ALLERGAN SALES, LLC et al v. SANDOZ, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ALLERGAN SALES, LLC and ALLERGAN, INC.
Defendant: ALCON LABORATORIES, INC. and SANDOZ, INC.
Case Number: 2:2017cv10129
Filed: October 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Morris
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
2 Judge: William H Walls
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 196 Federal Circuit JUDGMENT as to #167 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by SANDOZ, INC., ALCON LABORATORIES, INC. (dam, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 195 Federal Circuit OPINION filed for the court by Prost, Chief Judge; Newman, Circuit Judge and Wallach, Circuit Judge. Concurring opinion filed by Chief Judge Prost. Precedential Opinion.(dam, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 194 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney CHRISTINA LYNN SAVERIANO terminated. (SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi for all further proceedings. Judge William H. Walls no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/26/2019. (ti, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 192 NOTICE of Change of Address by LIZA M. WALSH (WALSH, LIZA)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER withdrawing the appearance of Alyse Wu, Esq. as Pro Hac Vice Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/4/2018. (ld, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 190 Letter from Defendants to Judge Waldor to withdraw the apperance of Alyse Wu, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting #187 Motion to Stay. The proceedings in this Court are hereby stayed until after the Federal Circuit issues its opinion in the pending appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/29/2018. (dam, )
October 26, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #187 MOTION to Stay Unopposed Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. Motion set for 11/19/2018 before Judge William H. Walls. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 188 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. requesting an adjournment of the October 30, 2018 telephone status conference. (WALSH, LIZA)
October 26, 2018 Filing 187 MOTION to Stay Unopposed Motion to Stay Pending Appeal by SANDOZ, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Unopposed Motion to Stay Pending Appeal)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER GRANTING #185 Defendants' Letter requesting a one week extension to submit a proposed updated schedule until 10/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/23/2018. (dam, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 185 Letter from the parties regarding deadline to submit proposed schedule. (SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER GRANTING #183 Plaintiff's Letter Requesting a one week extension of the 10/19/2018 deadline.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/15/2018. (dam, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 183 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J., Requesting Extension of Deadline to Submit Proposed Schedule re #177 Order, Set Deadlines. (WALSH, LIZA)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting #158 Motion to Seal Confidential documents, etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/24/18. (th, )
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting #150 Motion to Seal Confidential Information, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/21/2018. (gl, )
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting #142 Motion to Seal Confidential Information, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/21/2018. (gl, )
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting #165 Motion to Seal Confidential Information, etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/21/18. (gl, )
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 10/30/18 at 9:50am. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/27/18. (tjg, )
August 27, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 8/27/2018. (tjg, )
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 STIPULATION AND ORDER amending #34 Pretrial Scheduling Order and #127 Stipulation and Order; Fact Discovery due by 10/12/2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 08/14/2018. (ek)
August 10, 2018 Filing 176 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J., Enclosing Stipulation and Proposed Order Amending Scheduling Order re #34 Scheduling Order, #127 Stipulation and Order. (WALSH, LIZA)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #161 Motion to Seal Confidential Document, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 08/06/2018. (ek)
August 2, 2018 Filing 174 INJUNCTION BOND in the amount of $ $157,300,000.00 posted by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC. (ek)
August 2, 2018 Filing 173 REDACTED VERSION OF THE #154 OPINION. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 07/13/2018. (ek)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #169 Letter request unsealing Plaintiffs' July 26, 2018 Letter (D.E. 168), etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 08/01/2018. (ek)
