Rothsetin, JUDY SMITH, Alexandra Scott, CATHERINE TAYLOR, Richard Tomasko, Demian Vargas. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-7123590. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (BURNS, WARREN)
May 6, 2016 Filing 311 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney LAUREN ILENE DUBICK terminated. (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
May 6, 2016 Filing 310 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #276 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,,, #309 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion to Vacate by Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., EMPIRE NISSAN OF SANTA ROSA, LLC, HARTLEY BUICK/GMC TRUCK, INC. d/b/a HARTLEY HONDA, HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, HODGES IMPORTED CARS, INC d/b/a HODGES SUBARU, HUDSON NISSAN, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., PANAMA CITY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC d/b/a JOHN LEE NISSAN, SCOTLAND CAR YARD ENTERPRISES d/b/a SAN RAFAEL MITSUBISHI, Toyota of Bristol. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-7089382. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER denying #278 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying #299 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 4/25/16. (DD, )
April 25, 2016 Filing 308 MEMORANDUM/OPINION. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 4/25/16. (DD, )
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER granting #306 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney KEVIN MICHAEL KELLY terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/21/2016. (anr)
January 20, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #306 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion set for 2/16/2016 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
January 20, 2016 Filing 306 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(KELLY, KEVIN)
December 8, 2015 Filing 305 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MARY ARNOLD, Grant M. Alban, Jill M. Alban, Automobile Dealership Plaintiffs, STEVEN BRUZONSKY, CRAIG BUSKE, Emmett Brophy, Monica Brushey, DODA CAMAJ, STEPHANIE B. CROSBY, Melinda Deneau, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., Jennifer Dillon, EMPIRE NISSAN OF SANTA ROSA, LLC, JEFFREY GANNON, EUGENE THOMAS GOESSLING, PAMELA E. GOESSLING, Sean Gurney, SHERYL HALEY, HARTLEY BUICK/GMC TRUCK, INC. d/b/a HARTLEY HONDA, HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, BRUCE HERTZ, HODGES IMPORTED CARS, INC d/b/a HODGES SUBARU, HUDSON NISSAN, Elizabeth Ashley Hill, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, Maria Kooker, ADAIR LARA, Kori Lehrkamp, John Leyva, DANIEL MORRIS, Joan MacQuarrie(Plaintiff in 13-6356), Joan MacQuarrie, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., KENNETH A. NELSON, TONY NIKPRELAJ, PANAMA CITY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC d/b/a JOHN LEE NISSAN, GUSTAVO ADOLFO PEREZ, JUDY A. REIBER, JEFF RUBINSTEIN, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF ARIZONA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF COLORADO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF FLORIDA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF GEORGIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF IDAHO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF KANSAS, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OHIO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OKLAHOMA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF TEXAS, LP., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF UTAH, INC.,, Roberta Rothsetin, SCOTLAND CAR YARD ENTERPRISES d/b/a SAN RAFAEL MITSUBISHI, CATHERINE TAYLOR, Richard Tomasko, Toyota of Bristol, Demian Vargas re #299 MOTION to Vacate #298 Notice (Other),,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(BURNS, WARREN)
December 4, 2015 Filing 304 Letter from General Motors LLC re Request for Leave of Court to File Reply Letter Brief in Support of GMs October 23, 2015 Letter Brief re #294 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (General Motors LLCs (Proposed) Reply Letter Brief))(SOLH, CHAHIRA)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER granting IPP's re #302 Letter Request that the deadline for reply papers in further support of motion be extended to 12/8/15. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 12/4/15. (DD, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 302 Letter from Lindsey H. Taylor Regarding Request For Extension Of Time To File Reply re #299 MOTION to Vacate #298 Notice (Other),,,,,, , #300 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,. (TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
November 24, 2015 Filing 301 RESPONSE re #294 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A, #2 Exhibit Exh. B, #3 Exhibit Exh. C)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
November 23, 2015 Filing 300 BRIEF in Opposition filed by "K" LINE AMERICA, INC., American Shipping and Logistics Inc., COMPANIA SUD AMERICANA DE VAPORES S.A., CSAV AGENCY, LLC, EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners Holdings AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US), KAWASAKI KISEN KAISHA, LTD., MITSUI O.S.K. LINES, LTD.,, MOL (AMERICA), INC., MOL Logistics (USA), Inc., Mitsui O.S.K. Bulk Shipping (U.S.A.), Inc., NIPPON YUSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA, NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS re #299 MOTION to Vacate #298 Notice (Other),,,,,, Defendants' consolidated brief in opposition to IPPs' motion to vacate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. "A" - GM's FMC complaint)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
November 5, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #299 MOTION to Vacate #298 Notice (Other),,,,,, . Motion set for 12/7/2015 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
November 4, 2015 Filing 299 MOTION to Vacate #298 Notice (Other),,,,,, by MARY ARNOLD, Grant M. Alban, Jill M. Alban, Automobile Dealership Plaintiffs, KATRINA BONAR, STEVEN BRUZONSKY, CRAIG BUSKE, Al Baker, Emmett Brophy, Monica Brushey, DODA CAMAJ, STEPHANIE B. CROSBY, JENNIFER DILLON(Plaintiff in 13-6622), Melinda Deneau, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., EMPIRE NISSAN OF SANTA ROSA, LLC, JEFFREY GANNON, EUGENE THOMAS GOESSLING, PAMELA E. GOESSLING, Sean Gurney, SHERYL HALEY, HARTLEY BUICK/GMC TRUCK, INC. d/b/a HARTLEY HONDA, HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, BRUCE HERTZ, HODGES IMPORTED CARS, INC d/b/a HODGES SUBARU, HUDSON NISSAN, Leslie Denise Hart, Elizabeth Ashley Hill, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Maria Kooker, ADAIR LARA, Christie Laster, Kori Lehrkamp, John Leyva, DANIEL MORRIS, Joan MacQuarrie(Plaintiff in 13-6356), Joan MacQuarrie, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., TONY NIKPRELAJ, PANAMA CITY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC d/b/a JOHN LEE NISSAN, GUSTAVO ADOLFO PEREZ, JUDY A. REIBER, JEFF RUBINSTEIN, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF ARIZONA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF COLORADO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF FLORIDA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF GEORGIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF IDAHO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF KANSAS, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OHIO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OKLAHOMA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF TEXAS, LP., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF UTAH, INC.,, Roberta Rothsetin, SCOTLAND CAR YARD ENTERPRISES d/b/a SAN RAFAEL MITSUBISHI, JUDY SMITH, Alexandra Scott, CATHERINE TAYLOR, Richard Tomasko, Demian Vargas. (BURNS, WARREN)
November 4, 2015 Filing 298 NOTICE by MARY ARNOLD, Grant M. Alban, Jill M. Alban, Automobile Dealership Plaintiffs, KATRINA BONAR, STEVEN BRUZONSKY, CRAIG BUSKE, Al Baker, Emmett Brophy, Monica Brushey, DODA CAMAJ, STEPHANIE B. CROSBY, JENNIFER DILLON(Plaintiff in 13-6622), Melinda Deneau, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., EMPIRE NISSAN OF SANTA ROSA, LLC, JEFFREY GANNON, EUGENE THOMAS GOESSLING, PAMELA E. GOESSLING, Sean Gurney, SHERYL HALEY, HARTLEY BUICK/GMC TRUCK, INC. d/b/a HARTLEY HONDA, HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, BRUCE HERTZ, HODGES IMPORTED CARS, INC d/b/a HODGES SUBARU, HUDSON NISSAN, Leslie Denise Hart, Elizabeth Ashley Hill, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Maria Kooker, ADAIR LARA, Christie Laster, Kori Lehrkamp, John Leyva, DANIEL MORRIS, Joan MacQuarrie(Plaintiff in 13-6356), Joan MacQuarrie, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., TONY NIKPRELAJ, PANAMA CITY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC d/b/a JOHN LEE NISSAN, GUSTAVO ADOLFO PEREZ, JUDY A. REIBER, JEFF RUBINSTEIN, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF ARIZONA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF COLORADO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF FLORIDA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF GEORGIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF IDAHO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF KANSAS, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OHIO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OKLAHOMA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF TEXAS, LP., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF UTAH, INC.,, Roberta Rothsetin, SCOTLAND CAR YARD ENTERPRISES d/b/a SAN RAFAEL MITSUBISHI, JUDY SMITH, Alexandra Scott, CATHERINE TAYLOR, Richard Tomasko, Demian Vargas of Motion Under Rule 60(b) (BURNS, WARREN)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 297 TEXT ORDER - The Court is in receipt of the parties' letters regarding the propriety of Plaintiff's submission of single-spaced letter briefing. (ECF Nos. 295-96 in Civil Action No. 13-3306). The Court will accept Plaintiff's submission as-is and will hold Defendants' forthcoming submission to the same standard.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/30/15. (nm, )
October 26, 2015 Filing 296 Letter from Plaintiff General Motors LLC re Compliance with Magistrate Dicksons September 22, 2015 Order. (SOLH, CHAHIRA)
October 26, 2015 Filing 295 Letter from defendants NYK, WWL and EUKOR re GM's overlength brief re #294 Letter. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
October 23, 2015 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please review the (LETTER) attached to docket entry (294) submitted by (C. SOLH) on (10/23/15). If this document was attached in error, PLEASE RESUBMIT THE CORRECT DOCUMENT. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (DD, )
October 23, 2015 Filing 294 Letter from General Motors LLC re Memorandum Brief re Inapplicability of Motions to Dismiss the Class Complaints. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(SOLH, CHAHIRA)
October 19, 2015 Filing 293 Transcript of Proceedings of Motion Hearing held on July 23, 2015, before Judge ESTHER SALAS. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lynne Johnson (chjlaw@aol.com/609-896-1836). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 11/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2016. (ek)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER of USCA as to #286 Notice of Appeal (USCA),,,,, filed by Al Baker, JEFFREY GANNON, Jill M. Alban, MARY ARNOLD, Christie Laster, DODA CAMAJ, JEFF RUBINSTEIN, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OKLAHOMA, INC., Leslie Denise Hart, TONY NIKPRELAJ, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF KANSAS, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF GEORGIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF ARIZONA, INC., SHERYL HALEY, Jennifer Dillon, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., Sean Gurney, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OHIO, INC., Richard Tomasko, Alexandra Scott, BRUCE HERTZ, ADAIR LARA, JUDY A. REIBER, KATRINA BONAR, Maria Kooker, Kori Lehrkamp, STEVEN BRUZONSKY, Demian Vargas, Grant M. Alban, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF COLORADO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., Melinda Deneau, GUSTAVO ADOLFO PEREZ, STEPHANIE B. CROSBY, Elizabeth Ashley Hill, CRAIG BUSKE, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF UTAH, INC.,, Monica Brushey, DANIEL MORRIS, JENNIFER DILLON, Joan MacQuarrie, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF TEXAS, LP., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF IDAHO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF FLORIDA, INC., EUGENE THOMAS GOESSLING, CATHERINE TAYLOR, Roberta Rothsetin, Emmett Brophy, PAMELA E. GOESSLING, John Leyva, #285 Notice of Appeal (USCA),,, filed by PANAMA CITY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC d/b/a JOHN LEE NISSAN, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., HUDSON NISSAN, HODGES IMPORTED CARS, INC d/b/a HODGES SUBARU, SCOTLAND CAR YARD ENTERPRISES d/b/a SAN RAFAEL MITSUBISHI, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, EMPIRE NISSAN OF SANTA ROSA, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, HARTLEY BUICK/GMC TRUCK, INC. d/b/a HARTLEY HONDA, #284 Notice of Appeal (USCA),, filed by MANACO INTERNATIONAL FORWARDERS, INC., INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP., Cargo Agents, Inc.. Order staying appeals pending post decision motion. (ca3jk, )
October 9, 2015 Filing 291 USCA Case Number 15-3355 for #286 Notice of Appeal (USCA),,,,, filed by Al Baker, JEFFREY GANNON, Jill M. Alban, MARY ARNOLD, Christie Laster, DODA CAMAJ, JEFF RUBINSTEIN, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OKLAHOMA, INC., Leslie Denise Hart, TONY NIKPRELAJ, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF KANSAS, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF GEORGIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF ARIZONA, INC., SHERYL HALEY, Jennifer Dillon, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., Sean Gurney, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OHIO, INC., Richard Tomasko, Alexandra Scott, BRUCE HERTZ, ADAIR LARA, JUDY A. REIBER, KATRINA BONAR, Maria Kooker, Kori Lehrkamp, STEVEN BRUZONSKY, Demian Vargas, Grant M. Alban, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF COLORADO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., Melinda Deneau, GUSTAVO ADOLFO PEREZ, STEPHANIE B. CROSBY, Elizabeth Ashley Hill, CRAIG BUSKE, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF UTAH, INC.,, Monica Brushey, DANIEL MORRIS, JENNIFER DILLON, Joan MacQuarrie, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF TEXAS, LP., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF IDAHO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF FLORIDA, INC., EUGENE THOMAS GOESSLING, CATHERINE TAYLOR, Roberta Rothsetin, Emmett Brophy, PAMELA E. GOESSLING, John Leyva. USCA Case Manager James (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3jk, )
October 9, 2015 Filing 290 USCA Case Number 15-3354 for #285 Notice of Appeal (USCA),,, filed by SCOTLAND CAR YARD ENTERPRISES d/b/a SAN RAFAEL MITSUBISHI, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, EMPIRE NISSAN OF SANTA ROSA, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, HARTLEY BUICK/GMC TRUCK, INC. d/b/a HARTLEY HONDA, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, PANAMA CITY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC d/b/a JOHN LEE NISSAN, HUDSON NISSAN, HODGES IMPORTED CARS, INC d/b/a HODGES SUBARU. USCA Case Manager James (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3jk, )
October 9, 2015 Filing 289 USCA Case Number 15-3353 for #284 Notice of Appeal (USCA),, filed by MANACO INTERNATIONAL FORWARDERS, INC., INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP., Cargo Agents, Inc.. USCA Case Manager James (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3jk, )
September 29, 2015 Filing 288 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Automobile Dealership Plaintiffs, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., EMPIRE NISSAN OF SANTA ROSA, LLC, F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC., HARTLEY BUICK/GMC TRUCK, INC. d/b/a HARTLEY HONDA, HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, HODGES IMPORTED CARS, INC d/b/a HODGES SUBARU, HUDSON NISSAN, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Joan MacQuarrie(Plaintiff in 13-6356), Joan MacQuarrie, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., KENNETH A. NELSON, ROBERT O'ROURKE, PANAMA CITY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC d/b/a JOHN LEE NISSAN, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF ARIZONA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF COLORADO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF FLORIDA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF GEORGIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF IDAHO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF KANSAS, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OHIO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OKLAHOMA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF TEXAS, LP., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF UTAH, INC.,, SCOTLAND CAR YARD ENTERPRISES d/b/a SAN RAFAEL MITSUBISHI, Toyota of Bristol re #278 MOTION for Reconsideration re #276 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,,,, #275 Opinion (BURNS, WARREN)
September 29, 2015 Filing 287 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT MATTHEW DISCH on behalf of NIPPON YUSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA, NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC. (DISCH, ROBERT)
September 25, 2015 Filing 286 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #276 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,,,, by MARY ARNOLD, Grant M. Alban, Jill M. Alban, KATRINA BONAR, STEVEN BRUZONSKY, CRAIG BUSKE, Al Baker, Emmett Brophy, Monica Brushey, DODA CAMAJ, STEPHANIE B. CROSBY, Melinda Deneau, Jennifer Dillon, JEFFREY GANNON, EUGENE THOMAS GOESSLING, PAMELA E. GOESSLING, Sean Gurney, SHERYL HALEY, BRUCE HERTZ, Leslie Denise Hart, Elizabeth Ashley Hill, Maria Kooker, ADAIR LARA, Christie Laster, Kori Lehrkamp, John Leyva, DANIEL MORRIS, Joan MacQuarrie(Plaintiff in 13-6356), Joan MacQuarrie, TONY NIKPRELAJ, GUSTAVO ADOLFO PEREZ, JUDY A. REIBER, JEFF RUBINSTEIN, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF ARIZONA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF COLORADO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF FLORIDA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF GEORGIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF IDAHO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF KANSAS, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OHIO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OKLAHOMA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF TEXAS, LP., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF UTAH, INC.,, Roberta Rothsetin, Alexandra Scott, CATHERINE TAYLOR, Richard Tomasko, Demian Vargas. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-6662836. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (BURNS, WARREN)
