NAPP-GRECCO COMPANY v. MV TECHNOLOGIES

Plaintiff: NAPP-GRECCO COMPANY
3Rd Party Plaintiff: MV TECHNOLOGIES
3Rd Party Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10, L.F. MANUFACTURING, INC., ABC CORPS. 1-10 and PURENERGY OPERATING SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv15324
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 THIRD PARTY SUMMONS ISSUED as to L.F. MANUFACTURING, INC., PURENERGY OPERATING SERVICES, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 First THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT of MV Technologies against L. F. Manufacturing, Inc., PurEnergy Operating Services, LLC, filed by MV TECHNOLOGIES. (Attachments: #1 Summons MVT 3rd Party Complaint Summons, #2 Summons NGC Summons and Complaint)(GAUDIOSO, PETER)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 1/10/2019 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 12/4/2018. (kd)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 MV TECHNOLOGIES' ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against NAPP-GRECCO COMPANY by MV TECHNOLOGIES. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Service)(GAUDIOSO, PETER)
November 19, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MV TECHNOLOGIES has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/3/2018. (dam, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to MV Technologies. Attorney PETER A. GAUDIOSO for MV TECHNOLOGIES added. (GAUDIOSO, PETER)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MV TECHNOLOGIES. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
October 26, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
October 26, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint #1 submitted by Othiamba Lovelace on 11/25/2018 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (jr)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MV TECHNOLOGIES ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9124828) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NAPP-GRECCO COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(LOVELACE, OTHIAMBA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NAPP-GRECCO COMPANY v. MV TECHNOLOGIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAPP-GRECCO COMPANY
Represented By: OTHIAMBA NKOSI LOVELACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: MV TECHNOLOGIES
Represented By: PETER A. GAUDIOSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: L.F. MANUFACTURING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ABC CORPS. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: PURENERGY OPERATING SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?