August 1, 2018 Filing 171 Notice of Docketing of FEDERAL CIRCUIT APPEAL re #167 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). Entry of Appearance due 08/15/2018. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/15/2018. Docketing Statement due 08/15/2018. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 10/01/2018. (dam, )
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BOND, etc. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 07/31/2018. (ek)
July 31, 2018 Filing 169 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. regarding Unsealing re #168 Letter,,. (WALSH, LIZA)
July 27, 2018 Transmission to Federal Circuit Sent on 7/27/2018 re #167 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). Copy of NOA, #155 ORDER, and Docket Sheet sent to Federal Circuit. (dam)
July 26, 2018 Filing 168 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge William H. Walls, U.S.D.J. re #154 Opinion, #155 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (WALSH, LIZA) UNSEALED per Court's Order #172 . Modified on 8/2/2018 (ek). NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
July 26, 2018 Filing 167 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Federal Circuit as to #155 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by ALCON LABORATORIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-8911581. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
July 26, 2018 Filing 166 REDACTION to #148 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,,,, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Certificate of Service)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
July 24, 2018 Filing 165 MOTION to Seal by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Liza M. Walsh, #2 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #3 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
July 24, 2018 Filing 164 REDACTION to #156 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,,, by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits C-F, #2 Exhibit K)(WALSH, LIZA)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #160 Letter request unsealing the #155 July 13, 2018 Order filed under temporary seal, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 07/18/2018. (ek)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #159 Letter request extending time to submit the redacted versions of the documents in support of Plaintiffs' #156 Reply in Support of the Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct and Antitrust Counterclaims, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 07/17/2018. (ek)
July 18, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #161 Consent MOTION to Seal portions of the Court's July 13, 2018 Opinion (D.E. 154). Motion set for 8/20/2018 before Judge William H. Walls. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
July 17, 2018 Filing 161 Consent MOTION to Seal portions of the Court's July 13, 2018 Opinion (D.E. 154) by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Liza M. Walsh with Ex. 1, #2 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #3 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
July 17, 2018 Filing 160 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. requesting that the Court unseal July 13, 2018 Order (D.E. 155) re #155 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (WALSH, LIZA)
July 17, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #158 Consent MOTION to Seal D.E. 149. Motion set for 8/20/2018 before Judge William H. Walls. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
July 16, 2018 Filing 159 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. requesting an extension of today's deadline to submit redactions. (WALSH, LIZA)
July 16, 2018 Filing 158 Consent MOTION to Seal D.E. 149 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Index)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
July 13, 2018 Filing 157 DECLARATION of Liza M. Walsh re #156 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,,, by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B to Walsh Declaration, #2 Exhibit G through J to Walsh Declaration, #3 Exhibit L through U to Walsh Declaration, #4 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
July 13, 2018 Filing 156 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC. re #112 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct and Antitrust Counterclaims and to Strike Defendants' Tenth Affirmative Defense, or Alternatively to Bifurcate and Stay Defendants' Antitrust Counterclaims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C through F to Walsh Declaration, #2 Exhibit K to Walsh Declaration)(WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #85 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, etc. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 07/13/2018. (ek) Unsealed per #163 Order. Modified on 7/18/2018 (ek).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ***SEALED OPINION pursuant to Court's #175 Order. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 07/13/2018. (ek) Modified on 8/7/2018 (ek).