September 25, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee as to ROBERT M. DISCH, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW027368 (DD, )
September 25, 2015 Filing 285 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #276 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,,,, #275 Opinion by Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., EMPIRE NISSAN OF SANTA ROSA, LLC, HARTLEY BUICK/GMC TRUCK, INC. d/b/a HARTLEY HONDA, HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, HODGES IMPORTED CARS, INC d/b/a HODGES SUBARU, HUDSON NISSAN, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., PANAMA CITY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC d/b/a JOHN LEE NISSAN, SCOTLAND CAR YARD ENTERPRISES d/b/a SAN RAFAEL MITSUBISHI. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-6661919. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
September 25, 2015 Filing 284 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #276 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,,,, #275 Opinion by Cargo Agents, Inc., INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP., INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP. (Plaintiff in 13-6485), MANACO INTERNATIONAL FORWARDERS, INC.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-6661680. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. Appeal Record due by 9/28/2015. (BENNETT, JENNIFER)
September 21, 2015 Filing 283 RESPONSE to Motion filed by "K" LINE AMERICA, INC., KAWASAKI KISEN KAISHA, LTD. re #278 MOTION for Reconsideration re #276 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,,,, #275 Opinion Response to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration (NELSON, MARK)
September 21, 2015 Filing 282 RESPONSE to Motion filed by MITSUI O.S.K. LINES, LTD.,, Mitsui O.S.K. Bulk Shipping (U.S.A.), Inc., NISSAN MOTOR CAR CARRIER CO., LTD, World Logistics Service (U.S.A.), Inc. re #278 MOTION for Reconsideration re #276 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,,,, #275 Opinion Statement in Response to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration (COOPER, JAMES)
September 21, 2015 Filing 281 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by COMPANIA SUD AMERICANA DE VAPORES S.A., CSAV AGENCY, LLC, EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US), NIPPON YUSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA, NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS re #278 MOTION for Reconsideration re #276 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,,,, #275 Opinion Notice of no position in respect of indirect purchaser plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
September 21, 2015 Filing 280 NOTICE of Change of Address by KEVIN MICHAEL KELLY (KELLY, KEVIN)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 279 TEXT ORDER - An in-person conference is scheduled for 9/22/15 at 3:15 p.m. in Newark, Courtroom 2D, before Magistrate Judge Dickson. Only counsel involved in Civil Action No. 15-4739 are required to attend. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss the status of the claims at issue in Civil Action No. 15-4739 following the Hon. Esther Salas, U.S.D.J.'s 8/28/15 Opinion and Order in these consolidated matters. (ECF Nos. 275 and 276 in Civil Action No. 13-3306). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/14/15. (nm, )
September 11, 2015 SetDeadlines as to #278 MOTION for Reconsideration re #276 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,,,, #275 Opinion . Motion set for 10/5/2015 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (cm )
September 11, 2015 Filing 278 MOTION for Reconsideration re #276 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,,,, #275 Opinion by Automobile Dealership Plaintiffs, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., EMPIRE NISSAN OF SANTA ROSA, LLC, F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC., HARTLEY BUICK/GMC TRUCK, INC. d/b/a HARTLEY HONDA, HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, HODGES IMPORTED CARS, INC d/b/a HODGES SUBARU, HUDSON NISSAN, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Joan MacQuarrie(Plaintiff in 13-6356), Joan MacQuarrie, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., KENNETH A. NELSON, ROBERT O'ROURKE, PANAMA CITY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC d/b/a JOHN LEE NISSAN, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF ARIZONA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF COLORADO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF FLORIDA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF GEORGIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF IDAHO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF KANSAS, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OHIO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OKLAHOMA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF TEXAS, LP., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF UTAH, INC.,, SCOTLAND CAR YARD ENTERPRISES d/b/a SAN RAFAEL MITSUBISHI, Toyota of Bristol. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BURNS, WARREN)
September 11, 2015 Filing 277 NOTICE by Automobile Dealership Plaintiffs, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., EMPIRE NISSAN OF SANTA ROSA, LLC, F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC., HARTLEY BUICK/GMC TRUCK, INC. d/b/a HARTLEY HONDA, HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, HODGES IMPORTED CARS, INC d/b/a HODGES SUBARU, HUDSON NISSAN, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Joan MacQuarrie(Plaintiff in 13-6356), Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., KENNETH A. NELSON, ROBERT O'ROURKE, PANAMA CITY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC d/b/a JOHN LEE NISSAN, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF ARIZONA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF COLORADO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF FLORIDA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF GEORGIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF IDAHO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF KANSAS, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OHIO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OKLAHOMA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF TEXAS, LP., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF UTAH, INC.,, SCOTLAND CAR YARD ENTERPRISES d/b/a SAN RAFAEL MITSUBISHI, Toyota of Bristol re #276 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,,,, #275 Opinion (BURNS, WARREN)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER granting #209 Motion to Dismiss ; granting #212 Motion in Limine; denying as moot #214 Motion to Dismiss ; granting #218 Motion to Dismiss ; denying as moot #227 Motion to Dismiss ; denying as moot #230 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/28/15. (DD, )
August 28, 2015 Filing 275 OPINION. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/28/15. (DD, )
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER granting #273 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney JAY S. COHEN terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 8/27/15. (DD, )
August 25, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #273 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jay S. Cohen of Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, PC. Motion set for 9/21/2015 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
August 25, 2015 Filing 273 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jay S. Cohen of Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, PC by INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP.. (COHEN, JAY)
August 17, 2015 Filing 272 NOTICE of Settlement by ESTEBAN ADAME, ELIZABETH ALLIS, MARY ARNOLD, Grant M. Alban, Jill M. Alban, Automobile Dealership Plaintiffs, MARY G. BISSEN, KATRINA BONAR, CRYSTAL BOYKIN, STEVEN BRUZONSKY, TIFFANY BUI, CRAIG BUSKE, Al Baker, Emmett Brophy, Monica Brushey, DODA CAMAJ, RITA M. CLOWARD, STEPHANIE B. CROSBY, LORI CURTIS, Cargo Agents, Inc., GREG DANA, DIANE DAVID, JERRY DAVID, KATHLEEN C. DAVIS, RITA DIEL-BROWN, JENNIFER DILLON(Plaintiff in 13-6622), Melinda Deneau, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., Jennifer Dillon, WILLIAM ELWOOD, EMPIRE NISSAN OF SANTA ROSA, LLC, F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC., EMILY FERRIS, ALAN FRONT, JENNIFER FROZENA, JEFFREY GANNON, GENERAL MOTORS LLC, EUGENE THOMAS GOESSLING, PAMELA E. GOESSLING, JOE GROJEAN, Sean Gurney, SHERYL HALEY, SHARON HAMPSON, HARTLEY BUICK/GMC TRUCK, INC. d/b/a HARTLEY HONDA, HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, MATTHEW HEILICHER, BRUCE HERTZ, HODGES IMPORTED CARS, INC d/b/a HODGES SUBARU, HUDSON NISSAN, Leslie Denise Hart, Elizabeth Ashley Hill, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, INTERESTED PARTY, INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP., INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP. (Plaintiff in 13-6485), MICHAEL JACKSON, PENDRELL JACKSON, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, BETHANNE KNUDSON, Brenda Keegan, Maria Kooker, ADAIR LARA, NICHOLAS LETOURNEAU, ASHTON LEVIS, Christie Laster, Kori Lehrkamp, John Leyva, MANACO INTERNATIONAL FORWARDERS, INC., ERIC L. METH, DANIEL MORRIS, Joan MacQuarrie(Plaintiff in 13-6356), Joan MacQuarrie, Antonio Maravilla, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., KENNETH A. NELSON, TUAN NGUYEN, TONY NIKPRELAJ, WILDA J. NIN-PACHECO, ROBERT O'ROURKE, PAULA OCHSNER, PANAMA CITY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC d/b/a JOHN LEE NISSAN, GUSTAVO ADOLFO PEREZ, ELIZABETH POWERS KELLER, JUDY A. REIBER, MATTHEW RIGHETTI, PHYLLIS ROSEN, JEFF RUBINSTEIN, RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF ARIZONA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF COLORADO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF FLORIDA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF GEORGIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF IDAHO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF KANSAS, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OHIO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OKLAHOMA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF TEXAS, LP., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF UTAH, INC.,, Roberta Rothsetin, DAVID SCHROEDER, SCOTLAND CAR YARD ENTERPRISES d/b/a SAN RAFAEL MITSUBISHI, DARREL SENIOR, JUDY SMITH, JOSHUA SO, SEAN SPICER, ROSS STASIK, Alexandra Scott, CATHERINE TAYLOR, Richard Tomasko, Toyota of Bristol, LAZARO VERSALLES, Demian Vargas, TOM WARE, ALEX WHITE (BURNS, WARREN)
August 14, 2015 Filing 271 NOTICE of Change of Address by FRANCIS ONOFREI SCARPULLA (SCARPULLA, FRANCIS)
July 28, 2015 Filing 270 BRIEF Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Supplemental Briefing on Conflict Preemption (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(BURNS, WARREN)
July 28, 2015 Filing 269 BRIEF Defendants' consolidated supplemental brief re conflict preemption (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 268 TEXT ORDER. For the reasons set forth on the record on July 23, 2015, the Consolidated Motion of Defendants EUKOR Car Carriers, Inc., Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics Americas LLC and NYK Line (North America) Inc. to Stay the Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint of General Motors LLC, (D.E. No. 255), and General Motors LLC's Motion to Serve Defendants Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha and Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics as Through Their U.S. Counsel, (D.E. No. 256), are hereby DENIED as moot. So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 7/28/2015. (ps, )
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 LETTER-ORDER directing the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Defendants to submit a supplemental brief no more than twenty double-spaced pages in length further exploring the issue of whether state antitrust laws are conflict preempted by the Shipping Act of 1984. Both parties shall file their submissions no later than Tuesday, July 28, 2015. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 7/24/15. (DD, )
July 23, 2015 Filing 267 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Esther Salas: Motion Hearing held on 7/23/2015 re #256 MOTION to Serve Defendants Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha and Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics AS Through Their U.S. Counsel filed by GENERAL MOTORS LLC, #212 . Ordered denied as moot. MOTION in Limine for judicial notice on behalf of End-Payor Plaintiffs filed on their behalf filed by EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC. Decision Reserved. #218 MOTION to Dismiss the direct purchasers complaint (on behalf of all defendants) filed by EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC. Decision Reserved. #230 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Purchaser Complaints filed by Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US), Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), #214 . Decision Reserved. MOTION to Dismiss all complaints filed by EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., #255 . Decision Reserved. MOTION to Stay filed by NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC., EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., NIPPON YUSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, #209 . Ordered motion denied as moot. MOTION to Dismiss indirect purchaser complaints filed by WWL Vehicle Services Americas Inc., COMPANIA SUD AMERICANA DE VAPORES S.A., MOL (AMERICA), INC., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, MOL Logistics (USA), Inc., World Logistics Service (U.S.A.), Inc., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, American Auto Logistics, LP, NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC., Alliance Navigation LLC (US), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US), "K" LINE AMERICA, INC., CSAV AGENCY, LLC, WILH WILHELMSEN HOLDING ASA, Americana De Vapores S.A., American Shipping and Logistics Inc., Hoegh Autoliners Holdings AS (Norway), American Roll-On Roll-Off Carrier, LLC, World Transport Co. Ltd., KAWASAKI KISEN KAISHA, LTD., WALLENIUS LINES AB, Mitsui O.S.K. Bulk Shipping (U.S.A.), Inc., WILH WILHELMSEN ASA, EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., AUTOTRANS AS (France), NIPPON YUSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA, American Logistics Network, LLC, MITSUI O.S.K. LINES, LTD.,, NISSAN MOTOR CAR CARRIER CO., LTD, Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), #227 . Decision Reserved. MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Complaint filed by Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US), Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway). Decision Reserved. (Court Reporter Lynne Johnson.) (ps, )
July 22, 2015 Filing 265 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by GENERAL MOTORS LLC re #256 MOTION to Serve Defendants Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha and Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics AS Through Their U.S. Counsel (SOLH, CHAHIRA)
July 21, 2015 Filing 264 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON ALLEN LECKERMAN on behalf of EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., WALLENIUS LINES AB, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, WILH WILHELMSEN ASA, WILH WILHELMSEN HOLDING ASA (LECKERMAN, JASON)
July 20, 2015 Filing 263 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., NIPPON YUSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC re #256 MOTION to Serve Defendants Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha and Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics AS Through Their U.S. Counsel Corrected (page numbers inserted) (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
July 20, 2015 Filing 262 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., NIPPON YUSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC re #256 MOTION to Serve Defendants Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha and Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics AS Through Their U.S. Counsel (Attachments: #1 Certification CErtification of Roberto A. Rivera-Soto in support of opposition, #2 Certification Certification of John R. Fornaciari in support of opposition, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
July 20, 2015 Filing 261 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by GENERAL MOTORS LLC re #255 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chahira Solh, #2 Exhibit A to Solh Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Solh Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Solh Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Solh Declaration)(SOLH, CHAHIRA)
July 20, 2015 Filing 260 CHAMBERS NOTE: Oral Argument Itinerary for 7/23/2015 at 10:30 AM before Judge Esther Salas. (ps, )
July 10, 2015 Filing 259 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN CHRISTOPHER WONG on behalf of GENERAL MOTORS LLC (WONG, RYAN)
July 10, 2015 Filing 258 NOTICE of Appearance by CHAHIRA SOLH on behalf of GENERAL MOTORS LLC (SOLH, CHAHIRA)
July 10, 2015 Filing 257 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER GEORGE SAFIRSTEIN on behalf of PENDRELL JACKSON (SAFIRSTEIN, PETER)
July 6, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #255 MOTION to Stay . Motion set for 8/3/2015 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
