PHILLIPS v. ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF NEWARK et al
Plaintiff: SCOTT PHILLIPS
Defendant: ST. THERESA R.C. CHURCH, JOSEPH CAPORASO, JAMES GOODNESS, HELENE GODIN, JOSEPH BEJGROWICZ, RICHARD DONOVAN, MARGARET DAMES, ANH BUI, JOSEPH W. CARDINAL TOBIN, ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF NEWARK, REV. MSGR. THOMAS P. NYDEGGER, ARCHDIOCESE OF NEWARK, JAMES PAVLIK, BEEZLEBROX, MSGR. NYDEGGER, ROSEMARY RUBSAM, JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-5, ST. THERESA SCHOOL, MARIA BUI, JULIETT PEREZ, MANUEL VAGUEIRO, WANDA GRIMALDI, EILEEN KELLY-O'BRIEN, MARY GAINES, JOHN DOES 1-100, JO ANN NETTA, ROCIO CORVALAN, BSCH9094, THOMAS BRACKEN, Mrs Patricia Rimili Blicharz, ALICE SCALA, TRISH RICKEN, IZAIDA ROSA GARBANZO, ROBERT GRIMALDI, ANN MORTIMER, SUSAN GIORDINO, GUILLERMO MUNOZ, JONATHON KREINBERG, KAREN ZIMMERMAN, JEANNIE PAVLIK, MICHELLE CERNADAS, JIM HANNON, KATHLEEN SPOONAUER, MICHAEL DEVLIN, VICTORIA DEVLIN, ANN FERRARI, AMY ROSE, ST. THERESA CHURCH, NANCY ZIMMERMAN, KELLY DONOVAN, BLANCA PASTORE, CYNTHIA GAILLIOT, JOSEPH KRATZER, JR., DEBORAH ` GIVENS-MATE, RICHARD LNU, EMILY VIDAL, FRED SOOS, AMY REITHEL, MATTHEW PAVLIK, JESSICA LNU, BONNY HOTRA, PETER RUNFOLO, PATRICIA RIMILI BLICHARZ, ROGER SCHUR, HEATHER ST JOHN, PATRICIA LANDAU, BERNADINE GILRAINE, NATALIE WOOD, JEFF FERRARI, ROSANELLY MONTALVO, STDA, LAURI GRIMES, JO RIVERA, CHERYL KREINBERG, NICHOLAS MIRABELLA, THERESA ADUBATO, YANCY MUNOZ, JOCELYN EDRALIN, CHRISTINA RESTUCCIA, WILLIAM GORSKI, ROGER STRYESKI, MICHAEL MONTALVO, ANDREA ZAGORSKI-SCHUSTER, MARY FERRIS, MARIA STREKO, MARYANN GASPER, AMBER PROTZ SIERANT, RICH HARRINGTON, HEATHER INGERSON, JOSEPH LNU, CELIA SOUSA, MAKAYLA KOSKI, MARIA HARRIS, ROSEANNE SCHUR, MICHELE MILLER, GERRI COLON, SUSAN DOUGHERTY, ANGELA LOMBARDI, LINDA KOSKI, MATT POPOLA, CARDINAL JOSEPH TOBIN, KERRI KILLEN, JOYCE RUNFOLO and KELLY ANN HARRIS
Case Number: 2:2018cv12207
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Essex
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
September 26, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/15/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 31 Letter from Christopher H. Westrick, Esq.. (WESTRICK, CHRISTOPHER)
September 21, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss by MICHELE MILLER. Responses due by 10/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MUFTAU, MOSHOOD)
September 21, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by MOSHOOD MUFTAU on behalf of MICHELE MILLER (MUFTAU, MOSHOOD)
September 21, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN H. FENLON on behalf of ARCHDIOCESE OF NEWARK, JOSEPH BEJGROWICZ, ANH BUI, JOSEPH CAPORASO, MARGARET DAMES, RICHARD DONOVAN, HELENE GODIN, JAMES GOODNESS, NYDEGGER, ST. THERESA CHURCH, ST. THERESA SCHOOL, JOSEPH TOBIN, JOSEPH W. CARDINAL TOBIN (FENLON, BRIAN)
September 20, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #23 First MOTION to Dismiss or Summary Judgment, #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs'Complaint, #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Motion set for 10/29/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 LETTER ORDER Granting Letter from Plaintiffs requesting an adjournment with respect to the three motions to dismiss to 10/29/2018, etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 9/20/2018. (JB, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss by TRISH RICKEN. Responses due by 10/1/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Certificate of Service, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(PYLE, THOMAS)
September 18, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by JILL ALYSON MUCERINO on behalf of ROGER SCHUR, ROSEANNE SCHUR (MUCERINO, JILL)
September 13, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #23 First MOTION to Dismiss or Summary Judgment. Motion set for 10/15/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
September 12, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by JILL ALYSON MUCERINO on behalf of JOCELYN EDRALIN (MUCERINO, JILL)
September 11, 2018 Filing 23 First MOTION to Dismiss or Summary Judgment by MARIA BUI, GERRI COLON, ROCIO CORVALAN, MICHAEL DEVLIN, VICTORIA DEVLIN, KELLY DONOVAN, ANN FERRARI, JEFF FERRARI, CYNTHIA GAILLIOT, IZAIDA ROSA GARBANZO, MARYANN GASPER, RICH HARRINGTON, BONNY HOTRA, EILEEN KELLY-O'BRIEN, JOSEPH KRATZER, JR, CHERYL KREINBERG, JONATHON KREINBERG, MICHAEL MONTALVO, ANN MORTIMER, JO ANN NETTA, MATT POPOLA, CELIA SOUSA, KATHLEEN SPOONAUER, MARIA STREKO, MANUEL VAGUEIRO, NANCY ZIMMERMAN. Responses due by 10/1/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief NonChurch Def Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibt B, #5 Exhibit Exhibt C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E)(MAGORY, VALLERIE)
