KASSEM v. NIELSON et al
Defendant: ACTING DIRECTOR RONALD D VITIELLO, DIRECTOR THOMAS J. DECKER, ATTORNEY GENERAL JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, DIRECTOR KIRSTJEN NIELSEN and WARDEN ENTITLED RONALD EDWARDS
Petitioner: WAEL KASSEM
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, THOMAS J. DECKER, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN and RONALD EDWARDS
Case Number: 2:2018cv11834
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Hudson
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The letter D.E. #11 submitted by Paul ODwyer on 8/16/18 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (cm, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 11 Letter from Paul J O'Dwyer re #10 MOTION for Reconsideration re #9 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Opinion dismissing petition Notice of Motion. (BASARAN, MELINDA)
August 16, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Reconsideration re #9 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Opinion dismissing petition Notice of Motion. Motion set for 9/17/2018 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cm, )
August 13, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Reconsideration re #9 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Opinion dismissing petition Notice of Motion by WAEL KASSEM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BASARAN, MELINDA)
August 13, 2018 Filing 9 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Opinion dismissing petition by WAEL KASSEM. (BASARAN, MELINDA)
August 2, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, PAUL O'DWYER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ek)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Petition is hereby Dismissed Without Prejudice, Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 is Dismissed as Moot, the Clerk shall serve this Order and the accompanying Memorandum Opinion upon Petitioner and shall Close the file. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 8/1/2018. (sm)
August 1, 2018 Filing 7 OPINION. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 8/1/2018. (sm)
August 1, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Paul O'Dwyer to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BASARAN, MELINDA)
August 1, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated. (sm)
August 1, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for immediate release from custody. Motion set for 9/4/2018 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
August 1, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: as to Paul O'Dwyer, Esq. $ 150, receipt number NEW037064. (sms)
July 31, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for immediate release from custody by WAEL KASSEM. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(BASARAN, MELINDA)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Paul ODwyer, Esq., etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 7/24/18. (cm, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 3 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN terminated. Attorney SUSAN R MILLENKY for THOMAS J. DECKER,SUSAN R MILLENKY for RONALD EDWARDS,SUSAN R MILLENKY for KIRSTJEN NIELSEN,SUSAN R MILLENKY for JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III,SUSAN R MILLENKY for RONALD D VITIELLO added.. (MILLENKY, SUSAN)
July 20, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi. (jr)
July 20, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 8/20/2018 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cm, )
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WAEL KASSEM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BASARAN, MELINDA)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0312-8895138.), filed by WAEL KASSEM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(BASARAN, MELINDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KASSEM v. NIELSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTING DIRECTOR RONALD D VITIELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTOR THOMAS J. DECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTOR KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN ENTITLED RONALD EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WAEL KASSEM
Represented By: MELINDA M. BASARAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO
Represented By: SUSAN R MILLENKY
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III
Represented By: SUSAN R MILLENKY
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THOMAS J. DECKER
Represented By: SUSAN R MILLENKY
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: SUSAN R MILLENKY
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD EDWARDS
Represented By: SUSAN R MILLENKY
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?