July 6, 2015 Filing 256 MOTION to Serve Defendants Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha and Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics AS Through Their U.S. Counsel by GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief (Memorandum of Points and Authorities), #2 Declaration of Chahira Solh, #3 Exhibit A to Solh Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Solh Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Solh Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Solh Declaration, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(SASSE, DANIEL)
July 6, 2015 Filing 255 MOTION to Stay by EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., NIPPON YUSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA, NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum (with exhibits) in support of motion to stay GM complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
July 6, 2015 Filing 254 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL A. SASSE on behalf of GENERAL MOTORS LLC (SASSE, DANIEL)
June 29, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 600.00 received as to Kent A. Gardiner, Esq., Daniel A. Sasse, Esq., Chahira Solh, Esq., and Ryan C. Wong, Esq., receipt number TRE059125 (km)
June 29, 2015 Filing 253 NOTICE by Antonio Maravilla (TERRELL, REGINALD)
June 22, 2015 Filing 252 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by "K" LINE AMERICA, INC., COMPANIA SUD AMERICANA DE VAPORES S.A., CSAV AGENCY, LLC, EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US), KAWASAKI KISEN KAISHA, LTD., MITSUI O.S.K. LINES, LTD.,, Mitsui O.S.K. Bulk Shipping (U.S.A.), Inc., NIPPON YUSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA, NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, World Logistics Service (U.S.A.), Inc. re #209 MOTION to Dismiss indirect purchaser complaints Letter brief re response to IPPs' sumbission re Oneok, Inc. v. Learjet, Inc. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
June 17, 2015 Set Hearings: Please be advised that Oral Argument for the pending motions [D.E. # 209, 212, 214, 218, 227 & 230 filed in CV. 13-3306 (ES)] has been scheduled for 7/23/2015 at 10:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5A before Judge Esther Salas. (ps, )
June 8, 2015 Filing 251 Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Oneok Decision)(CECCHI, JAMES)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER that the Order Appointing Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel dated March 3, 2014, (ECF No. 106) is hereby modified to substitute Burns Charest LLP for Susman Godfrey LLP as Co-Lead Class Counsel for End-Payor Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 5/22/15. (DD, )
May 19, 2015 Filing 249 Letter from James E. Cecchi Enclosing Proposed Order Regarding Substitution of End-Payor Interim Lead Counsel re #106 Order,,,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
May 13, 2015 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Warren T. Burns, Esq. does not have a correct e-mail address listed with the court and is not receiving his/her notices of electronic filing in this case. Pursuant to local rule 10.1 and court procedures, counsel and unrepresented parties are required to notify the court of any mailing or e-mail address changes. The court has deleted the invalid e-mail address. Attorneys should review the ECF link on our web site for information on maintaining your account and unrepresented parties, or those attorneys without access to maintaining their account, should notice the Clerk. (gxh)
May 7, 2015 Filing 248 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, HUDSON NISSAN, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., Toyota of Bristol re #247 Notice of Appearance, of Benjamin Elga (ELGA, BENJAMIN)
May 7, 2015 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Daniel H. Charest, Esq., does not have a correct e-mail address listed with the court and is not receiving his/her notices of electronic filing in this case. Pursuant to local rule 10.1 and court procedures, counsel and unrepresented parties are required to notify the court of any mailing or e-mail address changes. The court has deleted the invalid e-mail address. Attorneys should review the ECF link on our web site for information on maintaining your account and unrepresented parties, or those attorneys without access to maintaining their account, should notice the Clerk. (dmw, )
May 6, 2015 Filing 247 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN DAVID ELGA on behalf of Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, HUDSON NISSAN, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., Toyota of Bristol (ELGA, BENJAMIN)
March 25, 2015 Filing 246 NOTICE by ELIZABETH ALLIS, CRAIG BUSKE, WILLIAM ELWOOD, MICHAEL JACKSON, JUDY A. REIBER, MATTHEW RIGHETTI, DARREL SENIOR Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation (SCARPULLA, FRANCIS)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting #244 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney BRENDAN FREY terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/24/15. (DD, )
March 23, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #244 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brendan H. Frey. Motion set for 4/20/2015 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
March 23, 2015 Filing 244 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brendan H. Frey by Automobile Dealership Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MANTESE, GERARD)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting #242 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney ERIK JOESPH RAVEN-HANSEN terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/9/15. (DD, )
March 9, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #242 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Erik Raven-Hansen). Motion set for 4/6/2015 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
March 6, 2015 Filing 242 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Erik Raven-Hansen) by NIPPON YUSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA, NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RAVEN-HANSEN, ERIK)
February 27, 2015 Filing 241 NOTICE by MANACO INTERNATIONAL FORWARDERS, INC. NOTICE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS CHANGE (DIRKSEN, CHARLES)
February 27, 2015 Filing 240 NOTICE by MANACO INTERNATIONAL FORWARDERS, INC. NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE (CERA, SOLOMON)
February 23, 2015 Filing 239 Letter from PETER S. PEARLMAN TO THE HONORABLE ESTHER SALAS, USDJ. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
February 23, 2015 Filing 238 Letter from James E. Cecchi Regarding Request for Oral Argument re #237 Notice (Other),,,,,,. (CECCHI, JAMES)
February 19, 2015 Filing 237 NOTICE by "K" LINE AMERICA, INC., Americana De Vapores S.A., COMPANIA SUD AMERICANA DE VAPORES S.A., CSAV AGENCY, LLC, EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US), KAWASAKI KISEN KAISHA, LTD., MITSUI O.S.K. LINES, LTD.,, MOL (AMERICA), INC., MOL Logistics (USA), Inc., Mitsui O.S.K. Bulk Shipping (U.S.A.), Inc., NIPPON YUSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA, NISSAN MOTOR CAR CARRIER CO., LTD, NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, World Logistics Service (U.S.A.), Inc. re #228 Response in Opposition to Motion, #220 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, #225 Response in Opposition to Motion, #226 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, #218 MOTION to Dismiss the direct purchasers complaint (on behalf of all defendants), #214 MOTION to Dismiss all complaints, #217 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, #213 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion, #227 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Complaint, #223 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, #229 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, #211 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, #216 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #212 MOTION in Limine for judicial notice on behalf of End-Payor Plaintiffs filed on their behalf, #219 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,, #215 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #209 MOTION to Dismiss indirect purchaser complaints, #222 Response in Opposition to Motion, #210 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, Defendants' consolidated notice of request for oral argument (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
February 4, 2015 Filing 236 NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL ELLEN KOPP on behalf of INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP. (KOPP, RACHEL)
February 3, 2015 Filing 235 NOTICE of Appearance by JAY S. COHEN on behalf of INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP. (COHEN, JAY)
February 3, 2015 Filing 234 NOTICE of Appearance by EUGENE A. SPECTOR on behalf of INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP. (SPECTOR, EUGENE)
January 28, 2015 Filing 233 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney BONNY ELAINE SWEENEY terminated. (DAVIDSON, STUART)
January 27, 2015 Set Deadlines as to #227 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Complaint, #230 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Purchaser Complaints. Motion set for 3/2/2015 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
January 26, 2015 Filing 232 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US) re #230 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Purchaser Complaints (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MAXMAN, MELISSA)
January 26, 2015 Filing 231 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US) re #230 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Purchaser Complaints (filed of behalf of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs pursuant to Court Order) (MAXMAN, MELISSA)
January 26, 2015 Filing 230 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Purchaser Complaints by Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US). Responses due by 12/12/2014 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MAXMAN, MELISSA)
January 26, 2015 Filing 229 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US) re #227 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MAXMAN, MELISSA)
January 26, 2015 Filing 228 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US) re #227 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Complaint (filed on behalf of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs pursuant to Court Order) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Certificate of Service)(MAXMAN, MELISSA)
January 26, 2015 Filing 227 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Complaint by Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US). Responses due by 12/12/2014 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MAXMAN, MELISSA)
January 26, 2015 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The (MOTION TO DISMISS - Doc. #221, RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION - Doc. #222, REPLY IN OPPOSITION - Doc. #223, MOTION TO DISMISS - Doc. #224, RESPONSE IN OPPOSITIN - Doc. #225, REPLY BRIEF - Doc. #226) submitted by (K. KELLY) on (1/26/15) contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (DD, )
January 26, 2015 [AMENDED] Set Deadlines as to #212 MOTION in Limine for judicial notice on behalf of End-Payor Plaintiffs filed on their behalf, #214 MOTION to Dismiss all complaints, #218 MOTION to Dismiss the direct purchasers complaint (on behalf of all defendants), #209 MOTION to Dismiss indirect purchaser complaints. Motion set for 3/2/2015 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
January 26, 2015 Set Deadlines as to #212 MOTION in Limine for judicial notice on behalf of End-Payor Plaintiffs filed on their behalf, #214 MOTION to Dismiss all complaints, #218 MOTION to Dismiss the direct purchasers complaint (on behalf of all defendants), #221 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Complaint, #209 MOTION to Dismiss indirect purchaser complaints, #224 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Purchaser Complaints. Motion set for 3/2/2015 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
January 26, 2015 Filing 226 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US) re #224 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Purchaser Complaints (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KELLY, KEVIN)
January 26, 2015 Filing 225 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US) re #224 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Purchaser Complaints (filed of behalf of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs) (KELLY, KEVIN)
January 26, 2015 Filing 224 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Purchaser Complaints by Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US). Responses due by 12/12/2014 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(KELLY, KEVIN)
January 26, 2015 Filing 223 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US) re #221 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KELLY, KEVIN)
January 26, 2015 Filing 222 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US) re #221 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Complaint (filed on behalf of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Certificate of Service)(KELLY, KEVIN)
January 26, 2015 Filing 221 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Complaint by Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US). Responses due by 12/12/2014 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(KELLY, KEVIN)
January 26, 2015 Filing 220 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS re #218 MOTION to Dismiss the direct purchasers complaint (on behalf of all defendants) (filed on behalf of all defendants) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to defenants' consolidated reply brief to opposition to their motion to dismiss direct purchaser complaint)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
January 26, 2015 Filing 219 BRIEF in Opposition filed by EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS re #218 MOTION to Dismiss the direct purchasers complaint (on behalf of all defendants) (filed on behalf of direct purchasers) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A to direct purchasers' opposition to defendants' consolidated motion to dismiss direct purchasers' complaint, #2 Exhibit Exh. B to direct purchasers' opposition to defendants' consolidated motion to dismiss direct purchasers' complaint, #3 Exhibit Exh. C to direct purchasers' opposition to defendants' consolidated motion to dismiss direct purchasers' complaint, #4 Exhibit Exh. D to direct purchasers' opposition to defendants' consolidated motion to dismiss direct purchasers' complaint, #5 Exhibit Exh. E to direct purchasers' opposition to defendants' consolidated motion to dismiss direct purchasers' complaint)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
January 26, 2015 Filing 218 MOTION to Dismiss the direct purchasers complaint (on behalf of all defendants) by EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS. Responses due by 12/12/2014 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
January 26, 2015 Filing 217 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC. re #214 MOTION to Dismiss all complaints (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
January 26, 2015 Filing 216 BRIEF in Opposition filed by EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC. re #214 MOTION to Dismiss all complaints opposition of indirect purchasers filed on their behalf by (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
January 26, 2015 Filing 215 BRIEF in Opposition filed by EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC. re #214 MOTION to Dismiss all complaints opposition of direct purchaser filed on their behalf by EUKOR (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
January 26, 2015 Filing 214 MOTION to Dismiss all complaints by EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC.. Responses due by 12/12/2014 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
January 26, 2015 Filing 213 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS re #212 MOTION in Limine for judicial notice on behalf of End-Payor Plaintiffs filed on their behalf (consolidated memorandum on behalf of all defendants) (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
January 26, 2015 Filing 212 MOTION in Limine for judicial notice on behalf of End-Payor Plaintiffs filed on their behalf by EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A to End-Payor Plaintiffs' request for judicial notice, #2 Exhibit Exh. B to End-Payor Plaintiffs' request for judicial notice, #3 Exhibit Exh. C to End-Payor Plaintiffs' request for judicial notice, #4 Exhibit Exh. D to End-Payor Plaintiffs' request for judicial notice, #5 Exhibit Exh. E to End-Payor Plaintiffs' request for judicial notice, #6 Exhibit Exh. F to End-Payor Plaintiffs' request for judicial notice, #7 Exhibit Exh. G to End-Payor Plaintiffs' request for judicial notice)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
January 26, 2015 Filing 211 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS re #209 MOTION to Dismiss indirect purchaser complaints (filed on behalf of all defendants) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A, B. and C. to defendants' consolidated reply brief to the opposition to their motion to dismiss the IPPs' complaints)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
January 26, 2015 Filing 210 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS re #209 MOTION to Dismiss indirect purchaser complaints (this opposition is filed by defendants on behalf of indirect purchasers) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1 to IPPs' opposition to defendants' consolidated motion to dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exh. 2 to IPPs' opposition to defendants' consolidated motion to dismiss, #3 Exhibit Exh. 3 to IPPs' opposition to defendants' consolidated motion to dismiss, #4 Exhibit Exh. 4 to IPPs' opposition to defendants' consolidated motion to dismiss, #5 Exhibit Exh. 5 to IPPs' opposition to defendants' consolidated motion to dismiss, #6 Exhibit Exh. 6 to IPPs' opposition to defendants' consolidated motion to dismiss, #7 Exhibit Exh. 7 to IPPs' opposition to defendants' consolidated motion to dismiss)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
