MCGUINNESS v. SILGAN CONTAINERS et al
Plaintiff: KEVIN MCGUINNESS
Defendant: SILGAN CONTAINERS, SILGAN CONTAINERS, LLC, SILGAN CONTAINERS MANUFACTURING CORPORATION, SILGAN HOLDINGS, INC. and SILGAN CONTAINERS CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv12861
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4C on 10/22/18 at 10:45am. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/6/18. (tjg, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZA LYNN LLOYD on behalf of SILGAN CONTAINERS, SILGAN CONTAINERS CORPORATION, SILGAN CONTAINERS MANUFACTURING CORPORATION, SILGAN CONTAINERS, LLC, SILGAN HOLDINGS, INC. (LLOYD, ELIZA)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by SILGAN CONTAINERS, SILGAN CONTAINERS CORPORATION, SILGAN CONTAINERS MANUFACTURING CORPORATION, SILGAN CONTAINERS, LLC, SILGAN HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ANDERS, BRETT)
September 4, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SILGAN HOLDINGS, INC., SILGAN CONTAINERS, LLC, SILGAN CONTAINERS CORPORATION, SILGAN CONTAINERS, SILGAN CONTAINERS MANUFACTURING CORPORATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 09/06/2018. (sms)
August 16, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SILGAN CONTAINERS, SILGAN CONTAINERS CORPORATION, SILGAN CONTAINERS MANUFACTURING CORPORATION, SILGAN CONTAINERS, LLC, SILGAN HOLDINGS, INC.. (ANDERS, BRETT)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants.. (ANDERS, BRETT)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SILGAN HOLDINGS, INC., SILGAN CONTAINERS, LLC, SILGAN CONTAINERS CORPORATION, SILGAN CONTAINERS, SILGAN CONTAINERS MANUFACTURING CORPORATION from Superior Court of Middlesex County, case number MID-L-4225-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8958993), filed by SILGAN HOLDINGS, INC., SILGAN CONTAINERS, LLC, SILGAN CONTAINERS CORPORATION, SILGAN CONTAINERS, SILGAN CONTAINERS MANUFACTURING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Compliance, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(ANDERS, BRETT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCGUINNESS v. SILGAN CONTAINERS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SILGAN CONTAINERS
Represented By: BRETT M. ANDERS
Represented By: ELIZA LYNN LLOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SILGAN CONTAINERS, LLC
Represented By: BRETT M. ANDERS
Represented By: ELIZA LYNN LLOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SILGAN CONTAINERS MANUFACTURING CORPORATION
Represented By: BRETT M. ANDERS
Represented By: ELIZA LYNN LLOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SILGAN HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: BRETT M. ANDERS
Represented By: ELIZA LYNN LLOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SILGAN CONTAINERS CORPORATION
Represented By: BRETT M. ANDERS
Represented By: ELIZA LYNN LLOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN MCGUINNESS
Represented By: CHARLES Z. SCHALK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?