JERSEY STRONG PEDIATRICS, LLC v. WANAQUE CONVALESCENT CENTER et al
Case Number: 2:2014cv06651
Filed: October 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
Presiding Judge: Steven C. Mannion
Presiding Judge: Susan D. Wigenton
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 OPINION. etc. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 6/28/2019. (dam, )
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 9/18/17. (sr, )
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 6/14/17. (sr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JERSEY STRONG PEDIATRICS, LLC v. WANAQUE CONVALESCENT CENTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?