January 26, 2015 Filing 209 MOTION to Dismiss indirect purchaser complaints by "K" LINE AMERICA, INC., AUTOTRANS AS (France), Alliance Navigation LLC (US), American Auto Logistics, LP, American Logistics Network, LLC, American Roll-On Roll-Off Carrier, LLC, American Shipping and Logistics Inc., Americana De Vapores S.A., COMPANIA SUD AMERICANA DE VAPORES S.A., CSAV AGENCY, LLC, EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners Holdings AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US), KAWASAKI KISEN KAISHA, LTD., MITSUI O.S.K. LINES, LTD.,, MOL (AMERICA), INC., MOL Logistics (USA), Inc., Mitsui O.S.K. Bulk Shipping (U.S.A.), Inc., NIPPON YUSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA, NISSAN MOTOR CAR CARRIER CO., LTD, NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC., WALLENIUS LINES AB, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, WILH WILHELMSEN ASA, WILH WILHELMSEN HOLDING ASA, WWL Vehicle Services Americas Inc., World Logistics Service (U.S.A.), Inc., World Transport Co. Ltd.. Responses due by 12/12/2014 (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of motion to dismiss indirect purchaer complaints, #2 Exhibit Cover sheet and table of contents - Exhibits to consolidated brief in support of motion to dismiss indirect purchaser complaints, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
January 12, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee as to NOAH SCHUBERT, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW022366 (DD, )
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting #198 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 12/15/14. (sr, )
December 1, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 300, receipt number NEW022022 for WAYNE A. MACK and J. MANLY PARKS (gmd, )
November 12, 2014 Filing 207 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Defendants named by Truck and Equipment Dealer Plaintiffs, filed by RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF ARIZONA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF COLORADO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF FLORIDA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF GEORGIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF IDAHO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF KANSAS, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OHIO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OKLAHOMA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF TEXAS, LP., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF UTAH, INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CSAV Agency North America, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mitsui OSK Bulk Shipping (USA) Inc., #3 Exhibit 3 - World Logistics Service (USA) Inc., #4 Exhibit 4 - Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha, #5 Exhibit 5 - NYK Line North America Inc., #6 Exhibit 6 - K Line America Inc., #7 Exhibit 7 - Kawasaki Kisen Kaisha Ltd., #8 Exhibit 8 - CSAV S.A., #9 Exhibit 9 - Mitsui OSK Lines, Ltd., #10 Exhibit 10 - EUKOR Car Carriers Inc., #11 Exhibit 11 - WWL Americas LLC, #12 Exhibit 12 - WWL AS, #13 Exhibit 13 - Hoegh Autoliners AS, #14 Certificate of Service)(BRESLIN, ERIC)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Counsel for Hoegh shall accept service of process on behalf of Hoegh; Hoegh waives any requirement of translation of the Complaint.Other than insufficiency of service, Hoegh preserves all of its defenses, Plaintiffs will not seek any other discovery from Hoegh until a decision by the Court on the motions to dismiss Plaintiffs' claims, which were served on October 13, 2014; unless the Court orders the parties to commence discovery earlier; etc Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/10/14. (DD, )
November 7, 2014 Filing 205 Letter from Eric R. Breslin re service on Hoegh Autoliners AS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(BRESLIN, ERIC)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 204 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the undersigned counsel for NYK & NYK AMERICA shall accept serv. of process on behalf of NYK & NYK AMERICA; Plaintiffs will not serve or seek to serve any other discovery from NYK and/or NYK America until the earlier of: (a) May 1, 2015; (b) a decision by the Court on any motion to dismiss any claim stated by Plaintiffs; (c) a decision by the Court on any motion to dismiss any claim stated by the plaintiffs in the In Re Vehicle Carrier Services Antitrust Litigation, MDL No. 2471. NYK and NYK America reserve their right to object to discovery; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/5/14. (DD, )
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 203 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding service on WWL and EUKOR defts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/3/14. (sr, )
October 31, 2014 Filing 202 Letter from Eric R. Breslin re service on WWL and EUKOR defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(BRESLIN, ERIC)
October 10, 2014 Filing 201 NOTICE of Appearance by ANNE P. DAVIS on behalf of MITSUI O.S.K. LINES, LTD.,, Mitsui O.S.K. Bulk Shipping (U.S.A.), Inc., NISSAN MOTOR CAR CARRIER CO., LTD, World Logistics Service (U.S.A.), Inc. (DAVIS, ANNE)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting #198 Motion to Seal Pltf's Second Amended Cmp.; that the unredacted version of Second Amended Cmp. [ECF No. 183] shall be maintained under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/6/14. (DD, )
October 7, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #198 MOTION to Seal PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Motion set for 11/3/2014 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
October 6, 2014 Filing 199 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., EMPIRE NISSAN OF SANTA ROSA, LLC, HARTLEY BUICK/GMC TRUCK, INC. d/b/a HARTLEY HONDA, HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, HODGES IMPORTED CARS, INC d/b/a HODGES SUBARU, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., PANAMA CITY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC d/b/a JOHN LEE NISSAN, SCOTLAND CAR YARD ENTERPRISES d/b/a SAN RAFAEL MITSUBISHI. PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED UNDER SEAL. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
October 6, 2014 Filing 198 MOTION to Seal PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Martens Cars of Washington, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 STATEMENT IN LIEU OF BRIEF, #2 DECLARATION OF PETER S. PEARLMAN, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
October 6, 2014 Filing 197 AMENDED COMPLAINT REDACTED CONSOLIDATED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against "K" LINE AMERICA, INC., COMPANIA SUD AMERICANA DE VAPORES S.A., CSAV AGENCY, LLC, EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US), KAWASAKI KISEN KAISHA, LTD., MITSUI O.S.K. LINES, LTD.,, NIPPON YUSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA, NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, World Logistics Service (U.S.A.), Inc., filed by HUDSON NISSAN, HODGES IMPORTED CARS, INC d/b/a HODGES SUBARU, EMPIRE NISSAN OF SANTA ROSA, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, PANAMA CITY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC d/b/a JOHN LEE NISSAN, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, SCOTLAND CAR YARD ENTERPRISES d/b/a SAN RAFAEL MITSUBISHI, HARTLEY BUICK/GMC TRUCK, INC. d/b/a HARTLEY HONDA.(PEARLMAN, PETER)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting NYK defendants, the K-Line defendants, the WWL defendants, the CSAV defendants and the Hoegh defendants re scheduling of motions in respect of indirect purchaser truck dealers' complaint. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/25/14. (DD, )
September 29, 2014 Filing 195 Letter from Eric R Breslin re appointment as interim lead counsel for truck and equipment dealers attaching revised proposed order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(BRESLIN, ERIC)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 194 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: serv. of process of Pltfs' consolidated amended cmp. on behalf of MOL, MOL USA & WLS. Plaintiffs can seek leave of the Court to serve discovery regarding such jurisdictional defenses, but MOL Defendants reserve the right to oppose such leave and to object to the requested discovery; MOL Defendants do not agree that the Plaintiffs' Complaint (filed in Case No. 2:14-cv-04469-ES-JAD) is consistent with the Court's Case Management Order Number 1 or otherwise states claims separate from any in the Consolidated Amended Complaints filed in accordance with such Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/26/14. (DD, )
September 25, 2014 Filing 193 Letter from Eric R. Breslin re Appointment as Interim Lead Counsel for Truck and Equipment Dealer Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Duane Morris Antitrust and Competition), #2 Exhibit B (Duane Morris Class Action Litigation), #3 Exhibit C (Eric R. Breslin Resume), #4 Exhibit D (Wayne A. Mack Resume), #5 Exhibit E (J. Manly Parks Resume), #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(BRESLIN, ERIC)
September 25, 2014 Filing 192 Letter from Eric R. Breslin re service on MOL and WLS defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(BRESLIN, ERIC)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 191 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: serv. of process of Pltfs' consolidated amended cmp. on behalf of Hoegh. Plaintiffs shall file a second consolidated amended cmp. solely to add Hoegh Auto liners, Inc. as a party deft. upon consent of all parties, or in the alternative, an Order of the Court. Pltfs. shall file its second consolidated amended cmp. within ten days of receipt thereof. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/24/14. (DD, )
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Service of Process on Compania Sud Americana de Vapores S.A. (CSAV) and CSAV Agency North America, LLC (CSAV North America), etc. and of the Complaint filed by Plaintiffs (Rush Truck Dealers Plaintiffs) and reserving the right to seek guidance on how case 2:14-cv-04469 should be integrated into the MDL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/16/14. (DD, ) Modified on 9/26/2014 (th).
September 18, 2014 Filing 189 Letter from Eric R. Breslin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation re service on CSAV defendants, #2 Certificate of Service)(BRESLIN, ERIC)
September 18, 2014 Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC R. BRESLIN on behalf of RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF ARIZONA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF COLORADO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF FLORIDA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF GEORGIA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF IDAHO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF KANSAS, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OHIO, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OKLAHOMA, INC., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF TEXAS, LP., RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF UTAH, INC., (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BRESLIN, ERIC)
September 10, 2014 Filing 187 Letter from Roberto A. Rivera-Soto, on behalf of the NYK defendants, the K-Line defendants, the WWL defendants, the CSAV defendants and the Hoegh defendants re scheduling of motions in respect of indirect purchaser truck dealers' complaint. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
September 3, 2014 Filing 186 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH TRAN on behalf of Brenda Keegan, Joan MacQuarrie(Plaintiff in 13-6356) (TRAN, ELIZABETH)
September 3, 2014 Filing 185 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER E BARNETT on behalf of Brenda Keegan, Joan MacQuarrie(Plaintiff in 13-6356) (BARNETT, ALEXANDER)
August 28, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee received for Elizabeth Tran, Esq.: $150, receipt number TRE047192 (mmh)
August 28, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #184 MOTION to Seal Document #183 Amended Document,,, . Motion set for 10/6/2014 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
August 27, 2014 Filing 184 MOTION to Seal Document #183 Amended Document,,, by MARY ARNOLD, Grant M. Alban, Jill M. Alban, KATRINA BONAR, STEVEN BRUZONSKY, CRAIG BUSKE, Al Baker, Emmett Brophy, Monica Brushey, DODA CAMAJ, STEPHANIE B. CROSBY, JENNIFER DILLON(Plaintiff in 13-6622), Melinda Deneau, JEFFREY GANNON, EUGENE THOMAS GOESSLING, PAMELA E. GOESSLING, Sean Gurney, SHERYL HALEY, BRUCE HERTZ, Leslie Denise Hart, Elizabeth Ashley Hill, Maria Kooker, ADAIR LARA, Christie Laster, Kori Lehrkamp, John Leyva, Joan MacQuarrie(Plaintiff in 13-6356), TONY NIKPRELAJ, GUSTAVO ADOLFO PEREZ, JUDY A. REIBER, JEFF RUBINSTEIN, Roberta Rothsetin, CATHERINE TAYLOR, Richard Tomasko, Demian Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Statement In Lieu of Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
August 27, 2014 Filing 183 AMENDED DOCUMENT by MARY ARNOLD, Grant M. Alban, Jill M. Alban, KATRINA BONAR, STEVEN BRUZONSKY, CRAIG BUSKE, Al Baker, Emmett Brophy, Monica Brushey, DODA CAMAJ, STEPHANIE B. CROSBY, JENNIFER DILLON(Plaintiff in 13-6622), Melinda Deneau, JEFFREY GANNON, EUGENE THOMAS GOESSLING, PAMELA E. GOESSLING, Sean Gurney, SHERYL HALEY, BRUCE HERTZ, Leslie Denise Hart, Elizabeth Ashley Hill, Maria Kooker, ADAIR LARA, Christie Laster, Kori Lehrkamp, John Leyva, DANIEL MORRIS, Joan MacQuarrie(Plaintiff in 13-6356), TONY NIKPRELAJ, GUSTAVO ADOLFO PEREZ, JUDY A. REIBER, JEFF RUBINSTEIN, Roberta Rothsetin, Alexandra Scott, CATHERINE TAYLOR, Richard Tomasko, Demian Vargas. Amendment to #182 Amended Complaint,,, Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint (unredacted). (CECCHI, JAMES)
August 27, 2014 Filing 182 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint (redacted) against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by SHERYL HALEY, CRAIG BUSKE, Jill M. Alban, KATRINA BONAR, Monica Brushey, GUSTAVO ADOLFO PEREZ, Leslie Denise Hart, JEFFREY GANNON, Roberta Rothsetin, Melinda Deneau, STEVEN BRUZONSKY, Joan MacQuarrie(Plaintiff in 13-6356), John Leyva, JENNIFER DILLON(Plaintiff in 13-6622), JEFF RUBINSTEIN, DODA CAMAJ, Al Baker, Christie Laster, Richard Tomasko, Alexandra Scott, DANIEL MORRIS, JUDY A. REIBER, Elizabeth Ashley Hill, PAMELA E. GOESSLING, MARY ARNOLD, Emmett Brophy, TONY NIKPRELAJ, Kori Lehrkamp, BRUCE HERTZ, Grant M. Alban, ADAIR LARA, CATHERINE TAYLOR, Demian Vargas, EUGENE THOMAS GOESSLING, Maria Kooker, Sean Gurney, STEPHANIE B. CROSBY.(CECCHI, JAMES)
August 27, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee received for Alexander E. Barnett, Esq.: $150, receipt number TRE047127 (mmh)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 STIPULATION AND ORDER that counsel for Hoegh shall, as of August 18, 2014, accept service of process of Plaintiffs' consolidated amended complaint on behalf of Hoegh. Hoegh agrees to join the briefing schedule for prospective motions to dismiss as set forth in Order No. 4 (ECF No. 156). Plaintiffs shall file a second consolidated amended complaint solely to add Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. as a party defendant upon consent of all parties, or in the alternative, anOrder of the Court. Plaintiffs shall file its second consolidated amended complaint within ten days of receipt thereof; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 8/25/14. (DD, )
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 TEXT ORDER - Joan MacQuarrie and Brenda Keegan's motion for the pro hac vice admission of Alexander Barnett, (ECF No. 178), is denied as moot. Counsel is directed to follow the procedure set forth in Paragraph 8 of Order No. 2 (ECF No. 2 ECF No. 95). SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 8/21/14. (nm, )
August 21, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #178 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Alexander Barnett. Motion set for 9/15/2014 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
August 20, 2014 Filing 179 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman to the Honorable Joseph A. Dickson. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED STIPULATION)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
August 20, 2014 Filing 178 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Alexander Barnett by Brenda Keegan, Joan MacQuarrie(Plaintiff in 13-6356). (Attachments: #1 Certification of Steven Williams, #2 Certification of Alexander Barnett, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(WILLIAMS, STEVEN)
August 19, 2014 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN MICHAEL KELLY on behalf of Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US) (KELLY, KEVIN)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing Hoegh Autoliners Holdings AS, Autotrans AS, and Alliance Navigation LLC without prejudice; Counsel for Hoegh Autoliners AS and Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. shall accept service of process of the Direct Purchasers Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint on their behalf. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/18/14. (DD, )
August 18, 2014 Filing 175 Letter from Hollis Salzman Enclosing Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Service of Hoegh. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order)(TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
August 15, 2014 Filing 174 Certification of KATHERINE VAN DYCK REGARDING SERVICE OF TRANSLATED UN-REDACTED CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT on behalf of Martens Cars of Washington, Inc.. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting #172 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney FARRELL MALONE terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 8/14/14. (DD, )
August 14, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #172 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Farrell Malone. Motion set for 9/15/2014 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
August 13, 2014 Filing 172 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Farrell Malone by "K" LINE AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MALONE, FARRELL)
August 13, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee as to MELISSA H. MAXMAN, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW020963 (DD, )
August 13, 2014 Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA HELEN MAXMAN on behalf of Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US) (MAXMAN, MELISSA)
August 8, 2014 Filing 170 Certified Mail Returned sent to Robert F. Coyne. (sr, ) Modified on 8/13/2014 (th).
