SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC et al v. MYLAN N.V. et al
Plaintiff: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH and SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE
Defendant: MYLAN N.V., MYLAN GMBH, MYLAN INC. and MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Case Number: 2:2017cv09105
Filed: October 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Somerset
Presiding Judge: Stanley R. Chesler
Presiding Judge: Cathy L. Waldor
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 582 OPINION. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 3/9/2020. (sm)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 440 OPINION & ORDER denying 353 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity. etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 10/2/2019. (dam, )
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 319 OPINION & ORDER. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 5/9/2019. (as, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC et al v. MYLAN N.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
Represented By: CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON
Represented By: KATELYN O'REILLY
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH
Represented By: CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON
Represented By: KATELYN O'REILLY
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE
Represented By: CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON
Represented By: KATELYN O'REILLY
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN N.V.
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Represented By: KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR
Represented By: JEFFREY S. SOOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN GMBH
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Represented By: KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR
Represented By: JEFFREY S. SOOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC.
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Represented By: KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR
Represented By: JEFFREY S. SOOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Represented By: KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR
Represented By: JEFFREY S. SOOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?