ROTHMAN v. RWJBARNABAS HEALTH INC. et al
Plaintiff: CHESTER M. ROTHMAN
Defendant: RWJBARNABAS HEALTH INC., SAQUIBA SYED, ALPINE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT INC., AMER SYED, ALPINE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES PC, JANE/JOHN DOES 1-25, ALPINE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES LLC, ALPINE MEDICAL GROUP LLC, ALPINE MEDICAL HOLDINGS, LLC, DR. SAQUIBA SYED and DR. AMER SYED
Case Number: 2:2018cv14828
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: James B Clark
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by ALPINE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES LLC, ALPINE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES PC, ALPINE MEDICAL GROUP LLC, ALPINE MEDICAL HOLDINGS, LLC, ALPINE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT INC., AMER SYED, SAQUIBA SYED re #9 First MOTION to Compel ArbitrationFirst MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certification)(KOZYRA, BARRY)
November 27, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #9 First MOTION to Compel ArbitrationFirst MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 12/17/2018 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER ORDER Granting #13 Letter, requesting that both motion to compel arbitration and Plaintiff's apparent cross-motion be adjourned one motion cycle to 12/17/2018, etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 11/27/2018. (JB, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 Letter. (SPAWN, ROBERT)
November 19, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by CHESTER M. ROTHMAN re #9 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration, First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by ALPINE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES LLC, ALPINE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES PC, ALPINE MEDICAL GROUP LLC, ALPINE MEDICAL HOLDINGS, LLC, ALPINE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT INC., AMER SYED, SAQUIBA SYED(JB, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 Consent & Registration form to receive documents electronically by CHESTER M. ROTHMAN (JB, )
November 1, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #9 First MOTION to Compel ArbitrationFirst MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 12/3/2018 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER ORDER Granting #8 Letter from Benjamin J. DiLorenzo, Esq. to the Hon. James B. Clark, III, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/31/2018. (JB, )
October 31, 2018 Filing 9 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration, First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by ALPINE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES LLC, ALPINE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES PC, ALPINE MEDICAL GROUP LLC, ALPINE MEDICAL HOLDINGS, LLC, ALPINE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT INC., AMER SYED, SAQUIBA SYED. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(KOZYRA, BARRY)
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 Letter from Benjamin J. DiLorenzo, Esq. to the Hon. James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J.. (DILORENZO, BENJAMIN)
October 26, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #7 Order, submitted by ALPINE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT INC., ALPINE MEDICAL HOLDINGS, LLC, SAQUIBA SYED, ALPINE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES LLC, AMER SYED, ALPINE MEDICAL GROUP LLC, ALPINE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES PC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/31/20178. (JB, )
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER Granting #6 Letter from Barry A. Kozyra, Esq. to Magistrate Judge James B. Clark, U.S.D.C., requesting an extension of time for Alpine Defendants to answer otherwise respond to the Complaint until 10/31/20178. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/25/2018. (JB, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 Letter from Barry A. Kozyra, Esq. to Magistrate Judge James B. Clark, U.S.D.C.. (KOZYRA, BARRY)
October 25, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by ALPINE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT INC., ALPINE MEDICAL HOLDINGS, LLC, SAQUIBA SYED, ALPINE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES LLC, AMER SYED, ALPINE MEDICAL GROUP LLC, ALPINE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES PC has been DENIED. (Request made out of time must file a motion requesting extension of time) (JB, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants Dr. Amer Syed, Dr. Saquiba Syed, Alpine Medical Group LLC, Alpine Medical Associates PC, Alpine Medical Management Inc., Alpine Medical Associates LLC and Alpine Medical Holdings, LLC. Attorney BARRY ALAN KOZYRA,ROBERT B. SPAWN, JR for ALPINE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES LLC,BARRY ALAN KOZYRA,ROBERT B. SPAWN, JR for ALPINE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES PC,BARRY ALAN KOZYRA,ROBERT B. SPAWN, JR for ALPINE MEDICAL GROUP LLC,BARRY ALAN KOZYRA,ROBERT B. SPAWN, JR for ALPINE MEDICAL HOLDINGS, LLC,BARRY ALAN KOZYRA,ROBERT B. SPAWN, JR for ALPINE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT INC.,BARRY ALAN KOZYRA,ROBERT B. SPAWN, JR for AMER SYED,BARRY ALAN KOZYRA,ROBERT B. SPAWN, JR for SAQUIBA SYED added. (KOZYRA, BARRY)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 Letter from Chester M. Rothman. (JB, )
October 16, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by RWJBARNABAS HEALTH INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/31/2018. (JB, )
October 11, 2018 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (eu, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to RWJBARNABAS HEALTH INC.. (DOBBS, MARYJANE)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RWJBARNABAS HEALTH INC.. (DOBBS, MARYJANE)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RWJBARNABAS HEALTH INC. from Superior Court of Hudson County, case number HUD L 003434 18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9083511), filed by RWJBARNABAS HEALTH INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A & B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(DOBBS, MARYJANE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROTHMAN v. RWJBARNABAS HEALTH INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RWJBARNABAS HEALTH INC.
Represented By: MARYJANE MCNICHOLAS DOBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAQUIBA SYED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALPINE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT INC.
Represented By: BARRY ALAN KOZYRA
Represented By: ROBERT B. SPAWN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMER SYED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALPINE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES PC
Represented By: BARRY ALAN KOZYRA
Represented By: ROBERT B. SPAWN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE/JOHN DOES 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALPINE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES LLC
Represented By: BARRY ALAN KOZYRA
Represented By: ROBERT B. SPAWN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALPINE MEDICAL GROUP LLC
Represented By: BARRY ALAN KOZYRA
Represented By: ROBERT B. SPAWN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALPINE MEDICAL HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: BARRY ALAN KOZYRA
Represented By: ROBERT B. SPAWN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. SAQUIBA SYED
Represented By: BARRY ALAN KOZYRA
Represented By: ROBERT B. SPAWN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. AMER SYED
Represented By: BARRY ALAN KOZYRA
Represented By: ROBERT B. SPAWN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHESTER M. ROTHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?