August 7, 2014 Filing 169 STIPULATION (Filed on Behalf of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs) by INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP.. (DONOVAN, ROBERT)
August 4, 2014 Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL R. SHULMAN on behalf of ELIZABETH ALLIS, CRAIG BUSKE, WILLIAM ELWOOD, JUDY A. REIBER (SHULMAN, DANIEL)
July 10, 2014 Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance by ALYSON LOUISE OLIVER on behalf of JENNIFER DILLON(Plaintiff in 13-6622) (OLIVER, ALYSON)
July 8, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW020571 RE: Alyson Oliver. (sr, )
July 8, 2014 Filing 166 NOTICE by Jennifer Dillon re #95 Order,,, Letter Requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Alyson L. Oliver (Attachments: #1 Certification of Alyson L. Oliver, #2 Certificate of Service)(OLIVER, ALYSON)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting #135 Motion to Seal Document #134 Amended Document,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 7/1/14. (DD, )
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting #138 Motion to Seal CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 7/1/14. (DD, )
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #141 Motion to Seal Document #142 Amended Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 7/1/14. (DD, )
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/30/14. (DD, )
June 24, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 300, receipt number TRE045161 as to David M. Cialkowski and Anne T. Regan. (jjc)
June 24, 2014 Filing 161 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP. (DONOVAN, ROBERT)
June 19, 2014 Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by ANNE T. REGAN on behalf of MARY ARNOLD (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(REGAN, ANNE)
June 19, 2014 Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID M. CIALKOWSKI on behalf of MARY ARNOLD (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CIALKOWSKI, DAVID)
June 19, 2014 Filing 158 Certification of KATHERINE VAN DYCK REGARDING SERVICE OF TRANSLATED AMENDED COMPLAINT on behalf of Martens Cars of Washington, Inc.. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
June 17, 2014 Filing 157 Certification of Service on behalf of Grant M. Alban, Jill M. Alban, KATRINA BONAR, STEVEN BRUZONSKY, CRAIG BUSKE, Al Baker, Emmett Brophy, Monica Brushey, DODA CAMAJ, Melinda Deneau, Jennifer Dillon, JEFFREY GANNON, EUGENE THOMAS GOESSLING, PAMELA E. GOESSLING, Sean Gurney, SHERYL HALEY, BRUCE HERTZ, Leslie Denise Hart, Elizabeth Ashley Hill, Maria Kooker, ADAIR LARA, Christie Laster, Kori Lehrkamp, John Leyva, DANIEL MORRIS, Joan MacQuarrie(Plaintiff in 13-6356), TONY NIKPRELAJ, GUSTAVO ADOLFO PEREZ, JUDY A. REIBER, JEFF RUBINSTEIN, Roberta Rothsetin, Alexandra Scott, CATHERINE TAYLOR, Richard Tomasko, Demian Vargas Re #156 Order,,. (HOLLYWOOD, MEEGAN)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER NO. 4 that, on or before July 14, 2014, Plaintiffs shall provide translated versions of the Consolidated, Amended Class Action Complaints as required under this Court's prior Orders, (ECF Nos. 118, 119, 120, 122 and 123); that, on or before October 13, 2014, Defendants shall serve but not file any motions to dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated, Amended Class Action Complaints; that, on or before December 12, 2014, Plaintiffs shall serve but not file any oppositions to Defendants' motions to dismiss; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/13/14. (DD, )
June 10, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee received for Adam Pergament, Esq. and Anne Davis, Esq.: $300, receipt number TRE044682 (mmh) Modified on 7/9/2014 (DD).
June 10, 2014 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM MICHAEL PERGAMENT on behalf of MITSUI O.S.K. LINES, LTD.,, MOL (AMERICA), INC., MOL Logistics (USA), Inc., Mitsui O.S.K. Bulk Shipping (U.S.A.), Inc., NISSAN MOTOR CAR CARRIER CO., LTD, World Logistics Service (U.S.A.), Inc., World Transport Co. Ltd. (PERGAMENT, ADAM)
June 4, 2014 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT J. BONSIGNORE on behalf of JEFFREY GANNON (BONSIGNORE, ROBERT)
June 4, 2014 Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT J. BONSIGNORE on behalf of Elizabeth Ashley Hill (BONSIGNORE, ROBERT)
June 4, 2014 Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT J. BONSIGNORE on behalf of Sean Gurney (BONSIGNORE, ROBERT)
June 4, 2014 Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT J. BONSIGNORE on behalf of Alexandra Scott (BONSIGNORE, ROBERT)
June 4, 2014 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT J. BONSIGNORE on behalf of Richard Tomasko (BONSIGNORE, ROBERT)
June 4, 2014 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT J. BONSIGNORE on behalf of Kori Lehrkamp (BONSIGNORE, ROBERT)
June 4, 2014 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT J. BONSIGNORE on behalf of Al Baker (BONSIGNORE, ROBERT)
June 4, 2014 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT J. BONSIGNORE on behalf of Maria Kooker (BONSIGNORE, ROBERT)
June 3, 2014 Filing 146 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP. re #141 MOTION to Seal Document , #140 Amended Complaint,, (DONOVAN, ROBERT)
June 3, 2014 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL COHEN on behalf of Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, HUDSON NISSAN, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., Toyota of Bristol (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(COHEN, DANIEL)
June 3, 2014 Filing 144 SUMMONS ON AMENDED CMP. ISSUED as to Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway) Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *DONNA DE ANGELIS* (DD, )
June 3, 2014 Filing 143 Request for Summons to be Issued by Martens Cars of Washington, Inc. as to Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway). (PEARLMAN, PETER)
June 3, 2014 Filing 142 AMENDED DOCUMENT by INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP.. (Amended Complaint - Unredacted). (DONOVAN, ROBERT)
June 3, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #138 MOTION to Seal CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, #141 MOTION to Seal Document , #135 MOTION to Seal Document #134 Amended Document, . Motion set for 7/7/2014 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
June 2, 2014 Filing 141 MOTION to Seal Document by INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lewis H. Goldfarb, Esq. in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DONOVAN, ROBERT)
June 2, 2014 Filing 140 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Redacted Version Re-Filed) against "K" LINE AMERICA, INC., AUTOTRANS AS (France), Alliance Navigation LLC (US), COMPANIA SUD AMERICANA DE VAPORES S.A., CSAV AGENCY, LLC, EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners Holdings AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US), KAWASAKI KISEN KAISHA, LTD., MITSUI O.S.K. LINES, LTD.,, MOL (AMERICA), INC., MOL Logistics (USA), Inc., NIPPON YUSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA, NISSAN MOTOR CAR CARRIER CO., LTD, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, Americana De Vapores S.A., filed by INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP..(DONOVAN, ROBERT)
June 2, 2014 Filing 139 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., EMPIRE NISSAN OF SANTA ROSA, LLC, HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, HODGES IMPORTED CARS, INC d/b/a HODGES SUBARU, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., PANAMA CITY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC d/b/a JOHN LEE NISSAN, Toyota of Bristol. AMENDED COMPLAINT (Unredacted). (PEARLMAN, PETER)
June 2, 2014 Filing 138 MOTION to Seal CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., EMPIRE NISSAN OF SANTA ROSA, LLC, HODGES IMPORTED CARS, INC d/b/a HODGES SUBARU, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., PANAMA CITY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC d/b/a JOHN LEE NISSAN, Toyota of Bristol. (Attachments: #1 STATEMENT IN LIEU OF BRIEF, #2 DECLARATION OF PETER S. PEARLMAN, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
June 2, 2014 Filing 137 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Redacted Version) against Hoegh Autoliners Holdings AS (Norway), Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway), AUTOTRANS AS (France), Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US), Alliance Navigation LLC (US), filed by INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP..(DONOVAN, ROBERT)
June 2, 2014 Filing 136 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Redacted) against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by SHERYL HALEY, Jennifer Dillon, Jill M. Alban, KATRINA BONAR, Monica Brushey, GUSTAVO ADOLFO PEREZ, Joan MacQuarrie, Leslie Denise Hart, Emmett Brophy, JEFFREY GANNON, Roberta Rothsetin, TONY NIKPRELAJ, Melinda Deneau, STEVEN BRUZONSKY, John Leyva, Kori Lehrkamp, JENNIFER DILLON(Plaintiff in 13-6622), JEFF RUBINSTEIN, BRUCE HERTZ, DODA CAMAJ, Al Baker, Grant M. Alban, ADAIR LARA, Christie Laster, Richard Tomasko, CATHERINE TAYLOR, Alexandra Scott, DANIEL MORRIS, JUDY A. REIBER, Elizabeth Ashley Hill, Demian Vargas, EUGENE THOMAS GOESSLING, Maria Kooker, Sean Gurney, PAMELA E. GOESSLING.(CECCHI, JAMES)
June 2, 2014 Filing 135 MOTION to Seal Document #134 Amended Document, by Grant M. Alban, Jill M. Alban, KATRINA BONAR, STEVEN BRUZONSKY, CRAIG BUSKE, Al Baker, Emmett Brophy, Monica Brushey, DODA CAMAJ, Melinda Deneau, Jennifer Dillon, JEFFREY GANNON, EUGENE THOMAS GOESSLING, PAMELA E. GOESSLING, Sean Gurney, SHERYL HALEY, BRUCE HERTZ, Leslie Denise Hart, Elizabeth Ashley Hill, Maria Kooker, Christie Laster, Kori Lehrkamp, John Leyva, DANIEL MORRIS, Joan MacQuarrie, TONY NIKPRELAJ, GUSTAVO ADOLFO PEREZ, JEFF RUBINSTEIN, Roberta Rothsetin, Alexandra Scott, CATHERINE TAYLOR, Richard Tomasko, Demian Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Supplement In Lieu of Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
June 2, 2014 Filing 134 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Melinda Deneau, Jill M. Alban, Grant M. Alban, Al Baker, Emmett Brophy, Monica Brushey, Jennifer Dillon, JEFFREY GANNON, Sean Gurney, Leslie Denise Hart, Elizabeth Ashley Hill, Maria Kooker, Christie Laster, Kori Lehrkamp, John Leyva, Joan MacQuarrie, Roberta Rothsetin, Alexandra Scott, CATHERINE TAYLOR, Richard Tomasko, Demian Vargas. Amended Complaint (Unredacted). (CECCHI, JAMES)
June 2, 2014 Filing 133 AMENDED COMPLAINT REDACTED against "K" LINE AMERICA, INC., COMPANIA SUD AMERICANA DE VAPORES S.A., CSAV AGENCY, LLC, EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., KAWASAKI KISEN KAISHA, LTD., MITSUI O.S.K. LINES, LTD.,, MOL (AMERICA), INC., MOL Logistics (USA), Inc., Mitsui O.S.K. Bulk Shipping (U.S.A.), Inc., NIPPON YUSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA, NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, World Logistics Service (U.S.A.), Inc., filed by HUDSON NISSAN, HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., EMPIRE NISSAN OF SANTA ROSA, LLC, HODGES IMPORTED CARS, INC d/b/a HODGES SUBARU, PANAMA CITY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC d/b/a JOHN LEE NISSAN.(PEARLMAN, PETER)
June 2, 2014 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT P. DONOVAN on behalf of INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP. (DONOVAN, ROBERT)
May 3, 2014 Filing 131 STIPULATION by American Logistics Network, LLC. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
May 2, 2014 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN F. HOLT on behalf of American Auto Logistics, LP, American Roll-On Roll-Off Carrier, LLC, American Shipping and Logistics Inc., EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., WALLENIUS LINES AB, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, WILH WILHELMSEN ASA, WILH WILHELMSEN HOLDING ASA, WWL Vehicle Services Americas Inc. (HOLT, BENJAMIN)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING ACTION as to deft., FUJITRANS, U.S.A., INC., w/out prejudice. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 4/29/14. (DD, )
April 28, 2014 Filing 128 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SALZMAN, HOLLIS)
April 22, 2014 Filing 127 Certification of Solomon B. Cera and Charles A. Dirksen on behalf of MANACO INTERNATIONAL FORWARDERS, INC.. (CERA, SOLOMON)
April 15, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee received for Solomon B. Cera, Esq. and Charles A. Dirksen, Esq.: $300, receipt number TRE042936 (mmh)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Pltfs. will not name any of the WWL Parents, ASL Group, AAL, VSA and ARC in the consolidated amended complaints to be filed by pltfs. Contemporaneous with the execution and delivery of this stipulation,pltfs. and the WWL Parents, the ASL Group, AAL, VSA and ARC have entered into a separate tolling agreement, which tolling agreement shall remain in effect as long as WWL AS, EUKOR, or WWL Americas remain as defendants in any of the actions. WWL AS, EUKOR, and WWL Americas hereby waive any requirement of translation of the consolidated amended complaints; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 4/8/14. (DD, )
April 7, 2014 Filing 125 STIPULATION and proposed form of order re dismissal of parties, waiver of service rights under The Hague Convention, etc. by American Auto Logistics, LP, American Roll-On Roll-Off Carrier, LLC, American Shipping and Logistics Inc., EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., VEHICLE CARRIER SERVICES ANTITRUST LITIGATION, WALLENIUS LINES AB, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, WILH WILHELMSEN ASA, WILH WILHELMSEN HOLDING ASA, WWL Vehicle Services Americas Inc.. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
April 1, 2014 Filing 124 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney MICHAEL E. PATUNAS terminated. (PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION AND ORDER that counsel for Nippon Yusen and NYK Line shall, as of the date each of the consolidated complaints is filed, accept service of process on their behalf in the Direct, End Payor and Dealer actions. Other than service, Nippon Yusen and NYK Line preserve all their defenses, including jurisdictional defenses, if any, but if jurisdictional defenses are raised in a motion to dismiss, plaintiffs can seek leave of the Court to serve discovery re that jurisdictional defense, but Nippon Yusen and NYK Line reserve the right to oppose such leave and to object to the requested discovery. Plaintiffs will not serve or seek to serve any other discovery from Nippon Yusen and NYK Line until May 1, 2015 or a decision on the motions to dismiss, whichever is sooner, but Nippon Yusen and NYK Line preserve their right to object to discovery. Plaintiffs will provide translated versions of the Consolidated Amended Complaints when the consolidated complaints are served. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/31/14. (DD, )
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 STIPULATION AND ORDER that counsel for "K" Line and KAM shall, as of the date each of the consolidated amended complaints is filed, accept service of process on "K" Line's and KAM's behalf in the Direct, End Payor, and Dealer actions. Plaintiffs will not serve or seek to serve any other discovery from "K" Line and/or KAM until May 1, 2015 or a decision on the motions to dismiss, whichever is sooner, but "K" Line and KAM preserve their right to object to discovery. Plaintiffs will provide translated versions of the consolidated amended complaints when the consolidated complaints are served; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/31/14. (DD, )
March 28, 2014 Filing 121 Letter from Direct Purchaser, End Payor, and Dealer Plaintiffs to The Honorable Joseph A. Dickson re:service on foreign defendants. (KAPLAN, ROBERT)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STIPULATION AND ORDER that counsel for Compania Sud and CSAV shall, as of the date each of the consolidated amended complaints is filed, accept service of process on their behalf in the Direct, End Payor and Dealer actions. Other than service, Compania Sud and CSAV preserve all their defenses,including jurisdictional defenses, if any, but if jurisdictional defenses are raised in a motion to dismiss, plaintiffs can seek leave of the Court to serve discovery regarding that jurisdictional defense, but Compania Sud and CSAV reserve the right to oppose such leave and to object to the requested discovery. Plaintiffs will not serve or seek to serve any other requests for discovery from Compania Sud and CSAV until May 1, 2015 or a decision on the motions to dismiss, whichever is sooner, but Compania Sud and CSAV preserve their right to object to discovery requests served; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/28/14. (DD, )
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION AND ORDER that counsel for MOL Defts. shall, as of the date each of the Consolidated Amended Complaints is filed., accept service of process on their behalf in the Direct, End Payor & Dealer Actions. If MOL Defendants raise jurisdictional defenses in a motion to dismiss, plaintiffs can seek leave of the Court to serve discovery regarding those jurisdictional defenses, but MOL Defendants reserve the right to oppose such leave and to object to the requested discovery. Plaintiffs will not serve or seek to serve any other requests for discovery from MOL Defendants until May 1, 2015 or a decision on the motions to dismiss, whichever is sooner, but MOL Defendants preserve their right to object to any discovery requests served; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/28/14. (DD, )
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION AND ORDER that counsel for Toyofuji shall, as of the date each of the Consolidated Amended Complaints is filed, accept service of process on Toyofuji's behalf in the Direct, End Payor and Dealer actions. If Toyofuji raises jurisdictional defenses in a motion to dismiss, plaintiffs can seek leave of the Court to serve discovery relating to that jurisdictional defense, but Toyofuji reserves the right to oppose such leave and to object to the requested discovery. Plaintiffs will not serve or seek to serve any other requests for discovery from Toyofuji until May 1, 2015 or a decision on motions to dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaints, whichever is sooner; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/28/14. (DD, )
March 28, 2014 Filing 117 STIPULATION by Kawasaki Kisen Kaisha, Ltd. and K Line America, Inc. and all plaintiffs by F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KAPLAN, ROBERT)