July 11, 2018 Filing 153 REDACTION to #149 Letter,, by SANDOZ, INC.. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
July 11, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Redaction document number #152 submitted by CHRISTINA SAVERIANO on 07/10/2018 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (ek)
July 10, 2018 Filing 152 REDACTION to #149 Letter,, by SANDOZ, INC.. (SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
July 5, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #150 MOTION to Seal portions of Plaintiffs' June 21, 2018 Letter to the Hon. William H. Walls, U.S.D.J. (D.E. 144). Motion set for 8/6/2018 before Judge William H. Walls. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
July 5, 2018 Filing 151 REDACTION to #144 Letter by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC.. (WALSH, LIZA)
July 5, 2018 Filing 150 MOTION to Seal portions of Plaintiffs' June 21, 2018 Letter to the Hon. William H. Walls, U.S.D.J. (D.E. 144) by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Liza M. Walsh with Ex. 1, #2 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #3 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
July 2, 2018 Filing 149 Letter from Sandoz to Judge Walls regarding Allergan's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 29, 2018 Filing 148 BRIEF in Opposition filed by ALCON LABORATORIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC. re #112 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct and Antitrust Counterclaims and to Strike Defendants' Tenth Affirmative Defense, or Alternatively to Bifurcate and Stay Defendants' Antitrust Counterclaims (Attachments: #1 Declaration Christina L. Saveriano, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Certificate of Service)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 29, 2018 Filing 147 REDACTION to #115 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, by ALCON LABORATORIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC.. (SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting an extension of Sandoz's time to file its opposition until June 29, 2018; that Allergan's time to reply has been extended to July 13, 2018. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 6/27/2018. (ld, )
June 25, 2018 Filing 145 Letter from Eric I. Abraham, Esq.. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
June 21, 2018 Filing 144 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. William H. Walls, U.S.D.J.. (WALSH, LIZA)
June 20, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #142 Joint MOTION to Seal . Motion set for 7/16/2018 before Judge William H. Walls. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
June 20, 2018 Filing 143 REDACTION to #124 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,,, by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert J. Noecker, M.D., #2 Exhibit 1-4, #3 Exhibit 5-8, #4 Exhibit 9-11)(WALSH, LIZA)
June 19, 2018 Filing 142 Joint MOTION to Seal by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina L. Saveriano, #2 Declaration of Liza M. Walsh with Ex. 1, #3 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #4 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 8/27/18 at 3:30pm. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/19/18. (tjg, )
June 19, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 6/19/2018. (tjg, )
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #136 Letter request unsealing Exhibits V2 and FF2 to Plaintiffs' Opening Claim Construction Brief (D.E. 132), etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 06/13/2018. (ek)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #137 Letter request for a one-week extension of time to submit the redacted versions of the documents in support of its Reply in Support of the Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (D.E. 124) until June 20, 2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 06/13/2018. (ek)
June 13, 2018 Filing 138 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Walls: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 6/13/2018. Court reserves decision (Court Reporter/Yvonne Davion.) (emc)
June 12, 2018 Filing 137 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. requesting an extension of tommorow's deadline to submit redactions. (WALSH, LIZA)
June 12, 2018 Filing 136 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J.. (WALSH, LIZA)
June 12, 2018 Filing 135 Letter from the parties regarding June 13, 2018 hearing. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #133 Letter requesting an extension of the deadline until Friday, June 15, 2018, to submit the redacted versions of Exhibits V2 and FF2 to its Opening Claim Construction Brief, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 06/12/2018. (ek)
June 11, 2018 Filing 133 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J.. (WALSH, LIZA)
June 8, 2018 Filing 132 Exhibit to #131 Letter by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC.. (WALSH, LIZA) Unsealed per Order #140 Modified on 6/14/2018 (ek). NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 8, 2018 Filing 131 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge William H. Walls, U.S.D.J., Enclosing Corrected Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Opening Markman Brief re #57 Markman Opening Brief. (WALSH, LIZA)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting request for a one week extension of the deadline to submit the redacted versions of the documents in support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction until June 12, 2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/7/2018. (ld, )
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting request for a one week extension of today's deadline to submit the redacted versions of the documents in support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (D.E. 124) until June 13, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/7/2018. (ld, )
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting request for the extension of the briefing schedule; that Defendants' opposition is due June 25, 2018, and Plaintiffs' reply is due July 10, 2018. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 6/7/2018. (ld, )
