LANNIN v. NRT TITLE AGENCY, LLC et al
Plaintiff: LAURA J LANNIN
Defendant: MID-TOWN DIRECT TITLE AGENCY, PONY MESSENGER SERVICE, LLC, A-ABSOLUTE ESCROW SETTLEMENT INC., BROAD STREET TITLE AGENCY, LLC, JGH TITLE AGENCY, LLC, NRT TITLE AGENCY, LLC, KL TITLE AGENCY, LLC, WATERFRONT TITLE AGENCY, LLC, PETER A UZZOLINO, TOWNE SQUARE TITLE AGENCY, LLC, REALOGY CORPORATION, CHP TITLE AGENCY, LLC, NRT LLC, TRADITIONS TITLE AGENCY, LLC, HLT TITLE AGENCY, LLC, ACRES LAND TITLE AGENCY, INC and TITLE RESOURCES GUARANTY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2018cv15146
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by NRT LLC, REALOGY CORPORATION, TITLE RESOURCES GUARANTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Wendy Wildung, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GILLER, RONALD)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT ORDER; The parties to this matter hereby consent to the following schedule for the filing and service of responses to the Plaintiff's Complaint: All Defendants shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint on or before December 21, 2018; Plaintiff shall oppose or respond to any answer or motion filed by any Defendant on or before February 4, 2019; Each Defendant shall have until February 18, 2019 to reply to any opposition filed by Plaintiff; Defendant each shall have until February 18, 2019 to reply to any opposition filed by Plaintiff; Defendant each waive any affirmative defense based on insufficient service of process; Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Consent Order upon all counsel of record with 5 days of the date hereof; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/20/2018. (sms)
November 19, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION with Proposed Consent Order to Extend Time by NRT LLC, REALOGY CORPORATION, TITLE RESOURCES GUARANTY COMPANY. (GILLER, RONALD)
November 14, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order,,, submitted by MID-TOWN DIRECT TITLE AGENCY, CHP TITLE AGENCY, LLC, TRADITIONS TITLE AGENCY, LLC, A-ABSOLUTE ESCROW SETTLEMENT INC., BROAD STREET TITLE AGENCY, LLC, JGH TITLE AGENCY, LLC, TOWNE SQUARE TITLE AGENCY, LLC, PONY MESSENGER SERVICE, LLC, PETER A UZZOLINO, WATERFRONT TITLE AGENCY, LLC, HLT TITLE AGENCY, LLC, KL TITLE AGENCY, LLC, ACRES LAND TITLE AGENCY, INC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/27/2018. (JB, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD A. GILLER on behalf of NRT LLC, REALOGY CORPORATION, TITLE RESOURCES GUARANTY COMPANY (GILLER, RONALD)
November 13, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NRT LLC, REALOGY CORPORATION, TITLE RESOURCES GUARANTY COMPANY. (GUIDEA, JENNIFER)
November 13, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER ANN GUIDEA on behalf of NRT LLC, REALOGY CORPORATION, TITLE RESOURCES GUARANTY COMPANY (GUIDEA, JENNIFER)
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 Clerk's Note - Please disregard docket Nos. 10 and 11 NOTICE of Appearances, Attorney will refile. (ld, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NRT TITLE AGENCY, LLC, REALOGY CORPORATION, TITLE RESOURCES GUARANTY COMPANY. (GUIDEA, JENNIFER)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER ANN GUIDEA on behalf of NRT TITLE AGENCY, LLC, REALOGY CORPORATION, TITLE RESOURCES GUARANTY COMPANY (GUIDEA, JENNIFER)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD A. GILLER on behalf of NRT TITLE AGENCY, LLC, REALOGY CORPORATION, TITLE RESOURCES GUARANTY COMPANY (GILLER, RONALD)
November 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA ILYSE FALK on behalf of A-ABSOLUTE ESCROW SETTLEMENT INC., ACRES LAND TITLE AGENCY, INC, BROAD STREET TITLE AGENCY, LLC, CHP TITLE AGENCY, LLC, HLT TITLE AGENCY, LLC, JGH TITLE AGENCY, LLC, KL TITLE AGENCY, LLC, MID-TOWN DIRECT TITLE AGENCY, PONY MESSENGER SERVICE, LLC, TOWNE SQUARE TITLE AGENCY, LLC, TRADITIONS TITLE AGENCY, LLC, PETER A UZZOLINO, WATERFRONT TITLE AGENCY, LLC (FALK, MELISSA)
November 12, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIGITTE M. GLADIS on behalf of A-ABSOLUTE ESCROW SETTLEMENT INC., ACRES LAND TITLE AGENCY, INC, BROAD STREET TITLE AGENCY, LLC, CHP TITLE AGENCY, LLC, HLT TITLE AGENCY, LLC, JGH TITLE AGENCY, LLC, KL TITLE AGENCY, LLC, MID-TOWN DIRECT TITLE AGENCY, PONY MESSENGER SERVICE, LLC, TOWNE SQUARE TITLE AGENCY, LLC, TRADITIONS TITLE AGENCY, LLC, PETER A UZZOLINO, WATERFRONT TITLE AGENCY, LLC (GLADIS, BRIGITTE)
November 12, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL on behalf of A-ABSOLUTE ESCROW SETTLEMENT INC., ACRES LAND TITLE AGENCY, INC, BROAD STREET TITLE AGENCY, LLC, CHP TITLE AGENCY, LLC, HLT TITLE AGENCY, LLC, JGH TITLE AGENCY, LLC, KL TITLE AGENCY, LLC, MID-TOWN DIRECT TITLE AGENCY, PONY MESSENGER SERVICE, LLC, TOWNE SQUARE TITLE AGENCY, LLC, TRADITIONS TITLE AGENCY, LLC, PETER A UZZOLINO, WATERFRONT TITLE AGENCY, LLC (ISRAEL, RONALD)