March 28, 2014 Filing 116 STIPULATION by Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha and NYK Line (North America) Inc. and all plaintiffs by F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KAPLAN, ROBERT)
March 27, 2014 Filing 115 STIPULATION by Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd., Nissan Motor Car Carrier Co., Ltd, Mitsui O.S.K. Bulk Shipping (USA), Inc., MOL (America), Inc., MOL Logistics (USA) Inc., World Logistics Service (USA), Inc., and World Transport Co. Ltd. by F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KAPLAN, ROBERT)
March 27, 2014 Filing 114 STIPULATION Compania Sud Americana de Vapores, S.A. and CSAV and ALL PLAINTIFFS by F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KAPLAN, ROBERT)
March 26, 2014 Filing 113 STIPULATION by TOYOFUJI SHIPPING CO. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(EVERETT, JOHN)
March 21, 2014 Filing 112 Letter from counsel for all parties re status on discovery confidentiality order and preservation date range re #107 Order,,,. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
March 18, 2014 Filing 111 Certification of Fee Payment for pro hac vice on behalf of DANIEL C. HEDLUND, ESQ. (DD, )
March 17, 2014 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by BRENDAN FREY on behalf of Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, HUDSON NISSAN, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., Toyota of Bristol (FREY, BRENDAN)
March 13, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW019559 RE: Daniel C. Hedlund. (sr, )
March 13, 2014 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE WARREN VAN DYCK on behalf of Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, HUDSON NISSAN, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., Toyota of Bristol (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(VAN DYCK, KATHERINE)
March 12, 2014 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by GERARD V. MANTESE on behalf of Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, HUDSON NISSAN, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., Toyota of Bristol (MANTESE, GERARD)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER NO. 3 that, on or before March 14, 2014, the parties shall meet and confer attempt to reach an agreement regarding the appropriate date range for their document preservation obligations; that, on or before March 14, 2014, the parties shall meet and confer attempt to reach an agreement regarding the form of a proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order for this matter; that, on or before March 21, 2014, the parties shall advise the Court, in writing, regarding the status of those meetings; that, on or before March 14, 2014, the parties shall meet and confer regarding the service issues described in the parties' joint status report, and shall make a good faith effort to resolve those issues. (ECF No. 62 at 7-11). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/4/14. (DD, )
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER that purs. to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(g), the Court hereby appoints Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, Freed Kanner London & Millen LLC., and Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel, and McElroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP as Interim Liaison Counsel, for the direct purchaser action; the Court hereby appoints Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi L.L.P., Susman Godfrey LLP, and Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP as Interim Class Counsel, and Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C. as Interim Liaison Counsel, for the end-payor actions; the Court hereby appoints Cuneo Gilbert & LaDuca, LLP, Barrett Law Group, P.A. and Larson King, LLP as Interim Class Counsel, and Cohn, Lifland, Pearlman, Herrmann & Knopf LLP as Interim Liaison Counsel, for the automobile dealer indirect purchaser actions; etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 3/3/14. (DD, )
February 27, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Status Conference held on 2/27/2014. (nm, )
February 27, 2014 Filing 105 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint served on Mitsui O.S.K. Bulk Shipping (USA) Inc. on 01/16/2014, filed by INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP.. (FENTON-VALDIVIA, LAUREN)
February 27, 2014 Filing 104 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint served on CSAV Agency North America LLC on 01/16/2014, filed by INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP.. (FENTON-VALDIVIA, LAUREN)
February 27, 2014 Filing 103 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint served on American Shipping and Logistics Inc. on 01/15/2014, filed by INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP.. (FENTON-VALDIVIA, LAUREN)
February 27, 2014 Filing 102 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint served on American Roll-On Roll-Off Carrier LLC on 01/15/2014, filed by INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP.. (FENTON-VALDIVIA, LAUREN)
February 25, 2014 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL E. PATUNAS on behalf of INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP. (PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #97 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. STEVEN M. EDWARDS terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 2/25/14. (DD, )
February 25, 2014 Filing 99 Certification of Fee Payment on behalf of NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC.. (FORNACIARI, JOHN)
February 25, 2014 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIK JOESPH RAVEN-HANSEN on behalf of NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC. (RAVEN-HANSEN, ERIK)
February 25, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee as to BENJAMIN HOLT, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW019356 (DD, )
February 25, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #97 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Steven M. Edwards. Motion set for 4/7/2014 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
February 24, 2014 Filing 97 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Steven M. Edwards by American Auto Logistics, LP, American Roll-On Roll-Off Carrier, LLC, American Shipping and Logistics Inc., EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., WALLENIUS LINES AB, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, WILH WILHELMSEN ASA, WILH WILHELMSEN HOLDING ASA, WWL Vehicle Services Americas Inc.. (NOWAK, MAXIM)
February 24, 2014 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by MAXIM M.L. NOWAK on behalf of American Auto Logistics, LP, American Roll-On Roll-Off Carrier, LLC, American Shipping and Logistics Inc., EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., WALLENIUS LINES AB, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, WILH WILHELMSEN ASA, WILH WILHELMSEN HOLDING ASA, WWL Vehicle Services Americas Inc. (NOWAK, MAXIM)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER NO. 2 that the provisions of this Order shall govern the practice and procedure in those actions: (a) transferred to this Court by the JPML pursuant to its October 18, 2013 Order; (b) all actions that arise out of or relate to the subject matter of this litigation which was previously or will be transferred to MDL 2471; and (c) any tag-along actions later filed in, removed to, or transferred to this Court. An original of this Order shall be filed by the Clerk in the Master File and in the files for each of the actions filed in this district or transferred here. Until the parties reach agreement on a preservation plan, all parties and their counsel are reminded of their duty to preserve evidence that may be relevant to this action. Documents, data, and tangible things is to be interpreted broadly. The parties shall appear for an initial case management conference on January 31, 2014 at 2:00 p.m.; etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 2/24/14. (DD, )
February 21, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee as to ERIK J. RAVEN-HANSEN, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW019334 (DD, )
February 21, 2014 Filing 94 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMPANIA SUD AMERICANA DE VAPORES S.A. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *DONNA DE ANGELIS* (DD, )
February 21, 2014 Filing 93 Request for Summons to be Issued by RITA DIEL-BROWN, KENNETH A. NELSON, EUGENE THOMAS GOESSLING, PAMELA E. GOESSLING as to COMPANIA SUD AMERICANA DE VAPORES S.A.. (BURNS, WARREN)
February 21, 2014 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by TODD F. BRAUNSTEIN on behalf of COMPANIA SUD AMERICANA DE VAPORES S.A., CSAV AGENCY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BRAUNSTEIN, TODD)
February 19, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee as to DANIEL H. CHAREST, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW019292 (DD, )
February 19, 2014 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL H. CHAREST on behalf of F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC., ROBERT O'ROURKE (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CHAREST, DANIEL)
February 19, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee received for Terry Gross, Esq. and Adam C. Belsky, Esq.: $300, receipt number TRE041082 (mmh)
February 18, 2014 Filing 90 Certification of Fee Payment on behalf of "K" LINE AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KAISER, STEVEN)
February 18, 2014 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANA GJONAJ on behalf of DODA CAMAJ, TONY NIKPRELAJ (GJONAJ, DIANA)
February 18, 2014 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL F NOVAK on behalf of DODA CAMAJ, TONY NIKPRELAJ (NOVAK, PAUL)
February 10, 2014 Filing 87 Certification of Warren T. Burns and Daniel H. Charest on behalf of F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC.. (BURNS, WARREN)
February 7, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee as to STEVEN M. EDWARDS, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW019240 (DD, )
February 5, 2014 Filing 85 Certification of Fee Payment on Behalf of Steven M. Edwards for Pro Hac Vice Admission on behalf of American Auto Logistics, LP, American Roll-On Roll-Off Carrier, LLC, American Shipping and Logistics Inc., EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., WALLENIUS LINES AB, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, WILH WILHELMSEN ASA, WILH WILHELMSEN HOLDING ASA, WWL Vehicle Services Americas Inc.. (NOWAK, MAXIM)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 TEXT ORDER - The parties are advised that an in-person conference is scheduled for 2/27/14 at 3:30 PM in Newark - Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson.SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 2/3/14. (nm, )
January 31, 2014 Filing 84 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Esther Salas: Status Conference held on 1/31/2014. (ps, )
January 31, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/31/2014. (nm, )
January 31, 2014 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Fee Payment for David A. Young, M. Juan Dominguez, Matthew W. Ruan, and Kit A. Pierson by DAVID A. YOUNG on behalf of MANACO INTERNATIONAL FORWARDERS, INC. (YOUNG, DAVID)
January 31, 2014 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH L. BUTLER on behalf of ESTEBAN ADAME (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BUTLER, KEITH)
January 31, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN RUSSELL STRANGE on behalf of ESTEBAN ADAME (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(STRANGE, BRIAN)
January 31, 2014 Filing 79 Certification on behalf of INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP.. (MOSKOVITZ, MICHAEL)
January 31, 2014 Filing 78 Certification on behalf of INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP.. (KANNER, STEVEN)
January 31, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN WATSON CUNEO on behalf of Desert European Motorcars, Ltd., HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, HUDSON NISSAN, Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., Toyota of Bristol (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CUNEO, JONATHAN)
January 30, 2014 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Robert N. Kaplan and Lauren I. Dubick by ROBERT N. KAPLAN on behalf of Cargo Agents, Inc. (KAPLAN, ROBERT)
January 30, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee received for Steven J. Kaiser, Esq.: $150, receipt number TRE040521 (mmh)
January 30, 2014 Filing 75 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics Americas LLC on 01/10/14, filed by MANACO INTERNATIONAL FORWARDERS, INC.. (PIERSON, KIT)
January 30, 2014 Filing 74 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on NYK Line (North America) Inc. on 01/10/14, filed by MANACO INTERNATIONAL FORWARDERS, INC.. (PIERSON, KIT)
January 30, 2014 Filing 73 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on "K" Line America, Inc. on 01/13/14, filed by MANACO INTERNATIONAL FORWARDERS, INC.. (PIERSON, KIT)
January 30, 2014 Filing 72 Certification of Hollis Salzman and Meegan Hollywood on behalf of F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC., ROBERT O'ROURKE. (SALZMAN, HOLLIS)
January 30, 2014 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL R. LAZERWITZ on behalf of "K" LINE AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LAZERWITZ, MICHAEL)
January 30, 2014 Filing 70 Certification of Lewis H. Goldfarb on behalf of INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP.. (GOLDFARB, LEWIS)
January 29, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by FARRELL MALONE on behalf of "K" LINE AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MALONE, FARRELL)
January 29, 2014 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY JAMES CALSYN on behalf of "K" LINE AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CALSYN, JEREMY)
January 29, 2014 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK W. NELSON on behalf of "K" LINE AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NELSON, MARK)
January 29, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN CLAYTON EVERETT, JR on behalf of TOYOFUJI SHIPPING CO. LTD. (EVERETT, JOHN)
January 28, 2014 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN K. HERRINGTON on behalf of Martens Cars of Washington, Inc. (sr, )
January 28, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee as to JOHN CLAYTON EVERETT, JR., ESQ., SCOTT A. STEMPEL, ESQ. & GRETA L. BURKHOLDER, ESQ.: $ 450, receipt number NEW019178 (DD, )
January 28, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee as to BRENDAN H. FREY, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW019176 (DD, )
January 28, 2014 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN F. CHERRY on behalf of COMPANIA SUD AMERICANA DE VAPORES S.A., CSAV AGENCY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CHERRY, STEVEN)
January 28, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Louis Goldfarb: $ 150, receipt number TRE040144 (eaj)
January 28, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee received for Brian R. Strange, Esq. and Keith Butler, Esq.: $300, receipt number TRE040437 (mmh)
January 28, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee received for Jeremy J. Calsyn, Esq., Farrell Malone, Esq., Mark W. Nelson, Esq. and Michael R. Lazerwitz, Esq.: $600, receipt number TRE040464 (mmh)
January 28, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee received for Brian K. Herrington, Esq.: $150, receipt number TRE040465 (mmh)
January 27, 2014 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER THOMAS MICHELETTI on behalf of ELIZABETH ALLIS, CRAIG BUSKE, WILLIAM ELWOOD, MICHAEL JACKSON, JUDY A. REIBER, MATTHEW RIGHETTI, DARREL SENIOR (MICHELETTI, CHRISTOPHER)
January 27, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee as to GERARD V. MANTESE, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW019163 (DD, )
January 27, 2014 Filing 63 Letter from defendants correcting joint status letter report re plaintiffs' standing re #62 Letter,,,. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
January 24, 2014 Filing 62 Letter from all parties - joint status report. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' proposed discovery plan, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' objections to plaintiffs' discovery plan, #3 Exhibit C - Defendants' plan regarding the preservation of documents and electronically stored information, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiffs' proposed stipulation and order regarding preservation of documents, electronically stored information, and other tangible items, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiffs' proposed stipulation and order regarding production of electronically stored information and hard copy documents, #6 Exhibit F - Plaintiffs' proposed stipulation and order regarding non-discoverability of certain expert materials and communications, #7 Exhibit G - Plaintiffs proposed discovery confidentiality order)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
January 24, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 600, receipt number new019154 RE: Jonathan Cuneo, Joel Davidow, Katherine Vandyck & Daniel Cohen. (sr, )
January 24, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee received for Hollis Salzman, Esq. and Meegan Hollywood, Esq.: $300, receipt number TRE040347 (mmh)
January 23, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee as to JOHN R. FORNACIARI, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW019120 (DD, )
January 23, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee received for Steven A. Kanner, Esq. and Michael E. Moskovitz, Esq.: $300, receipt number TRE040296 (mmh)
January 23, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee as to FRANCIS O. SCARPULLA, ESQ. & CHRISTOPHER T. MICHELETTI, ESQ.: $ 300, receipt number NEW019117 (DD, )
January 22, 2014 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS ONOFREI SCARPULLA on behalf of ELIZABETH ALLIS, CRAIG BUSKE, WILLIAM ELWOOD, MICHAEL JACKSON, JUDY A. REIBER, MATTHEW RIGHETTI, DARREL SENIOR (SCARPULLA, FRANCIS)
January 17, 2014 Filing 60 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman to the Honorable Esther Salas, USDJ Regarding Additional Information In Support of Application for Appointment as Interim Class Counsel. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
January 17, 2014 Filing 59 Letter from End Purchaser Counsel Regarding Additional Information In Support of Application for Appointment as Interim Class Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(CECCHI, JAMES)
