BURGOS v. JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: MARIEL BURGOS
Defendant: JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION, "JANE JOE 1-5", "JOHN DOE 1-5", "MARY MOE" A/K/A "ASTRID" AN EMPLOYEE OF JETBLUE AIRWAYS, "ABC COMPANY 1-5", "DEF COMPANY 1-5", "SALLY SOE" A/K/A "DOMINIQUE" AN EMPLOYEE OF JETBLUE AIRWAYS, "RON ROE" A/K/A "JAKE" AN EMPLOYEE OF JETBLUE AIRWAYS, ANA J. GALARZA, JOHN DOE 1-5, RON ROE, JANE JOE 1-5, SALLY SOE, MARY MOE, DEF COMPANY 1-5 and ABC COMPANY 1-5
Case Number: 2:2018cv13861
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/27/2018 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 10/18/18. (LM, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION.(FANNING, EDWARD)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH TAGRIT TREMER on behalf of JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION (TREMER, SARAH)
September 18, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/04/2018. (sms)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant JetBlue Airways Corporation.. (FANNING, EDWARD)
September 14, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
September 14, 2018 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. (jr)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (FANNING, EDWARD)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION from Superior Court of NJ, Law Div., Bergen County, case number BER-L-4775-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9021790), filed by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Statement of Filing and Service, #3 Notice to State Court of Removal, #4 Notice to Adversary of Removal, #5 Letter to Clerk)(FANNING, EDWARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURGOS v. JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIEL BURGOS
Represented By: ROSEMARIE ARNOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION
Represented By: EDWARD J. FANNING, JR.
Represented By: SARAH TAGRIT TREMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "JANE JOE 1-5"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "JOHN DOE 1-5"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "MARY MOE" A/K/A "ASTRID" AN EMPLOYEE OF JETBLUE AIRWAYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "ABC COMPANY 1-5"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "DEF COMPANY 1-5"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "SALLY SOE" A/K/A "DOMINIQUE" AN EMPLOYEE OF JETBLUE AIRWAYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "RON ROE" A/K/A "JAKE" AN EMPLOYEE OF JETBLUE AIRWAYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANA J. GALARZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RON ROE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE JOE 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALLY SOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY MOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF COMPANY 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC COMPANY 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?