THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC. v. UTICA NATIONAL INSURANCE GROUP
Plaintiff: THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC.
Defendant: UTICA NATIONAL INSURANCE GROUP, JOHN DOES 1-10 and ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Case Number: 2:2018cv13436
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: Jose L Linares
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the Plaintiff is granted leave to reinstitute these claims in the appropriate state court within 30 days of entry of this Order. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 9/17/18. (cm, )
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON BROUK on behalf of UTICA NATIONAL INSURANCE GROUP (BROUK, AARON)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC.. UTICA NATIONAL INSURANCE GROUP waiver sent on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (ABRAMS, SETH)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH ALAN ABRAMS on behalf of THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC. (ABRAMS, SETH)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to UTICA NATIONAL INSURANCE GROUP. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cm, )
August 31, 2018 Chief Judge Jose L. Linares and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (eu, )
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8993777), filed by THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC..(BLACKWELL, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC. v. UTICA NATIONAL INSURANCE GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: DAVID M. BLACKWELL
Represented By: SETH ALAN ABRAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTICA NATIONAL INSURANCE GROUP
Represented By: AARON BROUK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?