BACQUIE v. DIDIO et al
Plaintiff: RICHARD BACQUIE
Defendant: TD BANK, N.A., ROBERT DIDIO, CAPITAL ONE 360 and CAPITAL ONE BANK
Case Number: 2:2018cv14905
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel by RICHARD BACQUIE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(byl)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by RICHARD BACQUIE to receive documents electronically. (sm)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 Letter from Richard Bacquie dated 11/8/2018 re: correction of defendants addresses. (sm)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CAPITAL ONE 360, CAPITAL ONE BANK, ROBERT DIDIO, TD BANK, N.A.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (fp, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAPITAL ONE 360, CAPITAL ONE BANK, ROBERT DIDIO, TD BANK, N.A. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW 037655) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RICHARD BACQUIE. (byl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BACQUIE v. DIDIO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT DIDIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE 360
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD BACQUIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?