ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS, INC., NEW JERSEY CHAPTER et al v. CITY OF JERSEY CITY, NEW JERSEY
Plaintiff: ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS, INC., NEW JERSEY CHAPTER, GMP CONTRACTING LLC, ALPINE PAINTING & SANDBLASTING CONTRACTORS, ALPER ENTERPRISES, INC. and RON VASILIK
Defendant: CITY OF JERSEY CITY, NEW JERSEY
Intervenor: Hudson County Building and Construction Trades Council
Case Number: 2:2014cv05445
Filed: August 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Hudson
Presiding Judge: Steven C. Mannion
Presiding Judge: Susan D. Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:151 Labor: Review of Agency Action
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER ADOPTING 89 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 73 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs in this Action filed by ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS, INC., NEW JERSEY CHAPTER, RON VASILIK, ALPINE PAINTING & SANDBLASTING CONTRACTORS, GMP CONTRACTING LL C, ALPER ENTERPRISES, INC., etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 12/4/2017. (JB, )
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 11/29/2017. (JB, )
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 6/15/2017. (JB, )
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 8/3/2015. (anr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS, INC., NEW JERSEY CHAPTER et al v. CITY OF JERSEY CITY, NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS, INC., NEW JERSEY CHAPTER
Represented By: RUSSELL J. MCEWAN
Represented By: IVAN R. NOVICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GMP CONTRACTING LLC
Represented By: RUSSELL J. MCEWAN
Represented By: IVAN R. NOVICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALPINE PAINTING & SANDBLASTING CONTRACTORS
Represented By: RUSSELL J. MCEWAN
Represented By: IVAN R. NOVICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALPER ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: RUSSELL J. MCEWAN
Represented By: IVAN R. NOVICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RON VASILIK
Represented By: RUSSELL J. MCEWAN
Represented By: IVAN R. NOVICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF JERSEY CITY, NEW JERSEY
Represented By: ZAHIRE DESIREE ESTRELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Hudson County Building and Construction Trades Council
Represented By: SETH PTASIEWICZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?