ELFAR v. MERCADO et al

Plaintiff: RONALD N ELFAR
Defendant: ABC CO. 1-10 (FICTITIOUSLY NAMED), JOEY MERCADO, PACE MOTOR LINES, INC. and JOHN DOE 1-10 (FICTITIOUSLY NAMED)
Case Number: 2:2018cv13951
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: New Jersey District Court
0 Judge: Cathy L Waldor
1 Judge: William H Walls
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - RONALD N ELFAR has designated as confidential materials and restricted access to the (Notice of Appearance of AMIT DESHMUKH filed on 10/23/2108. The document was filed under seal in error and has been unsealed. (mfr)
October 23, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by AMIT DESHMUKH on behalf of RONALD N ELFAR (Attachments: #1 Supplement substitution for plaintiff's prior attorney)(DESHMUKH, AMIT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 9, 2018 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
October 9, 2018 6 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4C on 11/16/18 at 9:45am. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/9/18. (tjg, )
October 8, 2018 5 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against ABC CO. 1-10 (FICTITIOUSLY NAMED), JOHN DOE 1-10 (FICTITIOUSLY NAMED) by PACE MOTOR LINES, INC., JOEY MERCADO.(BORDENS, EMILY)
September 18, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PACE MOTOR LINES, INC., JOEY MERCADO has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/08/2018. (sms)
September 18, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (eu, )
September 18, 2018 Judge William H. Walls and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (eu, )
September 17, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by EMILY JANE BORDENS on behalf of JOEY MERCADO, PACE MOTOR LINES, INC. (BORDENS, EMILY)
September 17, 2018 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Extension of Time to Answer.. (DOBBS, MARYJANE)
September 17, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PACE MOTOR LINES, INC. identifying none as Corporate Parent.. (DOBBS, MARYJANE)
September 17, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PACE MOTOR LINES, INC., JOEY MERCADO from Superior Court of New Jersey, Passaic County, case number PAS-L-002833-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9028749), filed by PACE MOTOR LINES, INC., JOEY MERCADO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DOBBS, MARYJANE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELFAR v. MERCADO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CO. 1-10 (FICTITIOUSLY NAMED)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOEY MERCADO
Represented By: EMILY JANE BORDENS
Represented By: MARYJANE MCNICHOLAS DOBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACE MOTOR LINES, INC.
Represented By: EMILY JANE BORDENS
Represented By: MARYJANE MCNICHOLAS DOBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-10 (FICTITIOUSLY NAMED)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD N ELFAR
Represented By: AMIT DESHMUKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?