HORIZON PHARMA, INC., ET AL. V. DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., ET AL.
Plaintiff: HORIZON PHARMA, INC and POZEN INC.
Defendant: LUPIN LTD, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED, MYLAN INC., DR REDDY'S LABORATORIES LTD, DR REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. and LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Petitioner: BAKER BOTTS LLP and PHV STEPHEN M. HASH
Case Number: 2:2017cv11635
Filed: November 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: Motion to Quash
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 CHAMBER'S NOTATION: The Court has on several occasions directed that local counsel appearance be filed on behalf of plaintiff in this case. Steven M Hash, Esq., is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey and a Clerk's Letter was sent. Natalie L Arbaugh, Esq., is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey and a Clerk's Letter was sent. Both parties are associated with the motion to Quash filed in Texas. Steven M. Hash, Esq., filed the motion to quash on behalf of himself and Baker Botts LLP. Natalie Arbaugh, Esq., filed a notice of appearance on behalf of Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., and Ltd. Both parties were directed to obtain local counsel. To date no party has complied. (tt, )
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that the Previously Consolidated Actions and the Transferred Texas Action, Civil Action No. 2:17-cv-11635, into Civil Action No. 2:15-cv-03324, are consolidated for pretrial and case management purposes and not for trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/1/2018. (ld, )
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: The parties shall submit a proposed consent order consolidating the related Civil Action No. 2:17-cv-11635, into Civil Action No. 2:15-cv-03324, by 2/2/18. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/29/18. (tjg, )
November 16, 2017 CHAMBERS NOTIFICATION : DOC 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas or, in the alternative, Motion for a Protective Order REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE WALDOR (tt, )
November 16, 2017 Filing 14 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (sm, )
November 16, 2017 Filing 13 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (sm, )
November 15, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
November 15, 2017 Filing 12 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:17-cv-00997. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 15, 2017 Motions No Longer Referred: #1 MOTION to Quash. (td)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED that Opposed, Non-Party Stephen M. Hash and Baker Botts L.L.P. Motion to Quash Subpoenas or, in the alternative, Motion for a Protective Order (Dkt. #1 ) is HEREBY TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (td)
November 6, 2017 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Baker Botts LLP, Stephen M. Hash, re #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Movant Baker Botts LLP, Movant Stephen M. Hash (Hash, Stephen)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Mark Lane. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ah)
November 3, 2017 Filing 9 Letter/Correspondence to Dmitry V. Shelhoff re: non-admitted status. (td)
November 3, 2017 Filing 8 Letter/Correspondence to Stuart D. Sender re: non-admitted status. (td)
November 3, 2017 Filing 7 Letter/Correspondence to Alan H. Pollack re: non-admitted status. (td)
November 2, 2017 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Proposed Order) (Arbaugh, Natalie)
November 2, 2017 Please note that this case has been converted from a Miscellaneous case to a Civil case. Please use case number 1:17-cv-997-LY on all future filings, either electronic or paper. (td)
November 1, 2017 Filing 5 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., re #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Movant Baker Botts LLP, Movant Stephen M. Hash Or, in the Alternative, Motion for a Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit B)(Arbaugh, Natalie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2017: #4 Sealed Exhibits) (td).
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Mark Lane. The deadline for the response is extended to November 1, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ah)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Baker Botts LLP, Stephen M. Hash. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Mark Lane. (td)
October 24, 2017 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Quash by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arbaugh, Natalie)
October 24, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie Terhune Arbaugh on behalf of Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd.. Attorney Natalie Terhune Arbaugh added to party Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Terhune Arbaugh added to party Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc.(pty:res), Attorney Natalie Terhune Arbaugh added to party Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Terhune Arbaugh added to party Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd.(pty:res) (Arbaugh, Natalie)
October 18, 2017 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas or, in the alternative, Motion for a Protective Order ($47.00 Filing Fee, Receipt Number 100031530) by Baker Botts LLP, Stephen M. Hash. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration of Stephen M. Hash, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Civil Cover Sheet and Receipt No. 100031530)(afd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HORIZON PHARMA, INC., ET AL. V. DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., ET AL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BAKER BOTTS LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PHV STEPHEN M. HASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR REDDY'S LABORATORIES LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HORIZON PHARMA, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POZEN INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?