KAPLAN v. GARAFALO, et al
Plaintiff: |
RICHARD P. KAPLAN |
Defendant: |
JOHN GARAFALO, CASPER FRIENDLY, EDWARD QUINN, JAMES CAHILL, CHRISTOPHER CHRISTIE, MARGHERITAL A. PITALE and FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv01150 |
Filed: |
February 10, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of New Jersey |
Office: |
Newark Office |
County: |
Essex |
Presiding Judge: |
Claire C. Cecchi |
Presiding Judge: |
James B. Clark |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 2, 2017 |
Filing
14
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER reopening this case for the purpose of deciding the pending matters. Plaintiff's 13 Motion to Reopen, and request to proceed in forma pauperis is denied, and if Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case he shall notify the Court in writing w/in 30 days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 2/2/17. (sr, )(N/M)
|
May 31, 2016 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REOPENING CASE; denying pltf's request to proceed in forma pauperis; administratively terminating the case, without filing the complt.; if Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case, he shall so notify the Court, in writing within ninety (90) days of the date of entry of this Order, Plaintiffs writing shall include the $400 fee, etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 5/31/2016. (nr, )
|
September 30, 2015 |
Filing
9
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 4 request to proceed in forma pauperis, and that all pending motions filed by the Plaintiff, ECF Nos, 5,6 & 7 are administratively terminated. The Clerk is directed to administratively terminate this case w/out filin g the complaint or assessing the filing fee. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff the form entitled Affidavit of Poverty and Account Certification (Civil Rights)(DNJ ProSe 007 A(Rev. 5/13)) to be used by Plaintiff in any future application to proceed i nforma pauperis; and if Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case, he shall so notify the Court, in writing addressed to the Clerk of the Court, Martin Luther King Building & U.S. Courthouse, 50 Walnut Street, Newark, NJ 071018, within 30 days of the date of entry of this Order; etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 9/30/15. (sr, )
|
July 30, 2015 |
Filing
3
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiffs request to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and the Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE this case, without filing the complaint or assessing a filing fee. The Clerk shall send Plai ntiff the form entitled Affidavit of Poverty and Account Certification (Civil Rights)(DNJ ProSe 007 A(Rev. 5/13)) to be used by Plaintiff in any future application to proceed informa pauperis, and if Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case, he shall s o notify the Court, in writing addressed to the Clerk of the Court, Martin Luther King Building & U.S. Courthouse, 50 Walnut Street, Newark, NJ 071018, within 30 days of the date of entry of this Order; etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 7/30/15. (sr, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?