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (D.E. 34) AND STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (D.E. 107). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/7/2018. (ld, )
June 6, 2018 Filing 126 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. requesting an extension of today's deadline to submit redactions. (WALSH, LIZA)
June 5, 2018 Filing 125 DECLARATION of Liza M. Walsh re #124 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,,, by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O through T, #2 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
June 5, 2018 Filing 124 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC. re #85 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert J. Noecker, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3-4, #5 Exhibit 5-8, #6 Exhibit 9-10, #7 Exhibit 11)(WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 5, 2018 Filing 123 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. William H. Walls, U.S.D.J. requesting an extension to the briefing schedule regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss. (WALSH, LIZA)
June 5, 2018 Filing 122 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. encl. Stipulation and proposed Order Amending Pretrial Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
June 5, 2018 Filing 121 Letter from Defendants to Judge Waldor for extension of time to submit redacted brief re #120 Order,. (SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting Defendants' #118 Letter request for a one week extension of time, until June 5, 2018, to submit the redacted versions of the documents in support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (D.E. 115), etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 05/30/2018. (ek)
May 29, 2018 Filing 118 Letter from Defendants requesting extension of deadline to submit redacted documents re #115 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,. (SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (D.E.34) and (D.E. 107), etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 05/29/2018. (ek)
May 25, 2018 Filing 116 CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #85 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Certificate of Service)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
May 25, 2018 Filing 115 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #85 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 63, #2 Exhibit 64, #3 Exhibit 69)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 25, 2018 Filing 114 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #112 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct and Antitrust Counterclaims and to Strike Defendants' Tenth Affirmative Defense, or Alternatively to Bifurcate and Stay Defendants' Antitrust Counterclaims . (SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
May 25, 2018 Filing 113 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to The Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. enclosing Stipulation and Proposed Order. (WALSH, LIZA)
May 24, 2018 Filing 119 Transcript of Telephone Conference held on May 7, 2018, before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 6/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2018. (mfr)
May 23, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #112 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct and Antitrust Counterclaims and to Strike Defendants' Tenth Affirmative Defense, or Alternatively to Bifurcate and Stay Defendants' Antitrust Counterclaims. Motion set for 6/18/2018 before Judge William H. Walls. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
May 22, 2018 Filing 112 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct and Antitrust Counterclaims and to Strike Defendants' Tenth Affirmative Defense, or Alternatively to Bifurcate and Stay Defendants' Antitrust Counterclaims by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC.. Responses due by 6/4/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Liza M. Walsh, #3 Exhibits A-H to the Declaration of Liza M. Walsh, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
May 22, 2018 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC SHAUN HOCHSTADT on behalf of ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HOCHSTADT, ERIC)
May 18, 2018 Filing 110 Transcript of Teleconference held on May 7, 2018, before Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 6/8/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2018. (jml)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #106 Letter requesting an extension of page limits for briefing on Plaintiffs' motion to dismiss, etc. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 05/15/2018. (ek)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #105 Letter request for a one-week extension from May 15, 2018 to May 22, 2018, to answer, move or otherwise respond to Defendants' Counterclaims, filed on April 17, 2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 05/14/2018. (ek)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING #34 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING #89 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 05/14/2018. (ek)
May 14, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JOHN M. FARRELL, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
May 11, 2018 Filing 106 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. William H. Walls, U.S.D.J. requesting an extension of page limits for briefing on Plaintiffs' motion to dismiss. (WALSH, LIZA)
May 11, 2018 Filing 105 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. requesting one-week extension from May 15, 2018 to May 22, 2018 for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' Counterclaims. (WALSH, LIZA)
May 11, 2018 Filing 104 Letter from Sandoz for extension of scheduling order re #89 Stipulation and Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
May 10, 2018 Filing 103 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John M. Farrell to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8730611.) (WALSH, LIZA)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER directing the Clerk to unseal D.E. 95. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/9/2018. (ld, )
