PAISLEY PARK ENTERPRISES, INC. AND COMERICA BANK & TRUST, N.A. AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PRINCE ROGERS NELSON v. DOMAIN CAPITAL, LLC Featured Case

Plaintiff: PAISLEY PARK ENTERPRISES, INC. AND COMERICA BANK & TRUST, N.A. AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PRINCE ROGERS NELSON
Defendant: DOMAIN CAPITAL, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv12044
Filed: July 25, 2018
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Newark Office
County: Bergen
Referring Judge: James B. Clark
Presiding Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAISLEY PARK ENTERPRISES, INC. AND COMERICA BANK & TRUST, N.A. AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PRINCE ROGERS NELSON. DOMAIN CAPITAL, LLC served on 7/26/2018, answer due 8/16/2018. (GANNON, CHRISTINE)
July 26, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by COLLEEN M. MAKER on behalf of PAISLEY PARK ENTERPRISES, INC. AND COMERICA BANK & TRUST, N.A. AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PRINCE ROGERS NELSON (MAKER, COLLEEN)
July 26, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER JOSEPH PIZZI on behalf of PAISLEY PARK ENTERPRISES, INC. AND COMERICA BANK & TRUST, N.A. AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PRINCE ROGERS NELSON (PIZZI, PETER)
July 26, 2018 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DOMAIN CAPITAL, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (byl)
July 26, 2018 3 AO120 Patent Form filed. (byl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2018: # 1 Complaint) (byl, ).
July 25, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, )
July 25, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PAISLEY PARK ENTERPRISES, INC. AND COMERICA BANK & TRUST, N.A. AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PRINCE ROGERS NELSON. (GANNON, CHRISTINE)
July 25, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against DOMAIN CAPITAL, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8907841) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PAISLEY PARK ENTERPRISES, INC. AND COMERICA BANK & TRUST, N.A. AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PRINCE ROGERS NELSON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GANNON, CHRISTINE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAISLEY PARK ENTERPRISES, INC. AND COMERICA BANK & TRUST, N.A. AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PRINCE ROGERS NELSON v. DOMAIN CAPITAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAISLEY PARK ENTERPRISES, INC. AND COMERICA BANK & TRUST, N.A. AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PRINCE ROGERS NELSON
Represented By: CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOMAIN CAPITAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?