OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION v. EPEC POLYMERS, INC. et al

Plaintiff: OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Defendant: EPEC POLYMERS, INC., TRMI-H LLC, WASTE MANAGEMENT, INC., WASTE MANAGEMENT OF NEW JERSEY, INC. and KEWANEE INDUSTRIES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv11634
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Essex
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9613
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule41(a)(l)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 8/8/18. (cm, )
August 4, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
August 2, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by TRMI-H LLC, KEWANEE INDUSTRIES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 08/21/2018. (ek)
August 1, 2018 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to TRMI-H LLC and Kewanee Industries, Inc.. Attorney LOUIS M. DESTEFANO for KEWANEE INDUSTRIES, INC.,LOUIS M. DESTEFANO for TRMI-H LLC added. (DESTEFANO, LOUIS)
July 16, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to EPEC POLYMERS, INC., KEWANEE INDUSTRIES, INC., TRMI-H LLC, WASTE MANAGEMENT, INC., WASTE MANAGEMENT OF NEW JERSEY, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *CHRISTINE MELILLO* (cm, )
July 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES JENNINGS DENNEN on behalf of OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION (DENNEN, CHARLES)
July 16, 2018 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (eu, )
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Pretrial Order REGARDING PROPOSED SCHEDULE AND NOTICE TO PRESERVE DOCUMENTS AND INFORMATION by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION identifying OCCIDENTAL PETROLEUM CORPORATION as Corporate Parent.. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EPEC POLYMERS, INC., KEWANEE INDUSTRIES, INC., TRMI-H LLC, WASTE MANAGEMENT, INC., WASTE MANAGEMENT OF NEW JERSEY, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8882003), filed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION v. EPEC POLYMERS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPEC POLYMERS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRMI-H LLC
Represented By: LOUIS M. DESTEFANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASTE MANAGEMENT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASTE MANAGEMENT OF NEW JERSEY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEWANEE INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: LOUIS M. DESTEFANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN J. MCDERMOTT, III
Represented By: CHARLES JENNINGS DENNEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?