UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BALICE et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: MICHAEL BALICE, MARION BALICE, ROSEWATER TRUST, INVESTORS BANK, AMBOY BANK, MEDICAL CARE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, RICHARD TIEDEMANN and BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE
Case Number: 2:2014cv03937
Filed: June 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Madeline C. Arleo
Presiding Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 270 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 3/5/2019. (ld, )
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 5/23/2018. (JB, )
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Defendant's 219 Motion to Amend/Correct; Denying 223 Motion to Take Judicial Notice ; Denying 224 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; Denying 225 Motion to Strike, etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 10/16/2017. (ek)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 216 OPINION AND ORDER denying 212 Motion for Reconsideration and 214 Objection. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 8/30/2017. (ld, )
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 08/09/2017. (ek)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Defendant's 183 Motion to Dismiss/Summary Judgment; Denying 192 Motion to Rescind Prior Decision, etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 07/05/2017. (ek)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 167 OPINION AND ORDER administratively terminating 119 Motion for Summary Judgment subject to renewal at the proper time ; denying Motions For Summary Judgment 133 , 135 , and 140; and it is further OREDERED that no further motions for summary judgm ent shall be brought without prior leave of the Magistrate Judge assigned to the case, on a schedule to be set by the Magistrate Judge. Such leave may be sought informally by letter or telephone conference. Further motions for summary judgment brought without leave will be denied summarily, for that reason alone. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 10/11/2016. (seb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BALICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: GEOFFREY JOHN KLIMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL BALICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARION BALICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSEWATER TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INVESTORS BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMBOY BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL CARE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD TIEDEMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?