INVACARE CORPORATION et al v. BIG APPLE BUYING GROUPS INC et al

Plaintiff: INVACARE CREDIT CORPORATION, and INVACARE CORPORATION
Defendant: BIG APPLE BUYING GROUPS INC D/B/A BIG APPLE SUPPLIES, BIG APPLE BUYING GROUP CORP. D/B/A BIG APPLE SUPPLIES, BIG APPLE BUYING GROUP CORP. and BIG APPLE BUYING GROUPS INC
Case Number: 2:2018cv13911
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: New Jersey District Court
0 Judge: Mark Falk
1 Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by INVACARE CORPORATION, INVACARE CREDIT CORPORATION,. BIG APPLE BUYING GROUP CORP. served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (LEVIN, SCOTT)
October 11, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by INVACARE CORPORATION, INVACARE CREDIT CORPORATION,. BIG APPLE BUYING GROUPS INC served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (LEVIN, SCOTT)
September 15, 2018 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BIG APPLE BUYING GROUP CORP., BIG APPLE BUYING GROUPS INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
September 15, 2018 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. (jr)
September 15, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Guide to Searching and Entering Parties at http://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/PartyNameGuideforAttorneys.pdf. (jr)
September 14, 2018 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by INVACARE CORPORATION, INVACARE CREDIT CORPORATION, as to BIG APPLE BUYING GROUP CORP. D/B/A BIG APPLE SUPPLIES, BIG APPLE BUYING GROUPS INC D/B/A BIG APPLE SUPPLIES. (LEVIN, SCOTT)
September 14, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INVACARE CORPORATION, INVACARE CREDIT CORPORATION, identifying Invacare Corporation and Invacare Credit Corporation do not have any parent corporations and/or publicly held corporations that own 10% or more of their stock as Corporate Parent.. (LEVIN, SCOTT)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against BIG APPLE BUYING GROUP CORP. D/B/A BIG APPLE SUPPLIES, BIG APPLE BUYING GROUPS INC D/B/A BIG APPLE SUPPLIES ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9025915), filed by INVACARE CORPORATION, INVACARE CREDIT CORPORATION,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LEVIN, SCOTT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INVACARE CORPORATION et al v. BIG APPLE BUYING GROUPS INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INVACARE CREDIT CORPORATION,
Represented By: SCOTT AARON LEVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INVACARE CORPORATION
Represented By: SCOTT AARON LEVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIG APPLE BUYING GROUPS INC D/B/A BIG APPLE SUPPLIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIG APPLE BUYING GROUP CORP. D/B/A BIG APPLE SUPPLIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIG APPLE BUYING GROUP CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIG APPLE BUYING GROUPS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?