PHILLIPS v. USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY E PHILLIPS
Defendant: STEPHEN P. HERBERT, USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC. and PRIYANKA SINGH
Petitioner: DELAWARE COUNTY EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM and University of Puerto Rico Retirement System
Case Number: 2:2018cv14590
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #16 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff . Motions set for 12/17/2018 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (gl, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff by DELAWARE COUNTY EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Delaware County Employees Retirement System's Motion for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Counsel, #2 Declaration of Christopher A. Seeger, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
November 13, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff by University of Puerto Rico Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Certificate of Service)(HERRMANN, JEFFREY)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Without prejudice to any parties right to seek interim relief and without waiver of any defense that may be raised, all Defendants response dates shall be deferred until sixty (60) days after the appointment of a lead plaintiff and lead counsel. Within thirty (30) days after the appointment of lead plaintiff, counsel for lead plaintiff and counsel for Defendants shall confer to: (a) confirm whether lead plaintiff will file a consolidated amended complaint to supersede all previously filed complaints or deem one of the existing complaints operative; and (b) establish a schedule for filing any amended complaint and a response date for all defendants, including a briefing schedule for any motions to dismiss that maybe filed by any of the defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/2/2018. (gl, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by CASEY GENE WATKINS on behalf of STEPHEN P. HERBERT, USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (WATKINS, CASEY)
October 24, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (WATKINS, CASEY)
October 24, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION extending Defendants' response deadline until 60 days following appointment of lead plaintiff by STEPHEN P. HERBERT, USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WATKINS, CASEY)
October 9, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANTHONY E PHILLIPS. USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC. served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (STRAUSS, JOEL)
October 9, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANTHONY E PHILLIPS. PRIYANKA SINGH served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (STRAUSS, JOEL)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANTHONY E PHILLIPS. STEPHEN P. HERBERT served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (STRAUSS, JOEL)
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to STEPHEN P. HERBERT, PRIYANKA SINGH, USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
October 3, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JOEL B. STRAUSS on behalf of ANTHONY E PHILLIPS (STRAUSS, JOEL)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 Exhibit to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by ANTHONY E PHILLIPS. (STRAUSS, JOEL)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ANTHONY E PHILLIPS. (STRAUSS, JOEL)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Summons to be Issued by ANTHONY E PHILLIPS as to USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (STRAUSS, JOEL)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by ANTHONY E PHILLIPS as to PRIYANKA SINGH. (STRAUSS, JOEL)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by ANTHONY E PHILLIPS as to STEPHEN P. HERBERT. (STRAUSS, JOEL)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STEPHEN P. HERBERT, PRIYANKA SINGH, USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9068378) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ANTHONY E PHILLIPS.(STRAUSS, JOEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHILLIPS v. USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN P. HERBERT
Represented By: CASEY GENE WATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: CASEY GENE WATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIYANKA SINGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY E PHILLIPS
Represented By: JOEL B. STRAUSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DELAWARE COUNTY EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: University of Puerto Rico Retirement System
Represented By: JEFFREY W. HERRMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?