POLEVOY v. FIXELLE
Plaintiff: STEVEN POLEVOY
Defendant: GENESIS ADVISORY SERVICES CORP., BRUCE FIXELLE, Rosenburg Rich Baker & Berman & Co., P.A, Andrew Fingerhut, JOHN DOE PARTNERSHIPS 1-10, JOHN DOES 1-10, ROSENBURG RICH BAKER BERMAN & CO., P.A., SONZOGNI BOTITTO & FINGERHUT, LLC and ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Case Number: 2:2018cv15220
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by SONZOGNI BOTITTO & FINGERHUT, LLC.(BADAGLIACCA, JOHN)
December 3, 2018 Filing 13 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ANDREW FINGERHUT, ROSENBURG RICH BAKER BERMAN & CO., P.A..(HANAU, ILANA)
November 30, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The #12 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by SONZOGNI BOTITTO & FINGERHUT, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/18/2018. (gl, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Sonzogni, Bottitto & Fingerhut, LLC, now known as Sonzogni, Bottitto & Cooper, LLC. Attorney JOHN BADAGLIACCA for SONZOGNI BOTITTO & FINGERHUT, LLC added. (BADAGLIACCA, JOHN)
November 27, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, Affid of Svc on Andrew Fingerhut CPA by STEVEN POLEVOY. (ZAITA, NICHOLAS)
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, Affid of Svc on Rosenberg et al. by STEVEN POLEVOY. (ZAITA, NICHOLAS)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Affid of Svc on Sonzogni et al re #1 Complaint, by STEVEN POLEVOY. (ZAITA, NICHOLAS)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, Affidavit of Service on Genesis by STEVEN POLEVOY. (ZAITA, NICHOLAS)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Affidavit of Service re #1 Complaint, by STEVEN POLEVOY. (ZAITA, NICHOLAS)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY J. MELON on behalf of STEVEN POLEVOY (MELON, ANTHONY)
November 12, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STEVEN POLEVOY re #1 Complaint, #3 Order, #2 Summons Issued, (ZAITA, NICHOLAS)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo: Application for TRO Hearing held on 10/24/2018. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (aa, )
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Plaintiffs application for a Temporary Restraining Order is hereby DENIED without prejudice, etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 10/24/2018. (gl, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANDREW FINGERHUT, BRUCE FIXELLE, GENESIS ADVISORY SERVICES CORP., ROSENBURG RICH BAKER BERMAN & CO., P.A., SONZOGNI BOTITTO & FINGERHUT, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
October 24, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9117672), filed by STEVEN POLEVOY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Brief Brief in Support, #3 Certification Cert In Support, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(ZAITA, NICHOLAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POLEVOY v. FIXELLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN POLEVOY
Represented By: NICHOLAS J. ZAITA
Represented By: ANTHONY J. MELON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENESIS ADVISORY SERVICES CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE FIXELLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosenburg Rich Baker & Berman & Co., P.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Fingerhut
Represented By: ILANA S. HANAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE PARTNERSHIPS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSENBURG RICH BAKER BERMAN & CO., P.A.
Represented By: ILANA S. HANAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SONZOGNI BOTITTO & FINGERHUT, LLC
Represented By: JOHN BADAGLIACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?