BALDEO et al v. CITY OF PATERSON et al
Plaintiff: STACEY BALDEO and SIRRANO KEITH BALDEO
Defendant: COUNCILMAN MOHAMMED AKHTARUZZAMAN, COUNCILMAN MICHAEL MIKE JACKSON, COUNCILMAN LUIS VELEZ, COUNCILWOMAN RUBY N COTTON, CITY OF PATERSON, COUNCILWOMAN MARITA DAVILA, JOHN DOES A-Z, COUNCILMAN KENNETH M MORRIS, JR, COUNCILMAN ANDRE SAYEGH, CITY ATTORNEY ROMINA M PASQUAL, ESQ, COUNCILMAN WILLIAM BILL MCKOY, BUSINESS ADMINISTRAT NELLIE POU, COUNCILMAN JULIO TAVAREZ, COUNCILMAN SHAHIN KHALIQUE, COUNCILMAN DOMINGO ALEX MENDEZ, DOMINGO MENDEZ, WILLIAM MCKOY, MICHAEL JACKSON, ROMINA M PASQUAL, LUIS VELEZ, MIKE, MOHAMMED AKHTARUZZAMAN, BILL, ANDRE SAYEGH, RUBY N COTTON, JULIO TAVAREZ, MARITA DAVILA, NELLIE POU, SHAHIN KHALIQUE, KENNETH M MORRIS, JR and ALEX
Case Number: 2:2018cv05359
Filed: April 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Passaic
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #39 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, etc. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 12/31/20. (jc, )
December 31, 2020 Filing 49 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 12/31/20. (jc, )
November 25, 2020 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion no longer assigned to the case. (jc, )
November 10, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 11/10/2020. (spc, )
November 9, 2020 Filing 48 Letter/Declaration from Sirrano Keith Baldeo. (jc, )
November 9, 2020 Filing 47 Letter from Michael S. Kasanoff to Hon. Steven C. Mannion, USMJ re #45 Letter. (KASANOFF, MICHAEL)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed D.E. 45. A telephone conference is hereby scheduled for 11/10/2020 at 11:30 am. The dial-in number 866-434-5269 with access code 1874589#. If you have problems connecting to the conference line using a cell phone, try using a landline. No court proceedings, including proceedings conducted by audio or video teleconference, may be photographed, recorded, broadcast, or otherwise transmitted without the express permission of the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 10/30/2020. (Mannion, Steven)
October 28, 2020 Filing 45 Letter from Keith J. Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - TCA Notice)(MURPHY, KEITH)
August 6, 2020 Filing 44 STATEMENT of Material Fact in Support filed by MOHAMMED AKHTARUZZAMAN, CITY OF PATERSON, RUBY N COTTON, MARITA DAVILA, MICHAEL JACKSON, SHAHIN KHALIQUE, WILLIAM MCKOY, DOMINGO MENDEZ, KENNETH M MORRIS, JR, ANDRE SAYEGH re #39 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Brief Reply Brief)(MURPHY, KEITH)
July 30, 2020 Filing 43 BRIEF in Opposition filed by SIRRANO KEITH BALDEO re #39 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Statement Plaintiff's L.Civ.R. 56.1 Statement of Material Facts in Opposition to Summary Judgment, #2 Certification of Michael S. Kasanoff)(KASANOFF, MICHAEL)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 APPLICATION AND ORDER Extending Plaintiff's Time to Reply to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment to July 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/20/20. (jc, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 41 Proposed Order by SIRRANO KEITH BALDEO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order seeking Extension of Time to Reply to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment)(KASANOFF, MICHAEL)
July 17, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The #40 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SIRRANO KEITH BALDEO has been DENIED. The Clerk does not have the authority under Local Rule 6.1 to grant the relief requested. Plaintiff may seek relief under Local Rule 7.1 or submit a proposed order directly to the judge for consideration. (jc, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 40 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney MICHAEL S. KASANOFF for SIRRANO KEITH BALDEO added. (KASANOFF, MICHAEL)
July 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #39 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion set for 8/3/2020 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment by MOHAMMED AKHTARUZZAMAN, CITY OF PATERSON, RUBY N COTTON, MARITA DAVILA, MICHAEL JACKSON, SHAHIN KHALIQUE, WILLIAM MCKOY, DOMINGO MENDEZ, KENNETH M MORRIS, JR, ROMINA M PASQUAL, NELLIE POU, ANDRE SAYEGH, LUIS VELEZ. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion, #2 Certification Certification of McKoy, #3 Certification Certification of Counsel, #4 Statement Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute, #5 Brief Memorandum of Law in support of Motion, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit Exhibit I, #15 Exhibit Exhibit J, #16 Exhibit Exhibit K Placeholder, #17 Exhibit Exhibit L Placeholder)(MURPHY, KEITH)
June 30, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 6/30/2020. (spc, )
