MUHAMMAD v. COMMUNITY COACH, INC. et al
Plaintiff: KALEEM MUHAMMAD
Defendant: COMMUNITY COACH, INC., COACH USA, INC., STAGECOACH GROUP, P.L.C., NEWEL SCOON, STANLEY FAIRCONNETUE, JAZMINE ESTACIO, SMART/UNITED TRANSPORTATION UNION LOCAL 759, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS SMART-TRANSPORTATION DIVISION, JOHN PREVISICH, CALVIN STUDIVANT and ERIKA A. DIEHL-GIBBONS
Case Number: 2:2016cv08344
Filed: November 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. Dickson
Presiding Judge: Jose L. Linares
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 3/28/18. (DD, )
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/5/17. (DD, )
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 7/27/17. (DD, )
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPINION. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 1/30/17. (DD, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MUHAMMAD v. COMMUNITY COACH, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KALEEM MUHAMMAD
Represented By: MATTHEW T. RINALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY COACH, INC.
Represented By: STANLEY LEWIS GOODMAN
Represented By: KEITH ANDREW REINFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COACH USA, INC.
Represented By: STANLEY LEWIS GOODMAN
Represented By: KEITH ANDREW REINFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STAGECOACH GROUP, P.L.C.
Represented By: STANLEY LEWIS GOODMAN
Represented By: KEITH ANDREW REINFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEWEL SCOON
Represented By: STANLEY LEWIS GOODMAN
Represented By: KEITH ANDREW REINFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANLEY FAIRCONNETUE
Represented By: STANLEY LEWIS GOODMAN
Represented By: KEITH ANDREW REINFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAZMINE ESTACIO
Represented By: STANLEY LEWIS GOODMAN
Represented By: KEITH ANDREW REINFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMART/UNITED TRANSPORTATION UNION LOCAL 759
Represented By: TIMOTHY R. HOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS SMART-TRANSPORTATION DIVISION
Represented By: TIMOTHY R. HOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN PREVISICH
Represented By: TIMOTHY R. HOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALVIN STUDIVANT
Represented By: TIMOTHY R. HOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIKA A. DIEHL-GIBBONS
Represented By: TIMOTHY R. HOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?