WILSON v. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Wanda Wilson
Defendant: Jane and John Does 1-10, XYZ ENTITIES 1 TO 10, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. and James Dimon
Case Number: 2:2018cv13789
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Plaintiff's Letter re Resetting Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R. Civ.P. 12(b)(6). Motion reset for 12/3/2018 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 10/30/2018. (dam, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 12 Letter from Counsel for Plaintiff. (NIEDWESKE, LINDA)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Plaintiff's Letter requesting Adjournment of #9 Motion to Dismiss from 11/5/2018 to 11/19/2018. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 10/12/2018. (dam, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 10 Letter from Counsel for Plaintiff re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R. Civ.P. 12(b)(6). (NIEDWESKE, LINDA)
October 3, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R. Civ.P. 12(b)(6). Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
October 3, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, GRACE E. SPEIGHTS, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dam, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R. Civ.P. 12(b)(6) by JAMES DIMON, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(RANJO, JASON)
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Grace E. Speights to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9066455.) (RANJO, JASON)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Grace E. Speights, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 9/26/2018. (dam, )
September 27, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Grace E. Speights. Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Grace E. Speights by JAMES DIMON, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jason J. Ranjo in support of application of Grace E. Speights to appear pro hac vice, #2 Certification of Grace E. Speights in support of her application, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(RANJO, JASON)
September 13, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by JAMES DIMON, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/02/2018. (ek)
September 12, 2018 Case assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by TERRY DAVON JOHNSON on behalf of James Dimon, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (JOHNSON, TERRY)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (RANJO, JASON)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. identifying JP Morgan Chase & Co. as Corporate Parent.. (RANJO, JASON)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Information Cover Sheet by James Dimon, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (RANJO, JASON)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James Dimon, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Essex County, case number L-005407-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9016313), filed by James Dimon, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(RANJO, JASON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILSON v. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ ENTITIES 1 TO 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: JASON JOSEPH RANJO
Represented By: TERRY DAVON JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dimon
Represented By: JASON JOSEPH RANJO
Represented By: TERRY DAVON JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Wilson
Represented By: LINDA JEAN NIEDWESKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?