September 11, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs'Complaint. Motion set for 10/15/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs'Complaint by THERESA ADUBATO, ROBERT GRIMALDI, WANDA GRIMALDI, JIM HANNON, MARIA HARRIS, HEATHER INGERSON, LINDA KOSKI, MAKAYLA KOSKI, JOYCE RUNFOLO, PETER RUNFOLO, AMBER PROTZ SIERANT. Responses due by 10/15/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration Declaration of Counsel in Suppport of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(MUCERINO, JILL)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER - The Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2018 is adjourned pending the resolution of the Motion to Dismiss, ECF 17.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/10/2018. (kd)
September 10, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by JILL ALYSON MUCERINO on behalf of MICHELLE CERNADAS, MARY FERRIS (MUCERINO, JILL)
September 10, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #19 Stipulation and Order submitted by TRISH RICKEN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/21/2018. (JB, )
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER, that Defendant Trish Ricken Plummer should answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before Friday 9/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/10/2018. (JB, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by TRISH RICKEN. (PYLE, THOMAS)
September 5, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Motion set for 10/1/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by ARCHDIOCESE OF NEWARK, JOSEPH BEJGROWICZ, ANH BUI, JOSEPH CAPORASO, MARGARET DAMES, RICHARD DONOVAN, HELENE GODIN, JAMES GOODNESS, NYDEGGER, ST. THERESA CHURCH, ST. THERESA SCHOOL, JOSEPH TOBIN, JOSEPH W. CARDINAL TOBIN. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Brian H. Fenlon, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M)(WESTRICK, CHRISTOPHER)
August 30, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #15 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by JIM HANNON has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/19/2018. (JB, )
August 30, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #14 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MAKAYLA KOSKI, AMBER PROTZ SIERANT, LINDA KOSKI has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/12/2018. (JB, )
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/15/2018 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/30/2018. (kd)
August 29, 2018 Filing 15 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Jim Hannon.. (MUCERINO, JILL)
August 29, 2018 Filing 14 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Amber Protz Sierant, Linda Koski and Makayla Koski.. (MUCERINO, JILL)
August 29, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by JILL ALYSON MUCERINO on behalf of THERESA ADUBATO, JIM HANNON, LINDA KOSKI, MAKAYLA KOSKI, AMBER PROTZ (MUCERINO, JILL)
August 29, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against Patricia Rimili Blicharz by Patricia Rimili Blicharz.(HOOD, WILLIAM)
August 29, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by HEATHER INGERSON, ROBERT GRIMALDI, WANDA GRIMALDI has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/8/2018. (JB, )
August 29, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PETER RUNFOLO, JOYCE RUNFOLO has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/8/2018. (JB, )
August 29, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MARIA HARRIS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/8/2018. (JB, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 11 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Heather Ingerson, Wanda Grimaldi and Robert Grimaldi.. (MUCERINO, JILL)
August 28, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JILL ALYSON MUCERINO on behalf of ROBERT GRIMALDI, WANDA GRIMALDI, HEATHER INGERSON (MUCERINO, JILL)
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS J. PYLE, JR on behalf of TRISH RICKEN (PYLE, THOMAS)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Joyce Runfolo and Peter Runfolo.. (MUCERINO, JILL)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JILL ALYSON MUCERINO on behalf of JOYCE RUNFOLO, PETER RUNFOLO (MUCERINO, JILL)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Maria Harris.. (MUCERINO, JILL)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JILL ALYSON MUCERINO on behalf of MARIA HARRIS (MUCERINO, JILL)
August 23, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information, When entering parties for a case ALL parties must be added not just the ones the attorney represents. . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (fp, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN VINCENT KELLY on behalf of All Defendants (KELLY, JOHN)
August 6, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ANH BUI has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/2/2018. (JB, )
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to plaintiff's complaint.. (WESTRICK, CHRISTOPHER)
