LARSEN et al v. AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: HAROLD R. LARSEN and ELVIRA LARSEN
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER, INC., SPIRAX SARCO, INC., OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC., The Ruggles-Klingemann Mfg. Co., Inc., VIAD CORP., AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, WARREN PUMPS LLC, Schutte and Koerting, Inc., WEIL-MCLAIN, ELLIOTT COMPANY, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, AURORA PUMP COMPANY, CARRIER CORPORATION, CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION, YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, IMO INDUSTRIES INC., BNS Co., Jerguson Gage & Valve Company, JOHN CRANE, INC., Weil Pump Company, FMC CORPORATION, Schutte & Koerting Acquisition Company, McNalley Industries, LLC, WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC., CRANE CO., CBS CORPORATION, CROWN, CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. and Amtrol Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv14694
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELA COLL CALIENDO on behalf of McNalley Industries, LLC (CALIENDO, ANGELA)
November 29, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELA COLL CALIENDO on behalf of FMC CORPORATION (CALIENDO, ANGELA)
November 16, 2018 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JOHN CRANE, INC. identifying Smiths Group PLC as Corporate Parent.. (DEZII, DAWN)
November 8, 2018 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS CORPORATION identifying CBS Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (BLOW, DAVID)
November 8, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, AURORA PUMP COMPANY, Amtrol Inc., BNS Co., CARRIER CORPORATION, CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION, CRANE CO., CROWN, CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY, FMC CORPORATION, GARDNER DENVER, INC., IMO INDUSTRIES INC., JOHN CRANE, INC., Jerguson Gage & Valve Company, McNalley Industries, LLC, OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC., SPIRAX SARCO, INC., Schutte & Koerting Acquisition Company, Schutte and Koerting, Inc., The Ruggles-Klingemann Mfg. Co., Inc., VIAD CORP., WARREN PUMPS LLC, WEIL-MCLAIN, WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC., Weil Pump Company, YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION by CBS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(BLOW, DAVID)
November 6, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by JOHN CRANE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DEZII, DAWN)
November 6, 2018 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ps, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WARREN PUMPS LLC. (JOHNSON, PAUL)
November 5, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, AURORA PUMP COMPANY, Amtrol Inc., BNS Co., CARRIER CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION, CRANE CO., CROWN, CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY, FMC CORPORATION, GARDNER DENVER, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, IMO INDUSTRIES INC., JOHN CRANE, INC., Jerguson Gage & Valve Company, McNalley Industries, LLC, OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC., SPIRAX SARCO, INC., Schutte & Koerting Acquisition Company, Schutte and Koerting, Inc., The Ruggles-Klingemann Mfg. Co., Inc., VIAD CORP., WEIL-MCLAIN, WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC., Weil Pump Company, YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION by WARREN PUMPS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(JOHNSON, PAUL)
November 5, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL C. JOHNSON on behalf of WARREN PUMPS LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(JOHNSON, PAUL)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference for 1/4/2019 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 11/5/2018. (spc, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS CORPORATION identifying CBS Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (FADAHUNSI, AFIGO)
October 24, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE by CBS CORPORATION re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Ex A- GE Notice of Removal_Part1, #2 Ex A- GE Notice of Removal_Part2, #3 Cert of Service, #4 Service Rider)(FADAHUNSI, AFIGO)
October 17, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMO INDUSTRIES INC. identifying Colfax Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
October 17, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH IRA FONTAK on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES INC. (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
October 16, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CARRIER CORPORATION identifying Carrier Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (TURNER, LINTON)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by LINTON W. TURNER, JR on behalf of CARRIER CORPORATION (TURNER, LINTON)
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by AURORA PUMP COMPANY.(HENRICH, PATRICIA)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AURORA PUMP COMPANY. (HENRICH, PATRICIA)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICIA M. HENRICH on behalf of AURORA PUMP COMPANY (HENRICH, PATRICIA)
October 11, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #4 First MOTION for Joinder in Removal. Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cm, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP A. TORTORETI on behalf of ELVIRA LARSEN, HAROLD R. LARSEN (TORTORETI, PHILIP)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by JOHN CRANE, INC. of Removal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certification of Service, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D)(CLARK, JEANINE)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 First MOTION for Joinder in Removal by CRANE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4.1, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4.2, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4.3, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 4.4, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 4.5, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 4.6, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 4.7, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 4.8, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 4.9, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 4.10, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 4.11, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 4.12, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 4.13, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 4.14, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 5.1, #21 Certificate of Service Counsel List, #22 Certificate of Service Certificate as to Service, #23 Statement Rule 7.1 Statement)(PASCARELLA, LISA) Modified on 11/20/2018 (spc).
October 5, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (jr)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal,, Civil Cover Sheet by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (BLOW, DAVID)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY identifying General Electric Company as Corporate Parent.. (BLOW, DAVID)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY from Superior Court of New Jersey, Middlesex County, case number MID-L-05099-18-AS. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9075453), filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A -Complaint and Amended Complaint, #2 Ex. B - Hobson October 17 2003, #3 Ex. C - Horne Affidavit and CV, #4 Ex. D - Betts Affidavit Feb 9, 2005, #5 Ex. E - Pltfs Request for Recommendation, #6 Notice of Notice of Removal to State Court, #7 Notice of Notice of Removal to Adverse Party, #8 List of All Known Counsel, #9 Cert of Service)(BLOW, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LARSEN et al v. AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPIRAX SARCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ruggles-Klingemann Mfg. Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIAD CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS LLC
Represented By: PAUL C. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schutte and Koerting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIL-MCLAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLIOTT COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: DAVID SCHUYLER BLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMP COMPANY
Represented By: PATRICIA M. HENRICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Represented By: LINTON W. TURNER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH IRA FONTAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNS Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerguson Gage & Valve Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE, INC.
Represented By: DAWN DEZII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC CORPORATION
Represented By: ANGELA COLL CALIENDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schutte & Koerting Acquisition Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNalley Industries, LLC
Represented By: ANGELA COLL CALIENDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: LISA PASCARELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROWN, CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtrol Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD R. LARSEN
Represented By: LYNNE M. KIZIS
Represented By: PHILIP A. TORTORETI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELVIRA LARSEN
Represented By: LYNNE M. KIZIS
Represented By: PHILIP A. TORTORETI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?