BARRETT v. ROBERT HALF CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: THOMAS BARRETT
Defendant: ROBERT HALF CORPORATION, ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC., JANE DOE I-V, JOHN DOE I-V and XYZ CORPORATION I-V
Case Number: 2:2015cv06245
Filed: August 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Essex
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that this matter has been resolved following mediation in the Third Circuit following appeal and was dismissed by Order of the Third Circuit on 7/26/2018; this matter is dismissed and closed. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/30/2018. (sm)
October 29, 2018 Filing 20 Letter from Gregory B. Noble. (NOBLE, GREGORY)
July 26, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFIED ORDER of USCA in lieu of formal MANDATE dismissing the appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) as to #16 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by THOMAS BARRETT (Finance notified) (ca3cjg)
June 30, 2017 Filing 18 USCA Case Number 17-2415 for #17 Notice of Appeal (USCA for the Third Circuit), filed by THOMAS BARRETT. USCA Case Manager Tonya (TYW) (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3cjg Modified on 2/27/2018 (dam).
March 17, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #15 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by THOMAS BARRETT. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. **Note** This entry is made for computer purposes to correct docket entry #16, which was inadvertently filed to the Federal Circuit. (mfr) Modified on 6/29/2017 (mfr). Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-7714333
March 17, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Federal Circuit by THOMAS BARRETT. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-7714333. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (NOBLE, GREGORY)
March 17, 2017 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Appeal document number #16 filed by GREGORY NOBLE on 03/17/2017 was submitted incorrectly as a Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit Washington DC). For future filings of Notice of Appeal please use Notice of Appeal (USCA Philadelphia) found under Other Filings-Appeal Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (ek)
February 23, 2017 ***Civil Case Terminated. (JB, )
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by ROBERT HALF CORPORATION, ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC. It is further Ordered that Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice, etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 2/21/2017. (JB, )
August 8, 2016 Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ROBERT HALF CORPORATION, ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC. re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BARTON, THOMAS)
August 1, 2016 Filing 13 BRIEF in Opposition filed by THOMAS BARRETT re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Brief, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit A-D, #5 Exhibit E-I)(NOBLE, GREGORY)
July 13, 2016 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by ROBERT HALF CORPORATION, ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(BARTON, THOMAS)
July 13, 2016 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Motion set for 8/15/2016 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE. So Ordered by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 06/20/2016. (JB, )
June 20, 2016 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #10 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC., ROBERT HALF CORPORATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 07/13/2016. (JB, )
June 16, 2016 Filing 10 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants Robert Half Corporation and Robert Half International Inc... (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BURT, JESSICA)
June 15, 2016 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by THOMAS BARRETT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(NOBLE, GREGORY)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #4 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. It is further Ordered that Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice and to the extend Plaintiff can cure the pleading deficiency by way of amendment, he shall file an Amended Complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED***. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 5/25/2016. (JB, )
September 28, 2015 Filing 7 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ROBERT HALF CORPORATION, ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC. re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BARTON, THOMAS)
September 21, 2015 Filing 6 BRIEF in Opposition filed by THOMAS BARRETT re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of R. Daniel Bause, Esq., #2 Exhibit)(NOBLE, GREGORY)
August 26, 2015 Filing 5 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by THOMAS BARRETT re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) (NOBLE, GREGORY)
August 25, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6). Motion set for 9/21/2015 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
August 24, 2015 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) by ROBERT HALF CORPORATION, ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(BARTON, THOMAS) .
August 18, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA ANN BURT on behalf of ROBERT HALF CORPORATION, ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC. (BURT, JESSICA)
August 18, 2015 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROBERT HALF CORPORATION, ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC.. (BARTON, THOMAS)
August 18, 2015 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The NOTICE OF REMOVAL submitted by THOMAS J. BARTON, ESQ on 8/17/2015 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (dam)
August 18, 2015 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please disregard previous QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE entered on 8/18/2015 for it was done in error. (dam)
August 17, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC., ROBERT HALF CORPORATION from SUPERIOR COURT OF ESSEX COUNTY, case number ESX-L-4048-15. ( Filing and Admin fee $400 receipt number 0312-6586583), filed by ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC., ROBERT HALF CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Certificate of Service)(dam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARRETT v. ROBERT HALF CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS BARRETT
Represented By: GREGORY B. NOBLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT HALF CORPORATION
Represented By: THOMAS J. BARTON
Represented By: JESSICA ANN BURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC.
Represented By: JESSICA ANN BURT
Represented By: THOMAS J. BARTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORPORATION I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?