July 31, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF NEWARK, ST. THERESA R.C. CHURCH. (WESTRICK, CHRISTOPHER)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by REV. MSGR. THOMAS P. NYDEGGER, HELENE GODIN, MARGARET DAMES, JOSEPH BEJGROWICZ, ST. THERESA R.C. CHURCH, RICHARD DONOVAN, JAMES GOODNESS, ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF NEWARK, ANH BUI, JOSEPH CAPORASO, JOSEPH W. CARDINAL TOBIN from Superior Court of Essex County, case number ESX L 4612 18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8918432), filed by REV. MSGR. THOMAS P. NYDEGGER, HELENE GODIN, MARGARET DAMES, JOSEPH BEJGROWICZ, ST. THERESA R.C. CHURCH, RICHARD DONOVAN, JAMES GOODNESS, ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF NEWARK, ANH BUI, JOSEPH CAPORASO, JOSEPH W. CARDINAL TOBIN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(WESTRICK, CHRISTOPHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHILLIPS v. ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF NEWARK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. THERESA R.C. CHURCH
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER H. WESTRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH CAPORASO
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER H. WESTRICK
Represented By: BRIAN H. FENLON
Represented By: JOHN VINCENT KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES GOODNESS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER H. WESTRICK
Represented By: BRIAN H. FENLON
Represented By: JOHN VINCENT KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HELENE GODIN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER H. WESTRICK
Represented By: BRIAN H. FENLON
Represented By: JOHN VINCENT KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH BEJGROWICZ
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER H. WESTRICK
Represented By: BRIAN H. FENLON
Represented By: JOHN VINCENT KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD DONOVAN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER H. WESTRICK
Represented By: BRIAN H. FENLON
Represented By: JOHN VINCENT KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGARET DAMES
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER H. WESTRICK
Represented By: BRIAN H. FENLON
Represented By: JOHN VINCENT KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANH BUI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER H. WESTRICK
Represented By: BRIAN H. FENLON
Represented By: JOHN VINCENT KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH W. CARDINAL TOBIN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER H. WESTRICK
Represented By: BRIAN H. FENLON
Represented By: JOHN VINCENT KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF NEWARK
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER H. WESTRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REV. MSGR. THOMAS P. NYDEGGER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER H. WESTRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCHDIOCESE OF NEWARK
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER H. WESTRICK
Represented By: BRIAN H. FENLON
Represented By: JOHN VINCENT KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES PAVLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEEZLEBROX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSGR. NYDEGGER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER H. WESTRICK
Represented By: BRIAN H. FENLON
Represented By: JOHN VINCENT KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSEMARY RUBSAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. THERESA SCHOOL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER H. WESTRICK
Represented By: BRIAN H. FENLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA BUI
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIETT PEREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANUEL VAGUEIRO
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WANDA GRIMALDI
Represented By: JILL ALYSON MUCERINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EILEEN KELLY-O'BRIEN
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY GAINES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JO ANN NETTA
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCIO CORVALAN
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSCH9094
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS BRACKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs Patricia Rimili Blicharz
Represented By: WILLIAM C. HOOD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALICE SCALA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRISH RICKEN
Represented By: THOMAS J. PYLE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IZAIDA ROSA GARBANZO
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT GRIMALDI
Represented By: JILL ALYSON MUCERINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANN MORTIMER
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN GIORDINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUILLERMO MUNOZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHON KREINBERG
