EZAKI GLICO KABUSHIKI KAISHA v. LOTTE INTERNATIONAL AMERICA CORP.
Plaintiff: EZAKI GLICO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
Defendant: LOTTE INTERNATIONAL AMERICA CORP.
Case Number: 2:2015cv05477
Filed: July 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Bergen
Presiding Judge: Madeline C. Arleo
Presiding Judge: Leda D. Wettre
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 357 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, Defendants are directed to pay plaintiff's $33,456.84 in attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses as a sanction for the improper supplemental expert report of Ambereen Salters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/10/2019. (ams, )
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 296 OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/13/2019. (ld, ) (Main Document 296 replaced on 2/13/2019) (ld).
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's 84 Motion to Amend/Correct the Complaint, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/03/2017. (ek)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 OPINION. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 9/25/17. (DD, )
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 OPINION AND ORDER denying 43 Motion to Change Venue; the Court shall hold an initial scheduling conference on February 22, 2017 at 11:30 a.m., in Courtroom 4A of the Martin Luther King Building and U.S. Courthouse. The parties are directed to electronically file a Joint Discovery Plan on or before February 16, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/30/2017. (seb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EZAKI GLICO KABUSHIKI KAISHA v. LOTTE INTERNATIONAL AMERICA CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EZAKI GLICO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
Represented By: CHARLES PATRICK KENNEDY
Represented By: NATALIE SUE RICHER
Represented By: ROY HENRY WEPNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOTTE INTERNATIONAL AMERICA CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?