RAMADA WORLDWIDE INC. v. VMN FOOTHILLS TIC, LLC et al
Plaintiff: RAMADA WORLDWIDE INC.
Defendant: VMN FOOTHILLS TIC, LLC, DK TIC, LLC, MAYANK PATEL, VIRENDER SANWAL, NARINDER SANWAL, DILIP PATEL and KOKILA PATEL
Case Number: 2:2015cv04078
Filed: June 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Morris
Presiding Judge: Katharine S. Hayden
Presiding Judge: Cathy L. Waldor
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPINION. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 9/29/17. (DD, )
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 31 Report and Recommendations; Granting 27 Motion to Strike filed by RAMADA WORLDWIDE INC.; The defendants answer (D.E. 13) is stricken; The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter default against defendants VMN Foothills, TIC, LLC, DK TIC, LLC, Mayank Patel, Narinder Sanwal, Dilip Patel and Kokila Patel. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 03/28/2017. (ek)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPINION AND ORDER denying 15 Motion for Default Judgment as to Virender Sanwal, w/out prejudice. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 3/23/2016. (nr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAMADA WORLDWIDE INC. v. VMN FOOTHILLS TIC, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMADA WORLDWIDE INC.
Represented By: BRYAN PAUL COUCH
Represented By: JUSTIN MICHAEL VOGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VMN FOOTHILLS TIC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DK TIC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYANK PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIRENDER SANWAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NARINDER SANWAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DILIP PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOKILA PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?