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN ZIMMERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEANNIE PAVLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE CERNADAS
Represented By: JILL ALYSON MUCERINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIM HANNON
Represented By: JILL ALYSON MUCERINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN SPOONAUER
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL DEVLIN
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTORIA DEVLIN
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANN FERRARI
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY ROSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. THERESA CHURCH
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER H. WESTRICK
Represented By: BRIAN H. FENLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY ZIMMERMAN
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY DONOVAN
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLANCA PASTORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYNTHIA GAILLIOT
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH KRATZER, JR.
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH ` GIVENS-MATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMILY VIDAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRED SOOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY REITHEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW PAVLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSICA LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BONNY HOTRA
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER RUNFOLO
Represented By: JILL ALYSON MUCERINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICIA RIMILI BLICHARZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER SCHUR
Represented By: JILL ALYSON MUCERINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER ST JOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICIA LANDAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERNADINE GILRAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATALIE WOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF FERRARI
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSANELLY MONTALVO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURI GRIMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JO RIVERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERYL KREINBERG
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICHOLAS MIRABELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THERESA ADUBATO
Represented By: JILL ALYSON MUCERINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YANCY MUNOZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOCELYN EDRALIN
Represented By: JILL ALYSON MUCERINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINA RESTUCCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM GORSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER STRYESKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL MONTALVO
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREA ZAGORSKI-SCHUSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY FERRIS
Represented By: JILL ALYSON MUCERINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA STREKO
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARYANN GASPER
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMBER PROTZ SIERANT
Represented By: JILL ALYSON MUCERINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICH HARRINGTON
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER INGERSON
Represented By: JILL ALYSON MUCERINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CELIA SOUSA
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAKAYLA KOSKI
Represented By: JILL ALYSON MUCERINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA HARRIS
Represented By: JILL ALYSON MUCERINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSEANNE SCHUR
Represented By: JILL ALYSON MUCERINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELE MILLER
Represented By: MOSHOOD MUFTAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERRI COLON
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN DOUGHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELA LOMBARDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA KOSKI
Represented By: JILL ALYSON MUCERINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATT POPOLA
Represented By: VALLERIE V. MAGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARDINAL JOSEPH TOBIN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER H. WESTRICK
Represented By: BRIAN H. FENLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KERRI KILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOYCE RUNFOLO
Represented By: JILL ALYSON MUCERINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY ANN HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT PHILLIPS
Represented By: SUSAN B. MCCREA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?