D'ANTONIO v. BOROUGH OF ALLENDALE et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL A. D'ANTONIO
Defendant: BOROUGH OF ALLENDALE, STILES THOMAS, JOHN ALBOHM, DAVID BOLE, DAVID PFUND, MARY MCDONNELL, MARK S. CARTER, ESQ., LOUIS CAPAZZI, PASSAIC RIVER COALITION, BERGEN COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPT., THOMAS P. MONAHAN, ESQ. and RICHARD EPSTEIN, ESQ.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00816
Filed: February 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Bergen
Presiding Judge: Claire C. Cecchi
Presiding Judge: James B. Clark
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 334 OPINION. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 3/31/21. (jr)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Denying without prejudice 131 MOTION for Default Judgment as to THOMAS MONAHAN & LOUIS CAPAZZI by MICHAEL A. D'ANTONIO.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 7/19/2017. (JB, )
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 OPINION AND ORDER denying application for Pro Bono Counsel. Motions terminated: 75 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono filed by MICHAEL A. D'ANTONIO. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 03/01/2017. (ek)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Dismiss, David Bole (Bole), the Borough ofAllendale (the Borough), Mary McDonnell (McDonnell), David Pfund (Pfund), and Stiles Thomas (Thomas, together, the Borough Defendants) (ECF No. 33); Mark S. Carter (Carter) (ECF No. 34); Richard Epstein (Epstein) (ECF No. 36); John Albohm (Albobm) (ECF No. 39); and the Bergen County Sheriffs Department (Sheriffs Department) (ECF No. 47); ; denying 63 Motion for Default Judgment and Plaintiffs appeal (ECF No. 74) of Magi strate Judge Clarks November 18, 2016, Order (ECF No. 73); that the Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice; granting Pltf. (30) days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint to address the pleading deficiencies described herein, and, if the amended complaint asserts any claims against Defendants Capazzi, Monahan, and PRC, Plaintiff is granted 60 days from the date of this Opinion to effect proper service on these Defendants. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 2/21/17. (DD, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'ANTONIO v. BOROUGH OF ALLENDALE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL A. D'ANTONIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOROUGH OF ALLENDALE
Represented By: MARY C. MCDONNELL
Represented By: DAVID T. PFUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STILES THOMAS
Represented By: MARY C. MCDONNELL
Represented By: DAVID T. PFUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN ALBOHM
Represented By: FRANK HOLAHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BOLE
Represented By: MARY C. MCDONNELL
Represented By: DAVID T. PFUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID PFUND
Represented By: MARY C. MCDONNELL
Represented By: DAVID T. PFUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY MCDONNELL
Represented By: MARY C. MCDONNELL
Represented By: DAVID T. PFUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK S. CARTER, ESQ.
Represented By: MARK S. CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS CAPAZZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PASSAIC RIVER COALITION
Represented By: HILLARY ANN FRAENKEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERGEN COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPT.
Represented By: LEONARD E. SEAMAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS P. MONAHAN, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD EPSTEIN, ESQ.
Represented By: RICHARD A. EPSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?