ADVANCED PHYSICAL THERAPY & SPINE CARE, LLC et al v. UNITED AIRLINES INC. et al
Plaintiff: JESSE HARRIS, ADVANCED PHYSICAL THERAPY & SPINE CARE, LLC and JESSE B. HARRIS
Defendant: AETNA, UNITED AIRLINES INC., JOHN DOES 1-10 and ABC CORPS. 1-10
Case Number: 2:2018cv14031
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ADVANCED PHYSICAL THERAPY & SPINE CARE, LLC, JESSE B. HARRIS. UNITED AIRLINES INC. served on 10/1/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (COCCA, ANTHONY)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ADVANCED PHYSICAL THERAPY & SPINE CARE, LLC, JESSE B. HARRIS. AETNA served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (COCCA, ANTHONY)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre for all further proceedings. Judge William H. Walls, Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/18/18. (ak, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by AETNA, UNITED AIRLINES INC..(KELLY, PAUL)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AETNA, UNITED AIRLINES INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (byl)
September 20, 2018 Judge William H. Walls and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (eu, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9035192) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ADVANCED PHYSICAL THERAPY & SPINE CARE, LLC.(COCCA, ANTHONY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADVANCED PHYSICAL THERAPY & SPINE CARE, LLC et al v. UNITED AIRLINES INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVANCED PHYSICAL THERAPY & SPINE CARE, LLC
Represented By: ANTHONY COCCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE B. HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA
Represented By: PAUL D. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED AIRLINES INC.
Represented By: PAUL D. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?