UNITED STATES et al v. Lienhardt et al
Plaintiff: Kathryn Lienhardt
Defendant: Steve's Lawn & Landscaping, Steven Lienhardt, STEVE'S LANDSCAPING AND IRRIGATION, JOHN DOES 1-10, LAWNX and ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
3Rd Party Plaintiff: ERIK FRANKLIN, 47 PAWNEE LLC, DENBROOK LANDSCAPING LLC and LAWNX LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF TAXATION and UNITED STATES
Case Number: 2:2018cv12936
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Atlantic
Presiding Judge: Jose L Linares
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: At the request of the parties (DE 6), the initial conference scheduled for 10/16/18 (DE 3) will take place by telephone. Parties may reach chambers at (973) 776-7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/15/18. (tjg, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 APPLICATION/PETITION for cancellation of case conference (Jointly Submitted) for by UNITED STATES. (KUMAR, NISHANT)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 Joint Discovery Plan by UNITED STATES.(KUMAR, NISHANT)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, State Court filings submitted by UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 State Ct. filing: Order to Show Cause (4/16/18), #2 State Ct. filing: Answer and Counterclaim (5/15/18), #3 State Ct. filing: Letter (5/3/18), #4 State Ct. filing: Letter (5/4/18), #5 State Ct. filing: Stipulation (7/18/18), #6 State Ct. filing: Affidavit of Service (5/15/18), #7 State Ct. filing: Letter (6/8/18), #8 State Ct. filing: Letter (6/12/18), #9 State Ct. filing: Affidavit of Service (6/13/18), #10 State Ct. filing: Case Management Order (7/31/18), #11 State Ct. filing: Answer (7/31/18), #12 State Ct. filing: Letter re Removal (8-10-18), #13 State Ct. filing: Case Management Order (8/14/18), #14 State Ct. filing: Letter re Removal (8-17-18), #15 State Court filed-copy of Notice of Removal (stamped 9/5/18))(KUMAR, NISHANT)
August 28, 2018 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4C on 10/16/18 at 10:30 AM. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/28/18. (tjg, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against STEVE'S LAWN & LANDSCAPING, STEVE'S LANDSCAPING AND IRRIGATION, 47 PAWNEE LLC, LAWNX LLC, Steven Lienhardt, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, DENBROOK LANDSCAPING LLC, NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF TAXATION, LAWNX, JOHN DOES 1-10, ERIK FRANKLIN, COUNTERCLAIM against Kathryn Lienhardt by UNITED STATES.(KUMAR, NISHANT)
August 17, 2018 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Jose L. Linares and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED STATES from Superior Court of New Jersey, Morris County, case number C-38-18., filed by UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(KUMAR, NISHANT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2018: #3 Complaint) (ak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES et al v. Lienhardt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Lienhardt
Represented By: MARK JOSEPH BRANCATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: ERIK FRANKLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: 47 PAWNEE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: DENBROOK LANDSCAPING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: LAWNX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF TAXATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: UNITED STATES
Represented By: NISHANT KUMAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve's Lawn & Landscaping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Lienhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE'S LANDSCAPING AND IRRIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWNX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?