QUINTILES IMS INCORPORATED et al v. VEEVA SYSTEMS, INC.
Plaintiff: QUINTILES IMS INCORPORATED and IMS SOFTWARE SERVICES, LTD.
Defendant: VEEVA SYSTEMS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00177
Filed: January 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Morris
Presiding Judge: Claire C. Cecchi
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 431 OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 1/12/2022. (ld, )
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER and OPINION of the Special Master. It is the opinion of the Special Master that VEEVA's Motion is DENIED. etc. Signed by Special Master Dennis M. Cavanaugh, U.S.D.J. (Ret.) (dam)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER AND OPINION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by DENNIS M. CAVANAUGH, U.S.D.J. (Ret.) Special Master on 11/14/2019. (ld, )
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER AND OPINION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER related to the parties' discovery dispute involving health insurance payers. Signed by Special Master Dennis M. Cavanaugh, U.S.D.J. (Ret.) on 9/25/2019. (ams)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 248 OPINION AND ORDER OF THE SPECIAL MASTER; that IQVIA's request for clarification is GRANTED in Part.. Signed by HON. DENNIS M. CAVANAUGH, U.S.D.J. (RET.) on 7/10/2019. (ld, )
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER AND OPINION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Special Master Dennis M. Cavanaugh, U.S.D.J. (Ret.) on 5/13/2019. (ld, )
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 OPINION & ORDER OF THE SPECIAL MASTER Dennis M. Cavanaugh(Special Master) 10/11/18. (cm, )
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER & OPINION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER, that 144 Motion for Reconsideration and/or Clarification of the Special Master's 7/19/2018 Order and Opinion. After considering the submissions of the parties, based upon the following, it is the Opinion of the Special Master that IQVIA'S motion is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part, etc. Signed by Judge No Judge Assigned on 10/9/2018. (JB, )
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 OPINION. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/3/2018. (JB, )
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER & OPINION of the special Master, re: to provide a full and complete response to Veeva's Interrogatory No. 15 after considering the submissions of the parties, based upon the following, it is the Opinion of the Special Master that Veeva's motion is Denied and part and Granted in part, etc. Signed by Judge No Judge Assigned on 9/12/2018. (JB, )
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 OPINION. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/25/2017. (ek)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QUINTILES IMS INCORPORATED et al v. VEEVA SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUINTILES IMS INCORPORATED
Represented By: ROBERT I. STEINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IMS SOFTWARE SERVICES, LTD.
Represented By: ROBERT I. STEINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VEEVA SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: TONIA O. KLAUSNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?