CLEMENTE v. PORT AUTHORITY TRANS HUDSON CORP.
Plaintiff: Ronald Clemente
Defendant: PORT AUTHORITY TRANS HUDSON CORP.
Case Number: 2:2018cv13070
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by PORT AUTHORITY TRANS HUDSON CORP..(MINO, NICHOLAS)
September 14, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #5 Letter submitted by PORT AUTHORITY TRANS HUDSON CORP. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/19/2018. (ek)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendant's time to answer to the complaint to and including October 19, 2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 09/13/2018. (ek)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 Letter from Andres J. Castillo, Esq. to Honorable Susan D. Wigenton Requesting Extension of Time to Respond re #1 Complaint. (CASTILLO, ANDRES)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDRES JOSE CASTILLO on behalf of PORT AUTHORITY TRANS HUDSON CORP. (CASTILLO, ANDRES)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RONALD CLEMENTE. PORT AUTHORITY TRANS HUDSON CORP. served on 8/29/2018, answer due 9/19/2018. (WIETZKE, MARC)
August 22, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PORT AUTHORITY TRANS HUDSON CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
August 22, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PORT AUTHORITY TRANS HUDSON CORP. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8971022) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Ronald Clemente. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(WIETZKE, MARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLEMENTE v. PORT AUTHORITY TRANS HUDSON CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Clemente
Represented By: MARC T. WIETZKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORT AUTHORITY TRANS HUDSON CORP.
Represented By: ANDRES JOSE CASTILLO
Represented By: NICHOLAS MINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?