IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC. v. ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.
Defendant: ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. and CADILA HEALTHCARE LTD.
Case Number: 2:2017cv13476
Filed: December 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Atlantic
Presiding Judge: Stanley R. Chesler
Presiding Judge: Cathy L. Waldor
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 211 OPINION and ORDER denying 196 Defendants' Motion in Limine; denying 198 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine. etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 3/24/2020. (dam, )
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 OPINION AND ORDER; The Court concludes that Plaintiff is correct and that the phrase, "a controlled release oral solid formulation of levodopa," has its ordinary meaning.. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 7/25/2019. (ld, )
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 104 MOTION to Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording re: 89 Transcript. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/6/2018. (gl, )
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 OPINION. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 11/29/2018. (dam, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC. v. ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL E. PATUNAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: ELISSA J. GLASBAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CADILA HEALTHCARE LTD.
Represented By: ELISSA J. GLASBAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?