January 17, 2014 Filing 58 Letter from Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs regarding Appointment of Counsel re #28 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(FENTON-VALDIVIA, LAUREN)
January 16, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee as to PAUL F. NOVAK, ESQ. & DIANA GJONAJ, ESQ.: $ 300, receipt number NEW019082 (DD, )
January 14, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee as to ELIZABETH C. PRITZKER, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW019069 (DD, )
January 14, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by MEEGAN F. HOLLYWOOD on behalf of F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC., ROBERT O'ROURKE (HOLLYWOOD, MEEGAN)
January 14, 2014 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH C. PRITZKER on behalf of Brenda Keegan, Joan MacQuarrie (PRITZKER, ELIZABETH)
January 14, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by KIT A. PIERSON on behalf of MANACO INTERNATIONAL FORWARDERS, INC. (PIERSON, KIT)
January 13, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee received for David A. Young, Esq., Matthew W. Ruan, Esq., Kit A. Pierson, Esq. and M. Juan Dominguez, Esq.: $600, receipt number TRE040010 (mmh)
January 10, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Lauren I. Dubick: $ 150, receipt number TRE039973 (eaj)
January 10, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Robert N. Kaplan: $ 150, receipt number TRE033972 (eaj)
January 8, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee as to JAMES L. COOPER, ESQ. & DANIELLE M. GARTEN, ESQ.: $ 300, receipt number NEW019007 (DD, )
January 8, 2014 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW W. RUAN on behalf of MANACO INTERNATIONAL FORWARDERS, INC. (RUAN, MATTHEW)
January 8, 2014 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID A. YOUNG on behalf of MANACO INTERNATIONAL FORWARDERS, INC. (YOUNG, DAVID)
January 8, 2014 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by MANUEL JUAN DOMINGUEZ on behalf of MANACO INTERNATIONAL FORWARDERS, INC. (DOMINGUEZ, MANUEL)
January 8, 2014 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIELLE M. GARTEN on behalf of MITSUI O.S.K. LINES, LTD.,, MOL (AMERICA), INC., MOL Logistics (USA), Inc., Mitsui O.S.K. Bulk Shipping (U.S.A.), Inc., NISSAN MOTOR CAR CARRIER CO., LTD, World Logistics Service (U.S.A.), Inc., World Transport Co. Ltd. (GARTEN, DANIELLE)
January 8, 2014 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES L. COOPER on behalf of MITSUI O.S.K. LINES, LTD.,, NISSAN MOTOR CAR CARRIER CO., LTD, Mitsui O.S.K. Bulk Shipping (U.S.A.), Inc., MOL (AMERICA), INC., MOL Logistics (USA), Inc., World Logistics Service (U.S.A.), Inc., World Transport Co. Ltd. (COOPER, JAMES)
January 7, 2014 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT N. KAPLAN on behalf of Cargo Agents, Inc. (KAPLAN, ROBERT)
January 6, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee as to STEVEN F. CHERRY, ESQ., TODD F. BRAUNSTEIN, ESQ & CHANA CANNON, ESQ: $ 450, receipt number NEW018967 (DD, )
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER that the provisions of this Order shall govern the practice and procedure in those actions; the civil actions listed in Schedule A are consolidated for pretrial purposes; a Master File Docket is hereby established for this proceeding. For purposes of coordination, the Master Docket Number shall be 13-cv-3306 (ES) (JAD) (MDL 2471). Documents that apply to all actions shall be filed only in Civil Docket 13-cv-3306 (ES) (JAD) (MDL 2471) with the words "This Document Relates to All Actions" in the caption. Documents that apply to fewer than all actions shall be filed in both 13-cv-3306 (ES) (JAD) (MDL 2471) with a notation as to the case number(s) to which it pertains with the words "This Document Relates to [insert individual actions]" and in the individual case; an original of this Order shall be filed by the Clerk in the Master File and in the files for each of the actions filed in this district or transferred here. The parties shall appear for an initial case management conference on January 31, 2014 at 2:00 p.m.; etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 12/27/13. (DD, )
December 26, 2013 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by MAXIM M.L. NOWAK on behalf of EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., WALLENIUS LINES AB, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, WILH WILHELMSEN ASA, WILH WILHELMSEN HOLDING ASA, WWL Vehicle Services Americas Inc., American Shipping and Logistics Inc., American Roll-On Roll-Off Carrier, LLC, American Auto Logistics, LP (NOWAK, MAXIM)
December 26, 2013 Filing 46 Letter from International Transport Management on behalf of all Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (GOLDFARB, LEWIS)
December 23, 2013 Filing 45 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman, Esq.. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
December 20, 2013 Filing 44 Letter from Counsel for End Payors Regarding Request Case Management Conference re #37 Letter, #43 Letter. (CECCHI, JAMES)
December 19, 2013 Filing 43 Letter from defendants re consolidation hearing/case management conf. re #37 Letter. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
December 18, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by WARREN T BURNS on behalf of F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC., ROBERT O'ROURKE (BURNS, WARREN)
December 18, 2013 Filing 41 NOTICE by EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., WALLENIUS LINES AB, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, WILH WILHELMSEN ASA, WILH WILHELMSEN HOLDING ASA re #40 Notice of Appearance, Notice of Appearance by Steven M. Edwards (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
December 18, 2013 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERTO A. RIVERA-SOTO on behalf of EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., WALLENIUS LINES AB, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, WILH WILHELMSEN ASA, WILH WILHELMSEN HOLDING ASA (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
December 17, 2013 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANA GJONAJ on behalf of DODA CAMAJ, TONY NIKPRELAJ (GJONAJ, DIANA)
December 17, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL F NOVAK on behalf of DODA CAMAJ, TONY NIKPRELAJ (NOVAK, PAUL)
December 17, 2013 Filing 37 Letter from defendants re consolidation hearing and case management conference. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
December 17, 2013 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL E. MOSKOVITZ on behalf of INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP. (MOSKOVITZ, MICHAEL)
December 17, 2013 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. KANNER on behalf of INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP. (KANNER, STEVEN)
December 16, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN ILENE DUBICK on behalf of Cargo Agents, Inc. (DUBICK, LAUREN)
December 10, 2013 Filing 33 Letter from Peter S. Pearlman to the Honorable Esther Salas, USDJ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A DECLARATION OF JOHN CUNEO, #2 Exhibit B DECLARATION OF DON BARRETT, #3 Exhibit C DECLARATION OF SHAWN RAITER, #4 Exhibit D DECLARATION OF PETER S. PEARLMAN, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
December 10, 2013 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY MAGNUS PURCARO on behalf of Martens Cars of Washington, Inc. (PURCARO, KELLY)
December 10, 2013 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by LEWIS HARRY GOLDFARB on behalf of INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP. (GOLDFARB, LEWIS)
December 9, 2013 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN N. WILLIAMS on behalf of Joan MacQuarrie, Brenda Keegan (WILLIAMS, STEVEN)
December 9, 2013 Filing 29 Letter from James E. Cecchi Regarding Appointment of Interim Class Counsel for End Payor Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
December 9, 2013 Filing 28 Letter from Lauren Fenton-Valdivia on behalf of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Appointing Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(FENTON-VALDIVIA, LAUREN)
December 5, 2013 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by HOLLIS LEE SALZMAN on behalf of F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC., ROBERT O'ROURKE (SALZMAN, HOLLIS)
December 4, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by REGINALD VON TERRELL on behalf of Antonio Maravilla (TERRELL, REGINALD)
November 25, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN E. FENTON-VALDIVIA on behalf of INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP. (FENTON-VALDIVIA, LAUREN)
November 15, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by LEE ALBERT on behalf of INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP. (ALBERT, LEE)
November 12, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH J. DEPALMA on behalf of INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP. (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
November 5, 2013 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER S. PEARLMAN on behalf of Martens Cars of Washington, Inc., Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC, HUDSON NISSAN, John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC, Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC, HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC, Toyota of Bristol, Desert European Motorcars, Ltd. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order from the Judicial Panel on Multi District Litigation consolidating this action into MDL No. 2471 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. (jl, )
September 13, 2013 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion no longer assigned to the case. (mrd, )
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER that subj. to paragraph 4 below, the Stipulating Defts. shall have no obligation to respond to the Cmps. in Related Action until after the JPML has entered an order in connection w/the motion for transfer & consolidation &/or coordination. If any of the Related Actions are consolidated &/or coordinated for pretrial proceedings, the Stipulating Defts. shall, as permitted by Fed.R.Civ.P.12, answer to the CAC that consolidates this action w/in 45 days after CAC is fld.; etc.. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 7/11/13. (DD, )
July 11, 2013 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., WALLENIUS LINES AB, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, WILH WILHELMSEN ASA, WILH WILHELMSEN HOLDING ASA. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
July 9, 2013 Filing 18 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, for extension of time to respond to complaints by "K" LINE AMERICA, INC., COMPANIA SUD AMERICANA DE VAPORES S.A., EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC., KAWASAKI KISEN KAISHA, LTD., MITSUI O.S.K. LINES, LTD.,, NIPPON YUSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA, NISSAN MOTOR CAR CARRIER CO., LTD, NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC., ROBERT O'ROURKE, TOYOFUJI SHIPPING CO. LTD., WALLENIUS LINES AB, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, WILH WILHELMSEN ASA, WILH WILHELMSEN HOLDING ASA. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
July 8, 2013 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please disregard CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE fld. on 7/8/13. Doc. #'s 16 & 17 were fld. in correct case. (DD, )
July 8, 2013 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please disregard Doc. #'s 16 & 17 (NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & CORPORATE DISCLOSURE) fld. on 7/7/13. They were inadvertently fld. in wrong case. (DD, )
July 7, 2013 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC. identifying NYK GROUP AMERICAS, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (DD, )
July 3, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN R. FORNACIARI on behalf of NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC. (DD, )
July 2, 2013 Filing 15 Letter from Roberto A. Rivera-Soto re L.Civ.R. 6.1 extension re #10 Affidavit of Service. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)
July 2, 2013 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #14 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/19/13. (DD, )
July 2, 2013 Filing 14 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to the Complaint Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6.1 (b).. (FISH, ERIC)
July 2, 2013 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC. identifying NYK Group Americas, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (FISH, ERIC)
July 2, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC R. FISH on behalf of NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC. (FISH, ERIC)
July 1, 2013 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on "K" Line America, Inc. on 6/5/13, filed by F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC., ROBERT O'ROURKE. (CECCHI, JAMES)
July 1, 2013 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics Americas LLC on 6/14/13, filed by F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC., ROBERT O'ROURKE. (CECCHI, JAMES)
July 1, 2013 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on NYK Line (North America) Inc. on 6/14/13, filed by F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC., ROBERT O'ROURKE. (CECCHI, JAMES)
July 1, 2013 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service served on "K" Line America, Inc. on 6/5/13, filed by ROBERT O'ROURKE. (CECCHI, JAMES)
June 27, 2013 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by "K" LINE AMERICA, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/10/13. (DD, )
June 26, 2013 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to "K" Line America, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KAISER, STEVEN)
June 26, 2013 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by "K" LINE AMERICA, INC. identifying Kawasaki Kisen Kaisha, Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KAISER, STEVEN)
June 26, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN JOHN KAISER on behalf of "K" LINE AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KAISER, STEVEN)
June 6, 2013 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to KAWASAKI KISEN KAISHA, LTD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Party was omitted when case was opened. Issued By *John Reilly* (jr)
June 6, 2013 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC.. (CECCHI, JAMES)
May 24, 2013 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to "K" LINE AMERICA, INC., COMPANIA SUD AMERICANA DE VAPORES S.A., EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., MITSUI O.S.K. LINES, LTD.,, NIPPON YUSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA, NISSAN MOTOR CAR CARRIER CO., LTD, NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC., TOYOFUJI SHIPPING CO. LTD., WALLENIUS LINES AB, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, WILH WILHELMSEN ASA, WILH WILHELMSEN HOLDING ASA Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Ellen Mc Murray* (emc)
May 24, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against "K" LINE AMERICA, INC., COMPANIA SUD AMERICANA DE VAPORES S.A., EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC., MITSUI O.S.K. LINES, LTD.,, NIPPON YUSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA, NISSAN MOTOR CAR CARRIER CO., LTD, NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC., TOYOFUJI SHIPPING CO. LTD., WALLENIUS LINES AB, WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC., WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS, WILH WILHELMSEN ASA, WILH WILHELMSEN HOLDING ASA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-5029175) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ROBERT O'ROURKE, F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(emc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC. et al v. NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OHIO, INC.
Represented By: ERIC R. BRESLIN
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hudson Gastonia Acquisition, LLC
Represented By: ALEC BLAINE FINLEY, JR.
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: KATHERINE WARREN VAN DYCK
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Represented By: BRENDAN FREY
Represented By: JONATHAN WATSON CUNEO
Represented By: BENJAMIN DAVID ELGA
Represented By: DANIEL COHEN
Represented By: GERARD V. MANTESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martens Cars of Washington, Inc.
Represented By: ALEC BLAINE FINLEY, JR.
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: KATHERINE WARREN VAN DYCK
Represented By: KELLY MAGNUS PURCARO
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Represented By: BRENDAN FREY
Represented By: JONATHAN WATSON CUNEO
Represented By: BENJAMIN DAVID ELGA
Represented By: DANIEL COHEN
Represented By: GERARD V. MANTESE
Represented By: BRIAN K. HERRINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desert European Motorcars, Ltd.
Represented By: ALEC BLAINE FINLEY, JR.
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: KATHERINE WARREN VAN DYCK
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Represented By: BRENDAN FREY
Represented By: JONATHAN WATSON CUNEO
Represented By: BENJAMIN DAVID ELGA
Represented By: DANIEL COHEN
Represented By: GERARD V. MANTESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYLLIS ROSEN
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE B. CROSBY
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOM WARE
Represented By: SEAN TAMIO TAMURA-SATO
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: DEREK G. HOWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERYL HALEY
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATRINA BONAR
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. RUGGIERO & SONS, INC.
Represented By: MEEGAN F. HOLLYWOOD
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: HOLLIS LEE SALZMAN
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: DANIEL H. CHAREST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC.
Represented By: ERIC R. BRESLIN
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARTLEY BUICK/GMC TRUCK, INC. d/b/a HARTLEY HONDA
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERESTED PARTY
Represented By: FRANCIS ONOFREI SCARPULLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW RIGHETTI
Represented By: FRANCIS ONOFREI SCARPULLA
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER THOMAS MICHELETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF KANSAS, INC.
Represented By: ERIC R. BRESLIN
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cargo Agents, Inc.
