UNITED STATES v. GOLD
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES
Defendant: allen b gold
Case Number: 2:2018cv12624
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Atlantic
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3731
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #4 Stipulation and Order submitted by ALLEN B GOLD has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/18/18. (cm, )
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Defendant an extension of time to file a response to the complaint until 10/18/18, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 9/28/18. (cm, )
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATION and Order regarding Defendant Allen B. Gold's Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by ALLEN B GOLD. (SAPINSKI, RICHARD)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALLEN B GOLD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cm, )
August 10, 2018 Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion added. (eu, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against allen b gold, filed by UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(NASH, ANN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES v. GOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: allen b gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES
Represented By: ANN ELIZABETH NASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?