HV ASSOCIATES LLC et al v. THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC.

Plaintiff: HV ASSOCIATES LLC and HARSHI VASHISHT
Defendant: THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 2:2017cv08128
Filed: October 11, 2017
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Newark Office
County: Essex
Presiding Judge: Stanley R. Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L. Waldor
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2018 41 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER Granting 35 Motion for Reconsideration, and it is further Ordered that Count II of the Amended Complaint, for common law invasion of privacy is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE against Defendant PNC. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 5/4/2018. (JB, )
April 10, 2018 38 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER granting Defendant RBC's motion to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) 26 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is granted leave to further amend the Amended Complaint to cure the pleading deficiencies identified in this Opinion, and specifically to support Count III with in-forum contacts by RBC related to the breach of contract claim and to support Counts III-IV and VI-VII with sufficient factual allegations to plausibly demonstrate an entitlement to relief, etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 4/10/18. (cm, )
March 8, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part PNC Defendant's 26 Motion to Dismiss. Count one of the Amended Complaint, for violations of New Jersey privacy laws with regard to bank records under the Privacy Act, is GRANTED; Count t wo of the Amended Complaint, for common law invasion of privacy, is DENIED without prejudice. The remaining Counts three through seven are GRANTED. Plaintiff is granted leave to further amend the Amended Complaint to cure the pleading deficiencies identified in this Opinion, and specifically to support Count I and Counts III-VII with sufficient factual allegations to plausibly demonstrate an entitlement to relief, etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 3/8/18. (cm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HV ASSOCIATES LLC et al v. THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HV ASSOCIATES LLC
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARSHI VASHISHT
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Represented By: JAMES A. KASSIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?