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ORDER -- The telephone conference scheduled with Judge Mannion for 6/30/2020 at 4:15 PM will be held using the dial-in number 866-434-5269 with access code 1874589#. If you have problems connecting to the conference line using a cell phone, try using a landline. No court proceedings, including proceedings conducted by audio or video teleconference, may be photographed, recorded, broadcast, or otherwise transmitted without the express permission of the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 6/24/2020. (spc, )
May 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER: Counsels request [D.E. 36] is hereby granted. The deadline for Defendants to file a motion for summary judgment is extended to July 3, 2020. Opposition is to be filed by 7/17/2020. Replies are to be filed within seven days of the opposition. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 5/10/2020. (Mannion, Steven)
May 8, 2020 Filing 36 Letter from Keith J. Murphy. (MURPHY, KEITH)
March 17, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Settlement Conference held on 3/17/2020. (spc, )
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 3/17/20. (jc, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ORDER: The conference scheduled for 3/17/2020 shall be held via telephone. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call with chambers at 10:45 AM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 3/16/2020. (Mannion, Steven)
March 13, 2020 Filing 33 Letter from Keith J. Murphy. (MURPHY, KEITH)
December 17, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 12/17/2019. Text Order entered scheduling next conference for 3/17/2020 at 2:00 PM (spc, )
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER: A status conference to be held on 3/17/2020 at 2:00 PM before Judge Steve Mannion in courtroom 2B. Lead trial counsel must appear and clients who have settlement authority shall be immediately available by telephone. Confidential settlement positions no longer than five pages should be received by Judge Mannion 8 days before the conference and not filed via ECF. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 12/17/19. (Mannion, Steven)
December 9, 2019 Filing 31 STATUS REPORT by SIRRANO KEITH BALDEO. (KASANOFF, MICHAEL)
September 23, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 9/23/2019. Text Order filed scheduling next conf. for 12/17/2019 at 5 PM (spc, )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER: Fact deposition end is 12/31/19. New defense counsel shall be up to speed prior to the next conference. A telephone conference is scheduled with Judge Mannion on 12/17/2019 at 5:00 pm Plaintiff(s)' counsel is to initiate the call. Eight days before that date, counsel shall file a joint agenda letter (up to 3 pages) itemizing the issues, if any, to be discussed at the upcoming conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 9/23/19. (Mannion, Steven)
September 13, 2019 Filing 29 Letter. (KOPCO, JEFFREY)
July 2, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 7/2/2019. Text Order entered (spc, )
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference is scheduled with Judge Mannion on 9/23/2019 at 5:00 pm Defendant(s)' counsel is to initiate the call. Eight days before that date, counsel shall file a joint agenda letter (up to 3 pages) itemizing the issues, if any, to be discussed at the upcoming conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 7/2/19. (Mannion, Steven)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER: a Telephone Conference is scheduled on 7/2/2019 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Fact Discovery is to remain open through 10/31/2019, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 4/3/2019. (JB, )
April 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Status Conference held on 4/3/2019. Supplemental scheduling order filed. (spc, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 26 STATUS REPORT by MOHAMMED AKHTARUZZAMAN, CITY OF PATERSON, RUBY N COTTON, MARITA DAVILA, MICHAEL JACKSON, JOHN DOES A-Z, SHAHIN KHALIQUE, WILLIAM MCKOY, DOMINGO MENDEZ, KENNETH M MORRIS, JR, ROMINA M PASQUAL, NELLIE POU, ANDRE SAYEGH, LUIS VELEZ. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(KOPCO, JEFFREY)
February 5, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by MOHAMMED AKHTARUZZAMAN, CITY OF PATERSON, RUBY N COTTON, MARITA DAVILA, MICHAEL JACKSON, SHAHIN KHALIQUE, WILLIAM MCKOY, DOMINGO MENDEZ, KENNETH M MORRIS, JR, ROMINA M PASQUAL, NELLIE POU, ANDRE SAYEGH, LUIS VELEZ.(KOPCO, JEFFREY)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER -- A telephone conference is scheduled with Magistrate Judge Mannion on 4/3/2019 at 4:15 pm Defendant(s)' counsel is to initiate the call. Eight days before that date, counsel shall file a joint agenda letter (up to 3 pages) itemizing the issues, if any, to be discussed at the upcoming conference. Three or more business days before that date, counsel shall file an agenda letter(s) (up to 3 pages) itemizing the issues, if any, to be discussed at the upcoming conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 1/23/2019. (spc, )