November 12, 2018 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL for A-ABSOLUTE ESCROW SETTLEMENT INC.,RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL for ACRES LAND TITLE AGENCY, INC,RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL for BROAD STREET TITLE AGENCY, LLC,RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL for CHP TITLE AGENCY, LLC,RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL for HLT TITLE AGENCY, LLC,RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL for JGH TITLE AGENCY, LLC,RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL for KL TITLE AGENCY, LLC,RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL for MID-TOWN DIRECT TITLE AGENCY,RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL for PONY MESSENGER SERVICE, LLC,RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL for TOWNE SQUARE TITLE AGENCY, LLC,RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL for TRADITIONS TITLE AGENCY, LLC,RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL for PETER A UZZOLINO,RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL for WATERFRONT TITLE AGENCY, LLC added. (ISRAEL, RONALD)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to NRT Title Agency, LLC.. (KNOB, PETER)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LAURA J LANNIN. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit, #6 Affidavit, #7 Affidavit, #8 Affidavit, #9 Affidavit, #10 Affidavit, #11 Affidavit, #12 Affidavit, #13 Affidavit, #14 Affidavit, #15 Affidavit)(SCHAFFER, MARGUERITE)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER MATTHEW KNOB on behalf of NRT TITLE AGENCY, LLC (KNOB, PETER)
November 8, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by NRT TITLE AGENCY, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/26/2018. (sms)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to A-ABSOLUTE ESCROW SETTLEMENT INC., ACRES LAND TITLE AGENCY, INC, BROAD STREET TITLE AGENCY, LLC, CHP TITLE AGENCY, LLC, HLT TITLE AGENCY, LLC, JGH TITLE AGENCY, LLC, KL TITLE AGENCY, LLC, MID-TOWN DIRECT TITLE AGENCY, NRT LLC, NRT TITLE AGENCY, LLC, PONY MESSENGER SERVICE, LLC, REALOGY CORPORATION, TITLE RESOURCES GUARANTY COMPANY, TOWNE SQUARE TITLE AGENCY, LLC, TRADITIONS TITLE AGENCY, LLC, PETER A UZZOLINO, WATERFRONT TITLE AGENCY, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
October 19, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A-ABSOLUTE ESCROW SETTLEMENT INC., ACRES LAND TITLE AGENCY, INC, BROAD STREET TITLE AGENCY, LLC, CHP TITLE AGENCY, LLC, HLT TITLE AGENCY, LLC, JGH TITLE AGENCY, LLC, KL TITLE AGENCY, LLC, MID-TOWN DIRECT TITLE AGENCY, NRT LLC, NRT TITLE AGENCY, LLC, PONY MESSENGER SERVICE, LLC, REALOGY CORPORATION, TITLE RESOURCES GUARANTY COMPANY, TOWNE SQUARE TITLE AGENCY, LLC, TRADITIONS TITLE AGENCY, LLC, PETER A UZZOLINO, WATERFRONT TITLE AGENCY, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9109838) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LAURA J LANNIN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCHAFFER, MARGUERITE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANNIN v. NRT TITLE AGENCY, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MID-TOWN DIRECT TITLE AGENCY
Represented By: MELISSA ILYSE FALK
Represented By: BRIGITTE M. GLADIS
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PONY MESSENGER SERVICE, LLC
Represented By: MELISSA ILYSE FALK
Represented By: BRIGITTE M. GLADIS
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-ABSOLUTE ESCROW SETTLEMENT INC.
Represented By: MELISSA ILYSE FALK
Represented By: BRIGITTE M. GLADIS
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROAD STREET TITLE AGENCY, LLC
Represented By: MELISSA ILYSE FALK
Represented By: BRIGITTE M. GLADIS
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JGH TITLE AGENCY, LLC
Represented By: MELISSA ILYSE FALK
Represented By: BRIGITTE M. GLADIS
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NRT TITLE AGENCY, LLC
Represented By: PETER MATTHEW KNOB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KL TITLE AGENCY, LLC
Represented By: MELISSA ILYSE FALK
Represented By: BRIGITTE M. GLADIS
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATERFRONT TITLE AGENCY, LLC
Represented By: MELISSA ILYSE FALK
Represented By: BRIGITTE M. GLADIS
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER A UZZOLINO
Represented By: MELISSA ILYSE FALK
Represented By: BRIGITTE M. GLADIS
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWNE SQUARE TITLE AGENCY, LLC
Represented By: MELISSA ILYSE FALK
Represented By: BRIGITTE M. GLADIS
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REALOGY CORPORATION
Represented By: JENNIFER ANN GUIDEA
Represented By: RONALD A. GILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHP TITLE AGENCY, LLC
Represented By: MELISSA ILYSE FALK
Represented By: BRIGITTE M. GLADIS
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NRT LLC
Represented By: JENNIFER ANN GUIDEA
Represented By: RONALD A. GILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRADITIONS TITLE AGENCY, LLC
Represented By: MELISSA ILYSE FALK
Represented By: BRIGITTE M. GLADIS
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HLT TITLE AGENCY, LLC
Represented By: MELISSA ILYSE FALK
Represented By: BRIGITTE M. GLADIS
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACRES LAND TITLE AGENCY, INC
Represented By: MELISSA ILYSE FALK
Represented By: BRIGITTE M. GLADIS
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TITLE RESOURCES GUARANTY COMPANY
Represented By: JENNIFER ANN GUIDEA
Represented By: RONALD A. GILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA J LANNIN
Represented By: XIAOSONG LI
Represented By: MARGUERITE MARY SCHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?