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting request for a further 3-day extension of today's deadline to submit the redacted versions of the documents in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (D.E. 86) until May 11, 2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/9/2018. (ld, )
May 9, 2018 Filing 99 REDACTION to #86 Brief in Support of Motion,,,, by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Robert J. Noecker with Ex. 1-33 (Redacted), #2 Declaration of Robert Maness with Ex. A (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 1-4 to Maness Declaration, #4 Exhibit 5-14 to Maness Declaration, #5 Declaration of David LeCause with Ex. A-B (Redacted), #6 Declaration of Liza M. Walsh with Ex. A-N (Redacted))(WALSH, LIZA)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF John M. Farrell, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/8/2018. (ld, )
May 8, 2018 Filing 98 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re #90 Order. (WALSH, LIZA)
May 8, 2018 Filing 97 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. requesting that the Court unseal Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs' May 6, 2018 Letter (D.E. 95) re #95 Exhibit (to Document),,. (WALSH, LIZA)
May 7, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 5/7/2018. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tjg, )
May 7, 2018 Filing 96 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Regarding Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of John M. Farrell, #2 Certification of Liza M. Walsh, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
May 6, 2018 Filing 95 Exhibit to #94 Letter by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC.. (WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 6, 2018 Filing 94 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re #91 Letter, #92 Amended Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(WALSH, LIZA)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 5/7/18 at 10:00 AM. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/4/18. (tjg, )
May 4, 2018 Filing 92 AMENDED DOCUMENT by SANDOZ, INC.. Amendment to #91 Letter Exhibit H and Exhibit I. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(ABRAHAM, ERIC)
May 4, 2018 Filing 91 Letter from Eric I. Abraham, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(ABRAHAM, ERIC)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting request for an extension of time until May 8, 2018 to submit the redacted versions of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (D.E. 86). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/3/2018. (ld, )
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (D.E.34) AND STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (D.E. 81). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/2/2018. (ld, )
May 1, 2018 Filing 88 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. requesting an extension of time until May 8, 2018 to submit the redacted versions of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (D.E. 86). (WALSH, LIZA)
May 1, 2018 Filing 87 Letter from the parties with a proposed Stipulation and Order extending Scheduling Order re #81 Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
May 1, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #85 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion set for 5/21/2018 before Judge William H. Walls. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
April 30, 2018 Filing 86 BRIEF in Support filed by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC. re #85 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert J. Noecker (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 1-13 to Noecker Declaration (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 14-20 to Noecker Declaration (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 21-33 to Noecker Declaration (Filed Under Seal), #5 Declaration of Robert Maness with Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 1-4 to Maness Declaration (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 5-14 to Maness Declaration (Filed Under Seal), #8 Declaration of David LeCause with Exhibits A and B (Filed Under Seal), #9 Declaration of Liza M. Walsh (Filed Under Seal), #10 Exhibit A-N to Walsh Declaration (Filed Under Seal))(WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 30, 2018 Filing 85 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Show Cause, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
April 26, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: ----------------------------- Motion Hearing has been set for 6/13/2018 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 4D before Judge William H. Walls. (emc)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Granting #74 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge William H. Walls, U.S.D.J., Requesting Unsealing of Responsive Claim Construction Exhibits re 72 Exhibit (to Document),, 70 Exhibi. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 4/25/2018. (JB, )
April 24, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #82 Order, submitted by SANDOZ, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/15/2018. (JB, )
April 24, 2018 Filing 83 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge William H. Walls, U.S.D.J., Regarding Markman and Preliminary Injunction Hearing. (WALSH, LIZA)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 LETTER ORDER Granting #77 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re #62 Letter,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/24/2018. (JB, )
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 LETTER ORDER Granting #76 Letter from Sandoz enclosing a proposed Stipulation and Order amending deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/23/2018. (JB, )
April 23, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, SEAN MCELDOWNEY and STEFAN MICHAEL MILLER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, )
