PRIVATA, LLC v. NORTE PESCA, SA et al
Plaintiff: PRIVATA, LLC
Defendant: ANTONIO CASSIO HAZIN, RODRIGO FAUZE HAZIN and NORTE PESCA, SA
Case Number: 2:2018cv14688
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 Letter from Cecelia A. Donato, Esq., Attorney for Plaintiff re #7 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory , #6 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory . (Attachments: #1 Revised Signature Page for Notice of Motion, #2 Revised Signature Page for Brief in Support of Motion)(DONATO, CECELIA)
November 6, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory , #6 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory . Motion set for 12/3/2018 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (Also please submit signature page for both documents #6 and 7 as they were not properly signed by attorney.) (JB, )
November 6, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of motion to issue Letters Rogatory in order to effect service and Brief submitted by C. Donato on 11/2/2018 did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (Please Submit ONLY the signature pages for both documents as attachments to a letter and linking it to the motion) Thank you. (JB, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by PRIVATA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Letter Rogatory for Defendant Antonio C.P. Hazin, #2 Exhibit Proposed Letter Rogatory for Defendant Norte Pesca, S.A., #3 Exhibit Proposed Letter Rogatory for Defendant Rodrigo F. Hazin)(DONATO, CECELIA)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by PRIVATA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Supporting Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory to Effect Service on Foreign Defendants, #2 Supplement Copy of unpublished case, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DONATO, CECELIA)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANTONIO CASSIO HAZIN, RODRIGO FAUZE HAZIN, NORTE PESCA, SA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Summons to be Issued by PRIVATA, LLC as to ANTONIO CASSIO HAZIN, RODRIGO FAUZE HAZIN, NORTE PESCA, SA. (DONATO, CECELIA)
October 5, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (jr)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Certification of Cecelia A. Donato on behalf of PRIVATA, LLC Re #1 Complaint,. (DONATO, CECELIA)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PRIVATA, LLC. (DONATO, CECELIA)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANTONIO CASSIO HAZIN, RODRIGO FAUZE HAZIN, NORTE PESCA, SA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9075118) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PRIVATA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, First Agreement, #3 Exhibit B, Second Agreement, #4 Exhibit C, Fenix Agreement)(DONATO, CECELIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRIVATA, LLC v. NORTE PESCA, SA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTONIO CASSIO HAZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RODRIGO FAUZE HAZIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTE PESCA, SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRIVATA, LLC
Represented By: CECELIA ANN DONATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?