BELCHER v. WALMART INC. et al
Plaintiff: TERESA BELCHER
Defendant: ABC, CORP., WALMART INC., JOHN ROE PHARMACIST TECHNICIAN and JOHN DOE PHARMACISTS
Case Number: 2:2018cv15176
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Referring Judge: William H Walls
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JOINT PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Conference is set for 2/21/2019 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/15/2019. Fact Discovery due by 5/31/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 2/15/2019, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/12/2018. (gl, )
December 12, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/12/2018. (tjg, )
November 1, 2018 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4C on 12/12/18 at 10:15am. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/1/18. (tjg, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by WALMART INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ZANGRILLI, NANCY)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. MCDONNELL on behalf of WALMART INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCDONNELL, PATRICK)
October 22, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
October 22, 2018 Case assigned to Judge William H. Walls and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART INC.. (ZANGRILLI, NANCY)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART INC. from Superior Court of Sussex County, case number SSX-L-000446-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9112604), filed by WALMART INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(ZANGRILLI, NANCY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELCHER v. WALMART INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC, CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART INC.
Represented By: NANCY ELIZABETH ZANGRILLI
Represented By: PATRICK J. MCDONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN ROE PHARMACIST TECHNICIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE PHARMACISTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA BELCHER
Represented By: KEVIN T. KUTYLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?