April 23, 2018 Filing 79 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Stefan Michael Miller, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
April 23, 2018 Filing 78 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sean McEldowney, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION ORDER, that the time for Plaintiff to answer, move or otherwise respond to Defendant's Amended Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims in this action is extended from 5/1/2018 to 5/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/20/2018. (JB, )
April 20, 2018 Filing 77 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re #62 Letter,,. (WALSH, LIZA)
April 20, 2018 Filing 76 Letter from Sandoz enclosing a proposed Stipulation and Order amending deadlines. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
April 19, 2018 Filing 75 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J., Enclosing Stipulation on Extension of Deadline for Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Amended Answer. (WALSH, LIZA)
April 18, 2018 Filing 74 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge William H. Walls, U.S.D.J., Requesting Unsealing of Responsive Claim Construction Exhibits re #72 Exhibit (to Document),, #70 Exhibit (to Document),,. (WALSH, LIZA)
April 17, 2018 Filing 73 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by All Defendants.(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
April 17, 2018 Filing 72 Exhibit to #71 Markman Response Brief, by ALCON LABORATORIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Y, #2 Exhibit Z, #3 Exhibit AA)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 17, 2018 Filing 71 MARKMAN RESPONSE BRIEF re #57 Markman Opening Brief (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Q, #3 Exhibit R, #4 Exhibit S, #5 Exhibit T, #6 Exhibit U, #7 Exhibit V, #8 Exhibit W, #9 Certificate of Service)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
April 17, 2018 Filing 70 Exhibit to #69 Markman Response Brief by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC.. (WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 17, 2018 Filing 69 MARKMAN RESPONSE BRIEF re #57 Markman Opening Brief (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Liza M. Walsh, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
April 13, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $300 received as to Sean McEldowney, Esq. and Stefan Michael Miller, Esq., receipt number TRE090762 (mps)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER Amending pretrial scheduling Order (D.E. 34). Deadline to seek leave amend pleadings or join parties extended to 417/2018 Deadline for Defendant's to respond to Plaintiff's first amended Complaint extended to 4/17/2018. All other dates contained in the 2/13/2018 pretrial order (D.E. 34) shall remain the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/10/2018. (JB, )
April 9, 2018 Filing 67 Letter from Sandoz to Judge Waldor with Stipulation Amending Deadlines. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
April 6, 2018 Filing 66 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALCON LABORATORIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC., filed by ALLERGAN, INC., ALLERGAN SALES, LLC.(WALSH, LIZA)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 LETTER ORDER Granting #60 Letter from Sandoz Inc. to Judge Waldor to unseal document re 59 Exhibit (to Document), etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/5/2018. (JB, )
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting #54 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stefan Michael Miller, Esq. by All Defendants, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/5/2018. (JB, )
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER, that Plaintiff are permitted to file an Amended Complaint in the form attached hereto as Exhibit A; Defendant reserved all rights with respect to the merits of the claims set forth in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and nothing herein shall be construed as a waiver of any defenses or arguments with respect thereto by Defendants; and Defendant shall have fourteen (14) days from the date Plaintiff's Amended Complaint to file an Answer or otherwise move in response to Plaintiff's amended complaint., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/5/2018. (JB, )
April 5, 2018 Filing 62 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J.. (WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 6/19/18 at 2:00 PM. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/5/18. (tjg, )
April 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 4/5/2018. (tjg, )
April 4, 2018 Filing 60 Letter from Sandoz Inc. to Judge Waldor to unseal document re #59 Exhibit (to Document),,. (SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
April 3, 2018 Filing 59 Exhibit to #58 Markman Opening Brief, by SANDOZ, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 3, 2018 Filing 58 MARKMAN OPENING BRIEF (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit P, #16 Certificate of Service)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
April 3, 2018 Filing 57 MARKMAN OPENING BRIEF (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Liza M. Walsh, #2 Exhibits A-K, #3 Exhibits L-S, #4 Exhibits T-Z, #5 Exhibits AA-LL, #6 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by Plaintiff, on 4/5/18 at 3:30 PM. The 4/25/18 teleconference is canceled.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/3/18. (tjg, )
April 2, 2018 Filing 55 Letter from the parties providing status and requesting a conference. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
April 2, 2018 #54 MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE [chmbrs. will notify counsel if oral argument is necessary] (DD, )
April 2, 2018 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stefan Michael Miller, Esq. by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification, #3 Certification)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting #40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sean McEldowney, Esq. by All Defendants, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/27/2018. (JB, )
