Mondis Technology Ltd v. LG Electronics Inc et al
Plaintiff: Mondis Technology Ltd
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc and LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.
Counter_claimant: LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. and LG Electronics Inc
Counter_defendant: Mondis Technology Ltd
Case Number: 2:2015cv04431
Filed: June 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Madeline C. Arleo
Presiding Judge: Leda D. Wettre
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 689 OPINION & ORDER that Plaintiffs motion for reconsideration 678 is DENIED; Defendants motion for reconsideration 676 is GRANTED; this Courts Opinion and Order, dated October 2, 2020, 672 is MODIFIED to add the following: It is further ORDERED th at, as to the Bratic Supplement, the Court strikes in its entirety paragraph 23; and in paragraph 25, the Court strikes the sentence which states: That royalty rate was calculated on the basis of 0.25% x the ASP of Hon Hais TVs, which the parties agreed was $280. Bratic Report 110. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 11/6/2020. (sm)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 644 OPINION & ORDER that LGs motion to strike 634 is GRANTED in partand decision is RESERVED in part; as to Mr. Lamms supplementary report, the motion to strike is GRANTED, and the Court STRIKES that report from the record; as to Mr. Bratics supplement ary report, decision on the motion tostrike is RESERVED pending supplementary briefing; within two weeks of the date of entry of this Order, Mondis shall submit the supplementary briefing described above; within two weeks of the filing of Plaintiffs supplementary briefing, LG shall submit a responsive brief. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 7/15/2020. (sm)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 629 OPINION & ORDER denying 617 LG's Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 6/11/2020. (sm)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 607 OPINION & ORDER that LGs motion for judgment as a matter of law under Rule 50(b), a new trial under Rule 59, and/or remittitur regarding damages and willfulness (Docket Entry No. 489) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; that LGs motion for judgment as a matter of law and/or remittitur is DENIED; and that LGs motion for a new trial is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 4/22/2020. (sm)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER, denying 379 LG's Motion to Dismiss the FAC for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; Mondis shall file a further amended complaint to restore the original allegation as to the date of notice; etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 02/26/2019. (sms)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 247 OPINION AND ORDER denying 232 Appeal Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, and that the Magistrate Judge's opinion and order, filed September 19, 2017(Docket Entry No. 226) is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 11/15/17. (sr, )
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 OPINION AND ORDER denying 215 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 10/12/17. (sr, )
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 231 OPINION AND ORDER RE: Application for Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 9/28/17. (sr, )
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 226 OPINION AND ORDER that the motion for a protective order and to quash the subpoena served upon Mr. Plies by LG is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/19/17. (sr, )
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 OPINION fld. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 11/12/15. (sr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mondis Technology Ltd v. LG Electronics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mondis Technology Ltd
Represented By: MARTIN JAY BLACK
Represented By: TERI-LYNN ALLONARDO EVANS
Represented By: VINCENT AUGUST GALLO
Represented By: BRIAN M. GOLDBERG
Represented By: ROBERT LOUIS MASTERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc
Represented By: JENNIFER C. CRITCHLEY
Represented By: LISA M. FERRI
Represented By: READE WILLIAM SELIGMANN
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.
Represented By: JENNIFER C. CRITCHLEY
Represented By: LISA M. FERRI
Represented By: READE WILLIAM SELIGMANN
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: LG Electronics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Mondis Technology Ltd
Represented By: MARTIN JAY BLACK
Represented By: TERI-LYNN ALLONARDO EVANS
Represented By: VINCENT AUGUST GALLO
Represented By: BRIAN M. GOLDBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?