WILSHIRE BANK v. CHON et al
Plaintiff: WILSHIRE BANK
Defendant: MIYE CHON, SUK JOON RYU, HONG SIK HUR, TAE JONG KIM, BERGENFIELD BAGEL & CAFE, MAYWOOD BAGEL INC., UB'S PIZZA & BAGEL INC., UB'S BAGEL & CAFE INC. and UBK BAGELS CORP.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01770
Filed: March 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Bergen
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. Dickson
Presiding Judge: Jose L. Linares
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER and JUDGMENT that the 388 Report and Recommendations granting 308 as to Defendant MIYE CHON in the amount of $1,351,090.00 and for Default Judgment against Defendants BERGENFIELD BAGEL & CAFE INC., MAYWOOD BAGEL INC., UB'S PIZZA A ND BAGEL INC., UB'S BAGEL & CAFE INC., and UBK BAGELS CORP., jointly and severally in the amount of $538,032.90, but denying the Motion as to Defendant TAE JONG KIM is ADOPTED and AFFIRMED. Etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 12/9/2020. (bt, )
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 396 OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 7/27/2020. (bt, )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER granting 385 Motion to Redact 375 Transcript,,,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 7/24/2020. (bt, )
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER granting 373 Motion to Seal sealing doc. 353-2, 353-4 through 353-18, and unsealing doc. 353-1 and 353-3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/29/2020. (jr)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER that REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 386 is ADOPTED AND AFFIRMED. The motion re 307 for default judgement is GRANTED etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 3/12/2020. (bt, )
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 282 OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 03/11/2019. (sms)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 OPINION. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 1/4/17. (sr, )
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying 47 Motion for Default Judgment; etc. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 8/25/14. (sr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILSHIRE BANK v. CHON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIYE CHON
Represented By: MATTHEW JEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUK JOON RYU
Represented By: JUNGSUP KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONG SIK HUR
Represented By: JUSTIN P. KOLBENSCHLAG
Represented By: ERIC TUNIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAE JONG KIM
Represented By: MATTHEW JEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERGENFIELD BAGEL & CAFE
Represented By: MATTHEW JEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYWOOD BAGEL INC.
Represented By: MATTHEW JEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UB'S PIZZA & BAGEL INC.
Represented By: MATTHEW JEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UB'S BAGEL & CAFE INC.
Represented By: MATTHEW JEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBK BAGELS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILSHIRE BANK
Represented By: JANE CHUANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?