Represented By: ROBERT N. KAPLAN
Represented By: LAUREN ILENE DUBICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christie Laster
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN BRUZONSKY
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Brushey
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Rothsetin
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT O'ROURKE
Represented By: MEEGAN F. HOLLYWOOD
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: HOLLIS LEE SALZMAN
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: DANIEL H. CHAREST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Deneau
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Represented By: DANIEL A. SASSE
Represented By: CHAHIRA SOLH
Represented By: ELIZABETH ANNE FIGUEIRA
Represented By: RYAN CHRISTOPHER WONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUSTAVO ADOLFO PEREZ
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Leyva
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN C. DAVIS
Represented By: GUIDO SAVERI
Represented By: R. Alexander Saveri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMPIRE NISSAN OF SANTA ROSA, LLC
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL MORRIS
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETHANNE KNUDSON
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILDA J. NIN-PACHECO
Represented By: SEAN TAMIO TAMURA-SATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY GANNON
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: ROBERT J. BONSIGNORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREG DANA
Represented By: SEAN TAMIO TAMURA-SATO
Represented By: DEREK G. HOWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENDRELL JACKSON
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: PETER GEORGE SAFIRSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER DILLON
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: ALYSON LOUISE OLIVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE GROJEAN
Represented By: SEAN TAMIO TAMURA-SATO
Represented By: DEREK G. HOWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEX WHITE
Represented By: Linda G Workman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH POWERS KELLER
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTLAND CAR YARD ENTERPRISES d/b/a SAN RAFAEL MITSUBISHI
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL JACKSON
Represented By: FRANCIS ONOFREI SCARPULLA
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER LOVELL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER THOMAS MICHELETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTEBAN ADAME
Represented By: BONNY ELAINE SWEENEY
Represented By: STUART A. DAVIDSON
Represented By: BRIAN RUSSELL STRANGE
Represented By: PAUL J. GELLER
Represented By: KEITH L. BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY G. BISSEN
Represented By: SEAN TAMIO TAMURA-SATO
Represented By: DEREK G. HOWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFF RUBINSTEIN
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF FLORIDA, INC.
Represented By: ERIC R. BRESLIN
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF OKLAHOMA, INC.
Represented By: ERIC R. BRESLIN
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSS STASIK
Represented By: Randall S. Newman
Represented By: BETSY CAROL MANIFOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John O'Neil Johnson Toyota, LLC
Represented By: ALEC BLAINE FINLEY, JR.
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: KATHERINE WARREN VAN DYCK
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Represented By: BRENDAN FREY
Represented By: JONATHAN WATSON CUNEO
Represented By: BENJAMIN DAVID ELGA
Represented By: DANIEL COHEN
Represented By: GERARD V. MANTESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW HEILICHER
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON HAMPSON
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA E. GOESSLING
Represented By: KOREY A. NELSON
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: ISAAC L DIEL
Represented By: Charles D. Gabriel
Represented By: DANIEL H. CHAREST
Represented By: Arthur M. Murray
Represented By: Joseph F. Devereux
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: Douglas D. Chunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill M. Alban
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF GEORGIA, INC.
Represented By: ERIC R. BRESLIN
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL BOYKIN
Represented By: REGINALD VON TERRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAIR LARA
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: TERRY GROSS
Represented By: Adam C. Belsky
Represented By: Sarah Crowley
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: Monique Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY ARNOLD
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: ANNE T. REGAN
Represented By: DAVID M. CIALKOWSKI
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF UTAH, INC.,
Represented By: ERIC R. BRESLIN
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHTON LEVIS
Represented By: Adam John Zapala
Represented By: ELIZABETH TRAN
Represented By: AUSTIN B COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE DAVID
Represented By: SEAN TAMIO TAMURA-SATO
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Represented By: DEREK G. HOWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDY SMITH
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Maravilla
Represented By: REGINALD VON TERRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, INC.
Represented By: ERIC R. BRESLIN
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN SPICER
Represented By: STEVEN N. WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan MacQuarrie
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: ELIZABETH TRAN
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: ALEXANDER E BARNETT
Represented By: ELIZABETH C. PRITZKER
Represented By: STEVEN N. WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HC ACQUISITIONS, LLC
Represented By: ALEC BLAINE FINLEY, JR.
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: KATHERINE WARREN VAN DYCK
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Represented By: BRENDAN FREY
Represented By: JONATHAN WATSON CUNEO
Represented By: BENJAMIN DAVID ELGA
Represented By: DANIEL COHEN
Represented By: GERARD V. MANTESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DODA CAMAJ
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: DIANA GJONAJ
Represented By: PAUL F NOVAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RITA M. CLOWARD
Represented By: SEAN TAMIO TAMURA-SATO
Represented By: DEREK G. HOWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC L. METH
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANACO INTERNATIONAL FORWARDERS, INC.
Represented By: MANUEL JUAN DOMINGUEZ
Represented By: CHARLES ANDREW DIRKSEN
Represented By: DOUGLAS A. ABRAHAMS
Represented By: John Douglas Richards
Represented By: KIT A. PIERSON
Represented By: Joseph C. Kohn
Represented By: GREGORY PAUL HANSEL
Represented By: MICHAEL BENJAMIN EISENKRAFT
Represented By: MATTHEW W. RUAN
Represented By: DAVID A. YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Gurney
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: ROBERT J. BONSIGNORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF IDAHO, INC.
Represented By: ERIC R. BRESLIN
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT CORP.
Represented By: RACHEL ELLEN KOPP
Represented By: JOSEPH J. DEPALMA
Represented By: Albert J. Pucciarelli
Represented By: ROBERT P. DONOVAN
Represented By: LAUREN E. FENTON-VALDIVIA
Represented By: LEE ALBERT
Represented By: LEWIS HARRY GOLDFARB
Represented By: JAY S. COHEN
Represented By: MICHAEL E. PATUNAS
Represented By: STEVEN A. KANNER
Represented By: MICHAEL E. MOSKOVITZ
Represented By: EUGENE A. SPECTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAN FRONT
Represented By: SEAN TAMIO TAMURA-SATO
Represented By: DEREK G. HOWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hudson Charleston Acquisition, LLC
Represented By: ALEC BLAINE FINLEY, JR.
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: KATHERINE WARREN VAN DYCK
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Represented By: BRENDAN FREY
Represented By: JONATHAN WATSON CUNEO
Represented By: BENJAMIN DAVID ELGA
Represented By: DANIEL COHEN
Represented By: GERARD V. MANTESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUDSON NISSAN
Represented By: ALEC BLAINE FINLEY, JR.
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: KATHERINE WARREN VAN DYCK
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Represented By: BRENDAN FREY
Represented By: JONATHAN WATSON CUNEO
Represented By: BENJAMIN DAVID ELGA
Represented By: DANIEL COHEN
Represented By: GERARD V. MANTESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE HERTZ
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: Adam John Zapala
Represented By: ELIZABETH TRAN
Represented By: AUSTIN B COHEN
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHERINE TAYLOR
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH ALLIS
Represented By: FRANCIS ONOFREI SCARPULLA
Represented By: DANIEL R. SHULMAN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER THOMAS MICHELETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ashley Hill
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: ROBERT J. BONSIGNORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RITA DIEL-BROWN
Represented By: KOREY A. NELSON
Represented By: ISAAC L DIEL
Represented By: Charles D. Gabriel
Represented By: DANIEL H. CHAREST
Represented By: Arthur M. Murray
Represented By: Joseph F. Devereux
Represented By: Douglas D. Chunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF COLORADO, INC.
Represented By: ERIC R. BRESLIN
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS LETOURNEAU
Represented By: Scott M Grzenczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Automobile Dealership Plaintiffs
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: GERARD V. MANTESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Baker
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: ROBERT J. BONSIGNORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG BUSKE
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: FRANCIS ONOFREI SCARPULLA
Represented By: DANIEL R. SHULMAN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER THOMAS MICHELETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORI CURTIS
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Keegan
Represented By: ELIZABETH TRAN
Represented By: ALEXANDER E BARNETT
Represented By: ELIZABETH C. PRITZKER
Represented By: STEVEN N. WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toyota of Bristol
Represented By: ALEC BLAINE FINLEY, JR.
Represented By: KATHERINE WARREN VAN DYCK
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Represented By: BRENDAN FREY
Represented By: JONATHAN WATSON CUNEO
Represented By: BENJAMIN DAVID ELGA
Represented By: DANIEL COHEN
Represented By: GERARD V. MANTESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM ELWOOD
Represented By: FRANCIS ONOFREI SCARPULLA
Represented By: DANIEL R. SHULMAN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER THOMAS MICHELETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID SCHROEDER
Represented By: FRANCIS M. GREGOREK
Represented By: BETSY CAROL MANIFOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Kooker
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: ROBERT J. BONSIGNORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDY A. REIBER
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: FRANCIS ONOFREI SCARPULLA
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: DANIEL R. SHULMAN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER THOMAS MICHELETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARREL SENIOR
Represented By: FRANCIS ONOFREI SCARPULLA
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER THOMAS MICHELETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Scott
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: ROBERT J. BONSIGNORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demian Vargas
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HODGES IMPORTED CARS, INC d/b/a HODGES SUBARU
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH A. NELSON
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: ISAAC L DIEL
Represented By: Charles D. Gabriel
Represented By: DANIEL H. CHAREST
Represented By: Arthur M. Murray
Represented By: STEPHEN B. MURRAY, JR
Represented By: Terry Oxford
Represented By: Robert L. Devereux
Represented By: Douglas D. Chunn
Represented By: Samuel P. Pierce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY DAVID
Represented By: SEAN TAMIO TAMURA-SATO
Represented By: DEREK G. HOWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant M. Alban
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMILY FERRIS
Represented By: SEAN TAMIO TAMURA-SATO
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIFFANY BUI
Represented By: Scott M Grzenczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER FROZENA
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF TEXAS, LP.
Represented By: ERIC R. BRESLIN
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Denise Hart
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAULA OCHSNER
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TUAN NGUYEN
Represented By: Alan R. Plutzik
Represented By: Daniel Edward Birkhaeuser
Represented By: Timothy D. Battin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EUGENE THOMAS GOESSLING
Represented By: KOREY A. NELSON
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: ISAAC L DIEL
Represented By: Charles D. Gabriel
Represented By: DANIEL H. CHAREST
Represented By: Arthur M. Murray
Represented By: Joseph F. Devereux
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: Douglas D. Chunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF ARIZONA, INC.
Represented By: ERIC R. BRESLIN
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONY NIKPRELAJ
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: DIANA GJONAJ
Represented By: PAUL F NOVAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PANAMA CITY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC d/b/a JOHN LEE NISSAN
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kori Lehrkamp
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: ROBERT J. BONSIGNORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmett Brophy
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAZARO VERSALLES
Represented By: DANIEL C. HEDLUND
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Represented By: Erin Cathleen Burns
Represented By: DIANNE M. NAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA SO
Represented By: NOAH M. SCHUBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Tomasko
Represented By: WARREN T BURNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: ROBERT J. BONSIGNORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOYOFUJI SHIPPING CO. LTD.
Represented By: JOHN CLAYTON EVERETT, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPANIA SUD AMERICANA DE VAPORES S.A.
Represented By: TODD F. BRAUNSTEIN
Represented By: STEVEN F. CHERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYK LINE (NORTH AMERICA) INC.
Represented By: ERIC R. FISH
Represented By: ERIK JOESPH RAVEN-HANSEN
Represented By: ROBERT MATTHEW DISCH
Represented By: JOHN R. FORNACIARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoegh Autoliners AS (Norway)
Represented By: MELISSA HELEN MAXMAN
Represented By: KEVIN MICHAEL KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIPPON YUSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA
Represented By: ERIK JOESPH RAVEN-HANSEN
Represented By: ROBERT MATTHEW DISCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Logistics Service (U.S.A.), Inc.
Represented By: JAMES L. COOPER
Represented By: ADAM MICHAEL PERGAMENT
Represented By: ROBERTO A. RIVERA-SOTO
Represented By: ANNE P. DAVIS
Represented By: DANIELLE M. GARTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUTOTRANS AS (France)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoegh Autoliners, Inc. (US)
Represented By: MELISSA HELEN MAXMAN
Represented By: KEVIN MICHAEL KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAWASAKI KISEN KAISHA, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "K" LINE AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: STEVEN JOHN KAISER
Represented By: MARK W. NELSON
Represented By: JEREMY JAMES CALSYN
Represented By: MICHAEL R. LAZERWITZ
Represented By: FARRELL MALONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Transport Co. Ltd.
Represented By: JAMES L. COOPER
Represented By: ADAM MICHAEL PERGAMENT
Represented By: ROBERTO A. RIVERA-SOTO
Represented By: DANIELLE M. GARTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOL (AMERICA), INC.
Represented By: JAMES L. COOPER
Represented By: ADAM MICHAEL PERGAMENT
Represented By: DANIELLE M. GARTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSAV AGENCY, LLC
Represented By: TODD F. BRAUNSTEIN
Represented By: STEVEN F. CHERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Shipping and Logistics Inc.
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: MAXIM M.L. NOWAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Roll-On Roll-Off Carrier, LLC
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: MAXIM M.L. NOWAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WWL Vehicle Services Americas Inc.
Represented By: ROBERTO A. RIVERA-SOTO
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: MAXIM M.L. NOWAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Logistics Network, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALLENIUS LINES AB
Represented By: JASON ALLEN LECKERMAN
Represented By: ROBERTO A. RIVERA-SOTO
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: MAXIM M.L. NOWAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EUKOR VEHICLE CARRIERS INC.
Represented By: JASON ALLEN LECKERMAN
Represented By: ROBERTO A. RIVERA-SOTO
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: MAXIM M.L. NOWAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoegh Autoliners Holdings AS (Norway)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOL Logistics (USA), Inc.
Represented By: JAMES L. COOPER
Represented By: ADAM MICHAEL PERGAMENT
Represented By: DANIELLE M. GARTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS
Represented By: JASON ALLEN LECKERMAN
Represented By: ROBERTO A. RIVERA-SOTO
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: MAXIM M.L. NOWAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui O.S.K. Bulk Shipping (U.S.A.), Inc.
Represented By: JAMES L. COOPER
Represented By: ADAM MICHAEL PERGAMENT
Represented By: ANNE P. DAVIS
Represented By: DANIELLE M. GARTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITSUI O.S.K. LINES, LTD.,
Represented By: JAMES L. COOPER
Represented By: ADAM MICHAEL PERGAMENT
Represented By: ANNE P. DAVIS
Represented By: DANIELLE M. GARTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Auto Logistics, LP
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: MAXIM M.L. NOWAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILH WILHELMSEN ASA
Represented By: JASON ALLEN LECKERMAN
Represented By: ROBERTO A. RIVERA-SOTO
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: MAXIM M.L. NOWAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC
Represented By: JASON ALLEN LECKERMAN
Represented By: ROBERTO A. RIVERA-SOTO
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: MAXIM M.L. NOWAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americana De Vapores S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Navigation LLC (US)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILH WILHELMSEN HOLDING ASA
Represented By: JASON ALLEN LECKERMAN
Represented By: ROBERTO A. RIVERA-SOTO
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: MAXIM M.L. NOWAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NISSAN MOTOR CAR CARRIER CO., LTD
Represented By: JAMES L. COOPER
Represented By: ADAM MICHAEL PERGAMENT
Represented By: ANNE P. DAVIS
Represented By: DANIELLE M. GARTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: VEHICLE CARRIER SERVICES ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?