DECHAVES et al v. BARRETTA

Plaintiff: FILOMENA DECHAVES and GERVASIO DECHAVES
Defendant: TODD C. BARRETTA
Case Number: 2:2018cv11893
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FILOMENA DECHAVES, GERVASIO DECHAVES re #8 Order, (MCNALLY, STEPHEN)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that, Defendant's opposition to Plaintiffs' motion to remand shall befiled by October 5, 2018. Plaintiffs' reply shall be filed by October 12, 2018; that, Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to serve Defendant with a copy ofthis Order within 3 business days.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 9/11/2018. (ld, )
September 7, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk: Case Management Conference held on 9/7/2018. (CD #ECR.) (LM, )
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that, the IN-PERSON conference before the Undersigned on August 22, 2018, is hereby rescheduled to September 7, 2018, at 2:30 p.m. at the United States Post Office & Courthouse, 1 Federal Square, Newark, New Jersey; that, Plaintiffs are directed to serve Defendant with a copy of thisOrder, by email and overnight mail, within 1 business day.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 8/20/2018. (ld, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FILOMENA DECHAVES, GERVASIO DECHAVES re #3 Emergency MOTION to Remand to Superior Court (MCNALLY, STEPHEN)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that, there shall be an IN-PERSON conference before the Undersigned on August 22, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. at the United States Post Office & Courthouse, 1 Federal Square, Newark, New Jersey; that, Plaintiffs are directed to serve Defendant with a copy of this Order, by email and overnight mail, within 1 business day. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 8/16/2018. (ld, )
August 16, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 Emergency MOTION to Remand to Superior Court. Motion set for 9/17/2018 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Emergency Motion for Remand by FILOMENA DECHAVES, GERVASIO DECHAVES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Emergent Application for Remand)(MCNALLY, STEPHEN)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION to Remand to Superior Court by FILOMENA DECHAVES, GERVASIO DECHAVES. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Remand Pursuant to 28 USC 1452(b) and for Sanctions Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(c), #2 Certification of Documents Previously Filed, #3 Exhibit A to Certification - BK Docket, #4 Exhibit B to Certification - District Court Appeal Docket, #5 Exhibit C to Certification - District Court Removal Docket, #6 Exhibit D - 8-3 Appellate Division AUthorization to File Emergent Motion, #7 Exhibit E - 8-6 Amended Authorization Appellate Division, #8 Exhibit F - Supreme Court Remand to Appellate Division, #9 Exhibit G - 8-10 Appellate division Vacation of Warrant of Removal, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Remanding Case)(MCNALLY, STEPHEN)
July 24, 2018 Filing 2 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TODD C. BARRETTA from NJ Superior Court Law Division, Special Civil Part: Union County, case number UNN LT-L-02229-18., filed by TODD C. BARRETTA.(ld, )
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TODD C. BARRETTA from NJ Superior Court Law Division, Special Civil Part: Union County, case number UNN LT-L-02229-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW036972), filed by TODD C. BARRETTA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ld, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DECHAVES et al v. BARRETTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FILOMENA DECHAVES
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL BRESLIN
Represented By: STEPHEN B. MCNALLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERVASIO DECHAVES
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL BRESLIN
Represented By: STEPHEN B. MCNALLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD C. BARRETTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?