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by MOHAMMED AKHTARUZZAMAN, CITY OF PATERSON, RUBY N COTTON, MARITA DAVILA, MICHAEL JACKSON, SHAHIN KHALIQUE, WILLIAM MCKOY, DOMINGO MENDEZ, KENNETH M MORRIS, JR, ROMINA M PASQUAL, NELLIE POU, ANDRE SAYEGH, JULIO TAVAREZ, LUIS VELEZ. The motion dismiss the third count (breach of fiduciary duty); fifth count (battery); sixth count (assault); seventh count (civil conspiracy) and eight count (aiding and abetting ) is GRANTED WITH PREJUDICE;, etc., The motion to dismiss Plaintiff Sirrano Keith Baldeo's 1983 and NJCRA is Granted without prejudice as to Defendants Nelli Pou and Romina Pasqual Pascual only, etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 1/18/2019. (JB, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 22 OPINION,. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 1/18/2019. (JB, )
January 17, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Telephone Conference held on 1/17/2019. text order to be entered. (spc, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 21 STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (KASANOFF, MICHAEL)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 1/17/2019 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Fact Discovery due by 12/17/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 1/11/2019. Rule 26 Disclosures due by 11/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 10/25/2018. (dam, )
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Discovery Confidentiality Order. ETC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 10/25/2018. (dam, )
October 25, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Scheduling Conference held on 10/25/2018. Initial scheduling order and DCO filed. (spc, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 18 Joint Discovery Plan by MOHAMMED AKHTARUZZAMAN, CITY OF PATERSON, RUBY N COTTON, MARITA DAVILA, MICHAEL JACKSON, SHAHIN KHALIQUE, WILLIAM MCKOY, DOMINGO MENDEZ, KENNETH M MORRIS, JR, ROMINA M PASQUAL, NELLIE POU, ANDRE SAYEGH, LUIS VELEZ.(MURPHY, KEITH)
October 23, 2018 Please be advised that the Docket Entry #17 text has been corrected to reflect that the request for adjournment was denied. (mfr)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING #16 Parties Joint Letter requesting to adjourn Rule 16 conference set for 10:00 AM on 10/25/2018 until after disposition of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 10/22/2018. (dam, ) Modified on 10/23/2018 (mfr).
October 17, 2018 Filing 16 Letter from Michael S Kasanoff to the Honorable Steven C. Mannion, USMJ RE: Adjourn Rule 16 Conference. (KASANOFF, MICHAEL)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER,scheduling Initial R16 Conference for 10/25/2018 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 9/25/2018. (spc, )
August 13, 2018 Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MOHAMMED AKHTARUZZAMAN, CITY OF PATERSON, RUBY N COTTON, MARITA DAVILA, MICHAEL JACKSON, JOHN DOES A-Z, SHAHIN KHALIQUE, WILLIAM MCKOY, DOMINGO MENDEZ, KENNETH M MORRIS, JR, ROMINA M PASQUAL, NELLIE POU, ANDRE SAYEGH, LUIS VELEZ re #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Certification of Jeffrey A. Kopco, #2 Exhibit 5)(KOPCO, JEFFREY)
July 31, 2018 Filing 13 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael S. Kasanoff, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(KASANOFF, MICHAEL)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #11 Letter request adjourning Defendants' #9 Motion to Dismiss return date to August 20, 2018, etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 07/05/2018. (ek)
July 5, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Motion set for 8/20/2018 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
July 4, 2018 Filing 11 Letter from Michael S Kasanoff re Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,. (KASANOFF, MICHAEL)
June 20, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Motion set for 7/16/2018 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
June 19, 2018 Filing 10 Exhibits to Certification of Jeffrey A. Kopco and Domenick Stampone on behalf of MOHAMMED AKHTARUZZAMAN, CITY OF PATERSON, RUBY N COTTON, MARITA DAVILA, MICHAEL JACKSON, SHAHIN KHALIQUE, WILLIAM MCKOY, DOMINGO MENDEZ, KENNETH M MORRIS, JR, ROMINA M PASQUAL, NELLIE POU, ANDRE SAYEGH, JULIO TAVAREZ, LUIS VELEZ Re #9 Motion to Dismiss,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 to Certication of Jeffrey A. Kopco in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #2 Exhibit 3 to Certication of Jeffrey A. Kopco in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #3 Exhibit 4 to Certication of Jeffrey A. Kopco in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #4 Exhibit A to Certication of Domenick Stampone in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #5 Exhibit B to Certication of Domenick Stampone in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #6 Exhibit C to Certication of Domenick Stampone in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint)(KOPCO, JEFFREY).