March 21, 2018 Filing 52 STATEMENT (Joint Claim Construction and Pre-Hearing Statement) by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC.. (WALSH, LIZA)
March 19, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ALYSE WU, BRYAN HALES and KYLE M. KANTAREK, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, )
March 19, 2018 Filing 51 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kyle Kantarek, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
March 19, 2018 Filing 50 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Bryan Hales, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
March 19, 2018 Filing 49 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Alyse Wu, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
March 19, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $450 received as to Kyle Kantarek, Esq., Alyse Wu, Esq. and Bryan Hales, Esq., receipt number TRE089923 (mps)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING #34 Scheduling Order, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/15/2018. (JB, )
March 14, 2018 Filing 47 Letter from Defendants to Judge Waldor with Stipulation and Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/13/2018. (JB, )
March 6, 2018 Filing 45 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Cathly L. Waldor, U.S.M.J., Enclosing Discovery Confidentiality Order. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Liza M. Walsh on Behalf of Plaintiffs in Support of Discovery Confidentiality Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
March 6, 2018 Filing 44 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J., Enclosing Stipulation on Amending Complaint. (WALSH, LIZA)
February 28, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sean McEldowney, Esq.. Motion set for 4/2/2018 before Judge William H. Walls. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 LETTER ORDER Granting #41 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J., Withdrawing Request for Telephonce Conference and Requesting Extension of Deadline to Submit DCO re 38 Letter, 34 Scheduling Order,.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/27/2018. (JB, )
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting #24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kyle Kantarek, Esq., Alyse Wu, Esq. and Bryan Hales, Esq. by All Defendants, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/26/2018. (JB, )
February 26, 2018 Filing 41 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Judge Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J., Withdrawing Request for Telephonce Conference and Requesting Extension of Deadline to Submit DCO re #38 Letter, #34 Scheduling Order,. (WALSH, LIZA)
February 26, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sean McEldowney, Esq. by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
February 26, 2018 Filing 39 Letter from Defendants to Judge Waldor re #38 Letter. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
February 23, 2018 Filing 38 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. requesting telephone conference. (WALSH, LIZA)
February 22, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, TASHA FRANCIS, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, )
February 22, 2018 Filing 37 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Tasha Francis to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8498215.) (WALSH, LIZA)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting #35 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. regarding application for the pro hac vice admission on consent of Tasha Francis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/21/2018. (JB, )
February 20, 2018 Filing 35 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. regarding application for the pro hac vice admission on consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Tasha Francis, #2 Certification of Liza M. Walsh, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 4/25/2018 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Deadline to seek leave to Amend Pleadings or Join Parties due by 4/10/2018. Close of Fact Discovery due by 6/8/2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/13/2018. (jbb)
February 13, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/13/2018. (tjg, )
February 13, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DOUGLAS E. MCCANN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, )
February 8, 2018 Filing 33 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Douglas E. McCann to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8464763.) (WALSH, LIZA)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting #31 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re: Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent of Douglas E. McCann, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/7/2018. (JB, )
January 31, 2018 Filing 31 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re: Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Douglas E. McCann, #2 Certification of Liza M. Walsh, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
January 12, 2018 Filing 29 ANSWER to Counterclaim by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC..(WALSH, LIZA)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting #23 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. seeking an extension of time until Friday, January 12, 2018, for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' Counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/10/2018. (JB, )
January 10, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JONATHAN E. SINGER, ROBERT M. OAKES, SUSAN E. MORRISON and DEANNA REICHEL, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, )
January 10, 2018 Filing 28 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Deanna Reichel to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8386715.) (WALSH, LIZA)
January 10, 2018 Filing 27 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Susan E. Morrison to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8386703.) (WALSH, LIZA)
