NEWARK EDUCATION WORKERS CAUCUS et al v. CITY OF NEWARK, NEW JERSEY et al
Plaintiff: NEWARK EDUCATION WORKERS CAUCUS and NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC.
Defendant: ANDREA ADEBOWALE, RAS BARAKA, CITY OF NEWARK, NEW JERSEY, CATHERINE R MCCABE and NEWARK DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND SEWER UTILITIES
Case Number: 2:2018cv11025
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Essex
Presiding Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2018 Filing 20 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Order to Show Cause . (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
August 24, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #17 MOTION reschedule Rule 16 conference , #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Order to Show Cause. Motion set for 9/17/2018 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
August 24, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Order to Show Cause by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC., NEWARK EDUCATION WORKERS CAUCUS. (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order to Show Cause, #3 Index of Exhibits to Motion for Preliminary Injnction, #4 Declaration of F. Singleton, #5 Declaration of C. Canik, #6 Declaration of D. Carpenter-Gold, #7 Declaration of B. Fenniman, #8 Declaration of N. Gianni, #9 Declaration of D. Giammar, #10 Exhibit to Declaration of D. Giammar, #11 Declaration of N. Haggag, #12 Declaration of Y. Jordan, #13 Declaration of P. Landrigan, #14 Exhibit A-B to Declaration of P. Landrigan, #15 Exhibit C to Declaration of P. Landrigan, #16 Exhibit D-N to Declaration of P. Landrigan, #17 Declaration of L. Mitchelson-Parker, #18 Declaration of A. Moussab, #19 Declaration of B. Rippey, #20 Declaration of G. Trujillo, #21 Declaration of V. Vicino, #22 Declaration of S. Imperiale, #23 Appendix Plaintiffs' Appendix, #24 Certification of Service)(IMPERIALE, SARA)
August 23, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC., NEWARK EDUCATION WORKERS CAUCUS. (Attachments: #1 Certification in Support of PHV Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Application to Appear PHV)(IMPERIALE, SARA)
August 23, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION reschedule Rule 16 conference by ANDREA ADEBOWALE, RAS BARAKA, CITY OF NEWARK, NEW JERSEY, NEWARK DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND SEWER UTILITIES. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MURPHY, MICHAEL)
August 9, 2018 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4C on 9/17/18 at 10:30 AM. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/9/18. (tjg, )
August 8, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Motion set for 9/17/2018 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
August 7, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by CATHERINE R MCCABE. Responses due by 9/4/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(REESE, ANDREW)
August 7, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by ANDREA ADEBOWALE, RAS BARAKA, CITY OF NEWARK, NEW JERSEY, NEWARK DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND SEWER UTILITIES.(MURPHY, MICHAEL)
July 31, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply . Motion set for 8/20/2018 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Defendants' #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading until 8/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/30/2018. (sm)
July 30, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Motion for Extension of Time to File Response #11 submitted by Christine Placide on 7/27/2018 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (sm)
July 30, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Appearance #10 submitted by Christine Placide on 7/27/2018 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC OR SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (sm)
July 28, 2018 Filing 12 Letter from Plaintiffs Requesting Court to Order Defendants to File Responsive Pleading by August 7, 2018 re #11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(IMPERIALE, SARA)
July 27, 2018 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ANDREA ADEBOWALE, RAS BARAKA, CITY OF NEWARK, NEW JERSEY, NEWARK DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND SEWER UTILITIES. (Attachments: #1 Statement Filing Letter, #2 Certification Certification of A. Benjamin, #3 Certification Certification of J. Maraziti, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(PLACIDE, CHRISTINE)
July 27, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE LUCIENNE PLACIDE on behalf of ANDREA ADEBOWALE, RAS BARAKA, CITY OF NEWARK, NEW JERSEY, NEWARK DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND SEWER UTILITIES (PLACIDE, CHRISTINE)
July 24, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, . Motion set for 8/20/2018 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by CATHERINE R MCCABE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(REESE, ANDREW)
July 18, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC., NEWARK EDUCATION WORKERS CAUCUS. CATHERINE R MCCABE served on 7/3/2018, answer due 7/24/2018. (IMPERIALE, SARA)
July 18, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC., NEWARK EDUCATION WORKERS CAUCUS. NEWARK DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND SEWER UTILITIES served on 7/3/2018, answer due 7/24/2018. (IMPERIALE, SARA)
July 18, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC., NEWARK EDUCATION WORKERS CAUCUS. CITY OF NEWARK, NEW JERSEY served on 7/3/2018, answer due 7/24/2018. (IMPERIALE, SARA)
July 18, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC., NEWARK EDUCATION WORKERS CAUCUS. RAS BARAKA served on 7/3/2018, answer due 7/24/2018. (IMPERIALE, SARA)
July 18, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC., NEWARK EDUCATION WORKERS CAUCUS. ANDREA ADEBOWALE served on 7/3/2018, answer due 7/24/2018. (IMPERIALE, SARA)
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANDREA ADEBOWALE, RAS BARAKA, CITY OF NEWARK, NEW JERSEY, CATHERINE R MCCABE, NEWARK DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND SEWER UTILITIES Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Reilly* (jr)
June 26, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC., NEWARK EDUCATION WORKERS CAUCUS. (IMPERIALE, SARA)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREA ADEBOWALE, RAS BARAKA, CITY OF NEWARK, NEW JERSEY, CATHERINE MCCABE, NEWARK DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND SEWER UTILITIES ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8839091), filed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC., NEWARK EDUCATION WORKERS CAUCUS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Intent to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(IMPERIALE, SARA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEWARK EDUCATION WORKERS CAUCUS et al v. CITY OF NEWARK, NEW JERSEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREA ADEBOWALE
Represented By: JOSEPH J. MARAZITI, JR
Represented By: CHRISTINE LUCIENNE PLACIDE
Represented By: MICHAEL GERARD MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAS BARAKA
Represented By: JOSEPH J. MARAZITI, JR
Represented By: CHRISTINE LUCIENNE PLACIDE
Represented By: MICHAEL GERARD MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF NEWARK, NEW JERSEY
Represented By: JOSEPH J. MARAZITI, JR
Represented By: CHRISTINE LUCIENNE PLACIDE
Represented By: MICHAEL GERARD MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHERINE R MCCABE
Represented By: ANDREW D. REESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEWARK DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND SEWER UTILITIES
Represented By: JOSEPH J. MARAZITI, JR
Represented By: CHRISTINE LUCIENNE PLACIDE
Represented By: MICHAEL GERARD MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEWARK EDUCATION WORKERS CAUCUS
Represented By: SARA E. IMPERIALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC.
Represented By: SARA E. IMPERIALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?