PROVIDENT BANK v. ITRIA VENTURES LLC et al
Plaintiff: PROVIDENT BANK
Defendant: RAMIT ARORA, BIZ2CREDIT, ITRIA VENTURES LLC and BIZ2CREDIT INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv14163
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants re #12 Amended MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Reply Certification)(PINCUS, ANDREW)
November 5, 2018 Filing 14 Certification of Service on behalf of PROVIDENT BANK Re #13 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion. (LUBERTAZZI, JOSEPH)
November 5, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by PROVIDENT BANK re #12 Amended MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certification of Bradford Mitch in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(LUBERTAZZI, JOSEPH)
October 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 Amended MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 11/19/2018 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
October 17, 2018 Filing 12 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by RAMIT ARORA, BIZ2CREDIT INC., ITRIA VENTURES LLC. Responses due by 11/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Ramit Arora, #2 Exh. A, #3 Exh B, #4 Memorandum of Law, #5 Proposed form of Order)(PINCUS, ANDREW)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice; that any further motions or papers filed with this Court must comport with the District's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 10/16/2018. (ld, )
October 16, 2018 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ps, )
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/12/2018 03:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/15/18. (nm, )
October 15, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by RAMIT ARORA, BIZ2CREDIT INC., ITRIA VENTURES LLC. Responses due by 11/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Certification Cert. of Ramit Arora, #2 Exhibit Exh. A, #3 Exhibit Exh. B, #4 Brief Memo of Law, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed form of Order)(PINCUS, ANDREW)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by PROVIDENT BANK. Amendment to #7 Letter (Amended Exh A to Letter filed by Provident Bank). (LUBERTAZZI, JOSEPH)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 Letter from Provident Bank re #5 Letter, 6 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena)(LUBERTAZZI, JOSEPH) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/9/2018) (JB, ).
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Any compliance with the subpoenas in issue shall be stayed pending disposition of Defendants informal application (ECF No. 5). Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants informal application on or before 10/9/18, and shall clarify, among other things, whether the subpoenas in issue were served prior to the parties R26(f) conference.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/2/18. (nm, )
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 Letter from Mitchell Seidman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to EastWest Bank, #2 Exhibit Subpoena to Michael Pappas, #3 Exhibit Subpoena to Victoria Akperov)(SEIDMAN, MITCHELL)
September 25, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The Application for Extension of Time to File Answer Document No. #4 submitted by RAMIT ARORA, BIZ2CREDIT INC., ITRIA VENTURES LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/12/2018. (ld, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by RAMIT ARORA, BIZ2CREDIT INC., ITRIA VENTURES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(PINCUS, ANDREW).
September 24, 2018 Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (eu, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RAMIT ARORA, BIZ2CREDIT, ITRIA VENTURES LLC identifying Biz2CREDIT, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (SEIDMAN, MITCHELL)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, CIVIL ACTION COVER SHEET by RAMIT ARORA, BIZ2CREDIT, ITRIA VENTURES LLC. (SEIDMAN, MITCHELL)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RAMIT ARORA, BIZ2CREDIT, ITRIA VENTURES LLC DEFENDANTS from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY MIDDLESEX COUNTY, case number MID L 005038 18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9040558), filed by RAMIT ARORA, BIZ2CREDIT, ITRIA VENTURES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE)(SEIDMAN, MITCHELL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PROVIDENT BANK v. ITRIA VENTURES LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENT BANK
Represented By: JOSEPH E. LUBERTAZZI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAMIT ARORA
Represented By: MITCHELL B. SEIDMAN
Represented By: ANDREW J. PINCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIZ2CREDIT
Represented By: MITCHELL B. SEIDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITRIA VENTURES LLC
Represented By: MITCHELL B. SEIDMAN
Represented By: ANDREW J. PINCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIZ2CREDIT INC.
Represented By: MITCHELL B. SEIDMAN
Represented By: ANDREW J. PINCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?