June 19, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by MOHAMMED AKHTARUZZAMAN, CITY OF PATERSON, RUBY N COTTON, MARITA DAVILA, MICHAEL JACKSON, SHAHIN KHALIQUE, WILLIAM MCKOY, DOMINGO MENDEZ, KENNETH M MORRIS, JR, ROMINA M PASQUAL, NELLIE POU, ANDRE SAYEGH, JULIO TAVAREZ, LUIS VELEZ. Responses due by 7/2/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #2 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #3 Certification of Jeffrey A. Kopco in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #4 Certification Domenick Stampone in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #5 Certificate of Service for Motion to Dismiss the Complaint)(KOPCO, JEFFREY)
June 5, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by LUIS VELEZ, MICHAEL JACKSON, NELLIE POU, MOHAMMED AKHTARUZZAMAN, MARITA DAVILA, CITY OF PATERSON, KENNETH M MORRIS, JR, SHAHIN KHALIQUE, ROMINA M PASQUAL, DOMINGO MENDEZ, WILLIAM MCKOY, ANDRE SAYEGH, RUBY N COTTON has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 06/19/2018. (ek)
June 4, 2018 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (KOPCO, JEFFREY)
June 4, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH F. LORELL on behalf of MOHAMMED AKHTARUZZAMAN, CITY OF PATERSON, RUBY N COTTON, MARITA DAVILA, MICHAEL JACKSON, SHAHIN KHALIQUE, WILLIAM MCKOY, DOMINGO MENDEZ, KENNETH M MORRIS, JR, ROMINA M PASQUAL, NELLIE POU, ANDRE SAYEGH, LUIS VELEZ (LORELL, ELIZABETH)
June 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH JAMES MURPHY on behalf of MOHAMMED AKHTARUZZAMAN, CITY OF PATERSON, RUBY N COTTON, MARITA DAVILA, MICHAEL JACKSON, SHAHIN KHALIQUE, WILLIAM MCKOY, DOMINGO MENDEZ, KENNETH M MORRIS, JR, ROMINA M PASQUAL, NELLIE POU, ANDRE SAYEGH, LUIS VELEZ (MURPHY, KEITH)
June 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY ALAN KOPCO on behalf of MOHAMMED AKHTARUZZAMAN, CITY OF PATERSON, RUBY N COTTON, MARITA DAVILA, MICHAEL JACKSON, SHAHIN KHALIQUE, WILLIAM MCKOY, DOMINGO MENDEZ, KENNETH M MORRIS, JR, ROMINA M PASQUAL, NELLIE POU, ANDRE SAYEGH, LUIS VELEZ (KOPCO, JEFFREY)
June 4, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY ALAN KOPCO on behalf of MOHAMMED AKHTARUZZAMAN, CITY OF PATERSON, RUBY N COTTON, MARITA DAVILA, MICHAEL JACKSON, SHAHIN KHALIQUE, WILLIAM MCKOY, DOMINGO MENDEZ, KENNETH M MORRIS, JR, ROMINA M PASQUAL, NELLIE POU, ANDRE SAYEGH, LUIS VELEZ (KOPCO, JEFFREY)
June 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY ALAN KOPCO on behalf of MOHAMMED AKHTARUZZAMAN, CITY OF PATERSON, RUBY N COTTON, MARITA DAVILA, MICHAEL JACKSON, SHAHIN KHALIQUE, WILLIAM MCKOY, DOMINGO MENDEZ, KENNETH M MORRIS, JR, ROMINA M PASQUAL, NELLIE POU, ANDRE SAYEGH, LUIS VELEZ (KOPCO, JEFFREY)
April 4, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MOHAMMED AKHTARUZZAMAN, CITY OF PATERSON, RUBY N COTTON, MARITA DAVILA, MICHAEL JACKSON, SHAHIN KHALIQUE, WILLIAM MCKOY, DOMINGO MENDEZ, KENNETH M MORRIS, JR, ROMINA M PASQUAL, NELLIE POU, ANDRE SAYEGH, JULIO TAVAREZ, LUIS VELEZ Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Reilly* (jr)
April 4, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (jr)
April 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8607996) with JURY DEMAND, filed by STACEY BALDEO, SIRRANO KEITH BALDEO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KASANOFF, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BALDEO et al v. CITY OF PATERSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACEY BALDEO
Represented By: MICHAEL S. KASANOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIRRANO KEITH BALDEO
Represented By: MICHAEL S. KASANOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNCILMAN MOHAMMED AKHTARUZZAMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNCILMAN MICHAEL MIKE JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNCILMAN LUIS VELEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNCILWOMAN RUBY N COTTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PATERSON