January 10, 2018 Filing 26 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Robert M. Oakes to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8386692.) (WALSH, LIZA)
January 10, 2018 Filing 25 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jonathan E. Singer to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8386676.) (WALSH, LIZA)
January 10, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kyle Kantarek, Esq., Alyse Wu, Esq. and Bryan Hales, Esq.. Motion set for 2/5/2018 before Judge William H. Walls. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
January 9, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kyle Kantarek, Esq., Alyse Wu, Esq. and Bryan Hales, Esq. by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification C. Saveriano, #3 Certification A. Wu, #4 Certification B. Hales, #5 Certification K. Kantarek)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
January 9, 2018 Filing 23 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. seeking an extension of time until Friday, January 12, 2018, for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' Counterclaims. (WALSH, LIZA)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #17 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re: Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent of Jonathan E. Singer, Susan E. Morrison, Deanna Reichel, and Robert M. Oakes, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/5/2017. (JB, )
December 20, 2017 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4C on 2/13/18 at 11:30 AM. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a Joint Discovery Plan to chambers via email to CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/20/17. (tjg, )
December 19, 2017 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALCON LABORATORIES, INC.. (SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
December 19, 2017 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SANDOZ, INC.. (SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
December 19, 2017 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by All Defendants.(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
December 19, 2017 Filing 17 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re: Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jonathan E. Singer, #2 Certification of Susan E. Morrison, #3 Certification of Deanna Reichel, #4 Certification of Robert M. Oakes, #5 Certification of Liza M. Walsh, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 6.1(b); that the deadline for Defendant Sandoz, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint shall be extended until and including December 19, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/7/2017. (ld, )
December 6, 2017 Filing 15 Letter from Sandoz Inc. enclosing a proposed consent order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
December 6, 2017 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #14 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ALCON LABORATORIES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/19/2017. (JB, )
December 5, 2017 Filing 14 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Alcon.. (SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
December 5, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINA LYNN SAVERIANO on behalf of ALCON LABORATORIES, INC. (SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
December 5, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC I. ABRAHAM on behalf of ALCON LABORATORIES, INC. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
November 28, 2017 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #10 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SANDOZ, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/6/2017. (JB, )
November 27, 2017 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC.. ALCON LABORATORIES, INC. served on 11/14/2017, answer due 12/5/2017. (WALSH, LIZA)
November 20, 2017 Filing 10 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Sandoz Inc... (SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
November 20, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINA LYNN SAVERIANO on behalf of SANDOZ, INC. (SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
November 20, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC I. ABRAHAM on behalf of SANDOZ, INC. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
November 6, 2017 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC.. SANDOZ, INC. served on 11/1/2017, answer due 11/22/2017. (WALSH, LIZA)
November 2, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ELEONORE OFOSU-ANTWI on behalf of ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC. (OFOSU-ANTWI, ELEONORE)
October 31, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALCON LABORATORIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *JACKELINE BARCO* (JB, )
October 31, 2017 Filing 4 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A) (JB, )
October 31, 2017 Judge William H. Walls and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (eu, )
October 30, 2017 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC. (WALSH, LIZA)
October 30, 2017 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALLERGAN, INC.. (WALSH, LIZA)
October 30, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALCON LABORATORIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8206599) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 AO120 Form)(WALSH, LIZA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLERGAN SALES, LLC et al v. SANDOZ, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLERGAN SALES, LLC
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: ELEONORE OFOSU-ANTWI
Represented By: ERIC SHAUN HOCHSTADT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLERGAN, INC.
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: ELEONORE OFOSU-ANTWI
Represented By: ERIC SHAUN HOCHSTADT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALCON LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: ERIC I. ABRAHAM
Represented By: CHRISTINA LYNN SAVERIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ, INC.
Represented By: ERIC I. ABRAHAM
Represented By: CHRISTINA LYNN SAVERIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?