Represented By: JEFFREY ALAN KOPCO
Represented By: KEITH JAMES MURPHY
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. LORELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNCILWOMAN MARITA DAVILA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNCILMAN KENNETH M MORRIS, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNCILMAN ANDRE SAYEGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY ATTORNEY ROMINA M PASQUAL, ESQ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNCILMAN WILLIAM BILL MCKOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUSINESS ADMINISTRAT NELLIE POU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNCILMAN JULIO TAVAREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNCILMAN SHAHIN KHALIQUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNCILMAN DOMINGO ALEX MENDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOMINGO MENDEZ
Represented By: JEFFREY ALAN KOPCO
Represented By: KEITH JAMES MURPHY
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. LORELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM MCKOY
Represented By: JEFFREY ALAN KOPCO
Represented By: KEITH JAMES MURPHY
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. LORELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL JACKSON
Represented By: JEFFREY ALAN KOPCO
Represented By: KEITH JAMES MURPHY
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. LORELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROMINA M PASQUAL
Represented By: JEFFREY ALAN KOPCO
Represented By: KEITH JAMES MURPHY
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. LORELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS VELEZ
Represented By: JEFFREY ALAN KOPCO
Represented By: KEITH JAMES MURPHY
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. LORELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE
Represented By: JEFFREY ALAN KOPCO
Represented By: KEITH JAMES MURPHY
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. LORELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOHAMMED AKHTARUZZAMAN
Represented By: JEFFREY ALAN KOPCO
Represented By: KEITH JAMES MURPHY
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. LORELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILL
Represented By: JEFFREY ALAN KOPCO
Represented By: KEITH JAMES MURPHY
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. LORELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDRE SAYEGH
Represented By: JEFFREY ALAN KOPCO
Represented By: KEITH JAMES MURPHY
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. LORELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUBY N COTTON
Represented By: JEFFREY ALAN KOPCO
Represented By: KEITH JAMES MURPHY
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. LORELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIO TAVAREZ
Represented By: JEFFREY ALAN KOPCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARITA DAVILA
Represented By: JEFFREY ALAN KOPCO
Represented By: KEITH JAMES MURPHY
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. LORELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NELLIE POU
Represented By: JEFFREY ALAN KOPCO
Represented By: KEITH JAMES MURPHY
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. LORELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAHIN KHALIQUE
Represented By: JEFFREY ALAN KOPCO
Represented By: KEITH JAMES MURPHY
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. LORELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH M MORRIS, JR
Represented By: JEFFREY ALAN KOPCO
Represented By: KEITH JAMES MURPHY
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. LORELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX
Represented By: JEFFREY ALAN KOPCO
Represented By: KEITH JAMES MURPHY
Represented By: ELIZABETH F. LORELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?